Smith v. Kansas City Power and Light (KCP&L)
Plaintiff: Gregory Wayne Smith
Defendant: Kansas City Power and Light (KCP&L)
Case Number: 4:2019cv00281
Filed: April 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Howard F Sachs
Nature of Suit: Commerce ICC Rates, Etc.
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2019 Filing 8 CLERK'S JUDGMENT. Copy mailed with Order #7 . (Anderson, Christy)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER - DENYING #1 motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. DENYING AS MOOT #3 motion to reassign/transfer case. This case is hereby dismissed pursuant to U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B)(ii). Signed on 7/9/19 by District Judge Howard F. Sachs. Copy of Order mailed via first class and certified mail (Rct No. 7016 3560 0000 4920 2265) to Gregory Wayne Smith at 12310 3rd Street, Apt 2, Grandview, MO 64030. (Anderson, Christy)
June 13, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of filing by Gregory Wayne Smith. (Crocker, Susan)
April 30, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of filing Letter for Action by Gregory Wayne Smith. (Kern, Kendra)
April 10, 2019 Filing 4 SUGGESTIONS in support re #3 MOTION to reassign/transfer case on behalf of Plaintiff Gregory Wayne Smith. (Related document(s) #3 ) (Woods, Gloria)
April 10, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to reassign/transfer case filed by Gregory Wayne Smith. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 4/24/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Woods, Gloria)
April 10, 2019 Filing 2 FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT by Gregory Wayne Smith. (Woods, Gloria)
April 10, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by Gregory Wayne Smith. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 4/24/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit)(Woods, Gloria)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Kansas City Power and Light (KCP&L)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory Wayne Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kansas City Power and Light (KCP&L)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?