Construction Industry Laborers Pension Fund et al v. Lan-Tel Communications Services, Inc.

Plaintiff: Bridgette Williams, Kevin Fahey, Construction Industry Laborers Pension Fund, Construction Industry Laborers Training Fund, Jason Mendenhall, Greater Kansas City Laborers Vacation Plan, a Trust Fund, Mitchell Rowley, Byron Hornung, Construction Industry Laborers Supplemental Medical and Retiree Targeted Fund, Doug Hall, Construction Industry Laborers Welfare Fund and Gabriel T Jones
Defendant: Lan-Tel Communications Services, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2019cv00276
Filed: April 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Fernando J Gaitan
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 2/10/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 3/10/2020. Status Reports which include the status of settlement negotiations are due by 10/28/2019. Bench trial to be set by future order. Please see text of order for additional deadlines. Signed on 7/10/2019 by District Judge Fernando J. Gaitan, Jr. (Shawver, Marylynn) (Main Document 13 replaced on 7/10/2019) (Shawver, Marylynn).
July 1, 2019 Filing 12 PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER by Construction Industry Laborers Pension Fund, Construction Industry Laborers Supplemental Medical and Retiree Targeted Fund, Construction Industry Laborers Training Fund, Construction Industry Laborers Welfare Fund, Kevin Fahey, Greater Kansas City Laborers Vacation Plan, a Trust Fund, Doug Hall, Byron Hornung, Gabriel T Jones, Jason Mendenhall, Mitchell Rowley, Bridgette Williams. (Sollars, Bradley)
June 7, 2019 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by All Plaintiffs First Request for Admissions filed by Ryan D Smith on behalf of Plaintiffs Construction Industry Laborers Pension Fund, Construction Industry Laborers Supplemental Medical and Retiree Targeted Fund, Construction Industry Laborers Training Fund, Construction Industry Laborers Welfare Fund, Kevin Fahey, Greater Kansas City Laborers Vacation Plan, a Trust Fund, Doug Hall, Byron Hornung, Gabriel T Jones, Jason Mendenhall, Mitchell Rowley, Bridgette Williams.(Smith, Ryan)
June 7, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of appearance by Ryan D Smith on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attorney Ryan D Smith added to party Construction Industry Laborers Pension Fund(pty:pla), Attorney Ryan D Smith added to party Construction Industry Laborers Supplemental Medical and Retiree Targeted Fund(pty:pla), Attorney Ryan D Smith added to party Construction Industry Laborers Training Fund(pty:pla), Attorney Ryan D Smith added to party Construction Industry Laborers Welfare Fund(pty:pla), Attorney Ryan D Smith added to party Kevin Fahey(pty:pla), Attorney Ryan D Smith added to party Greater Kansas City Laborers Vacation Plan, a Trust Fund(pty:pla), Attorney Ryan D Smith added to party Doug Hall(pty:pla), Attorney Ryan D Smith added to party Byron Hornung(pty:pla), Attorney Ryan D Smith added to party Gabriel T Jones(pty:pla), Attorney Ryan D Smith added to party Jason Mendenhall(pty:pla), Attorney Ryan D Smith added to party Mitchell Rowley(pty:pla), Attorney Ryan D Smith added to party Bridgette Williams(pty:pla))(Smith, Ryan)
May 22, 2019 NOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your Designation of Mediator is due soon (filed as an ADR event in CM/ECF). See Notice of Inclusion and MAP General Order for specifics. (ADI, MAP)
May 20, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES filed by Bradley Jay Sollars on behalf of Plaintiffs Construction Industry Laborers Pension Fund, Construction Industry Laborers Supplemental Medical and Retiree Targeted Fund, Construction Industry Laborers Training Fund, Construction Industry Laborers Welfare Fund, Kevin Fahey, Greater Kansas City Laborers Vacation Plan, a Trust Fund, Doug Hall, Byron Hornung, Gabriel T Jones, Jason Mendenhall, Mitchell Rowley, Bridgette Williams.(Sollars, Bradley)
May 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 RULE 16 NOTICE. Please see text of order. Signed on 5/17/2019 by District Judge Fernando J. Gaitan, Jr. (Shawver, Marylynn)
May 16, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, on behalf of Lan-Tel Communications Services, Inc..(Roby, Eric)
May 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant Lan-Tel Communications Services, Inc. answer due on or before 5/16/2019. Signed on 5/9/19 by District Judge Fernando J. Gaitan, Jr. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Anderson, Christy)
May 3, 2019 Filing 5 SUGGESTIONS IN OPPOSITION to motion re #4 MOTION for extension of time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Bradley Jay Sollars on behalf of Plaintiffs Construction Industry Laborers Pension Fund, Construction Industry Laborers Supplemental Medical and Retiree Targeted Fund, Construction Industry Laborers Training Fund, Construction Industry Laborers Welfare Fund, Kevin Fahey, Greater Kansas City Laborers Vacation Plan, a Trust Fund, Doug Hall, Byron Hornung, Gabriel T Jones, Jason Mendenhall, Mitchell Rowley, Bridgette Williams. Reply suggestions due by 5/17/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Sollars, Bradley) Modified on 5/8/2019 - to correct document title from "Response" (Anderson, Christy).
May 2, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for extension of time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Eric D. Roby on behalf of Lan-Tel Communications Services, Inc.. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 5/16/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attorney Eric D. Roby added to party Lan-Tel Communications Services, Inc.(pty:dft))(Roby, Eric) Modified on 5/9/2019 (Anderson, Christy).
April 12, 2019 Filing 3 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by All Plaintiffs. All Defendants. (Sollars, Bradley)
April 8, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Melvin, Greg)
April 8, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Lan-Tel Communications Services, Inc. (Melvin, Greg)
April 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Aaron Schuster on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Filing fee $400, receipt number AMOWDC-6260203. Service due by 7/8/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Schuster, Aaron)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Construction Industry Laborers Pension Fund et al v. Lan-Tel Communications Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bridgette Williams
Represented By: Aaron Schuster
Represented By: Bradley Jay Sollars
Represented By: Ryan D Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Fahey
Represented By: Aaron Schuster
Represented By: Bradley Jay Sollars
Represented By: Ryan D Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Construction Industry Laborers Pension Fund
Represented By: Aaron Schuster
Represented By: Bradley Jay Sollars
Represented By: Ryan D Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Construction Industry Laborers Training Fund
Represented By: Aaron Schuster
Represented By: Bradley Jay Sollars
Represented By: Ryan D Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Mendenhall
Represented By: Aaron Schuster
Represented By: Bradley Jay Sollars
Represented By: Ryan D Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Greater Kansas City Laborers Vacation Plan, a Trust Fund
Represented By: Aaron Schuster
Represented By: Bradley Jay Sollars
Represented By: Ryan D Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mitchell Rowley
Represented By: Aaron Schuster
Represented By: Bradley Jay Sollars
Represented By: Ryan D Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Byron Hornung
Represented By: Aaron Schuster
Represented By: Bradley Jay Sollars
Represented By: Ryan D Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Construction Industry Laborers Supplemental Medical and Retiree Targeted Fund
Represented By: Aaron Schuster
Represented By: Bradley Jay Sollars
Represented By: Ryan D Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Doug Hall
Represented By: Aaron Schuster
Represented By: Bradley Jay Sollars
Represented By: Ryan D Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Construction Industry Laborers Welfare Fund
Represented By: Aaron Schuster
Represented By: Bradley Jay Sollars
Represented By: Ryan D Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gabriel T Jones
Represented By: Aaron Schuster
Represented By: Bradley Jay Sollars
Represented By: Ryan D Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lan-Tel Communications Services, Inc.
Represented By: Eric D. Roby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?