Sitzer et al v. National Association of Realtors et al
Plaintiff: Joshua Sitzer, Amy Winger, Scott Burnett, Rhonda Burnett and Ryan Hendrickson
Defendant: RE/MAX Holdings, Inc., Realogy Holdings Corp., National Association of Realtors, Keller Williams Realty, Inc., HomeServices of America, Inc., Re/Max LLC, The Long & Foster Companies, Inc., HSF Affiliates, LLC and BHH Affiliates, LLC
Petitioner: MARIS MLS, Kansas City Regional Association of Realtors, Missouri Association of Realtors, Columbia Board of Realtors and Southern Missouri Regional MLS LLC
Not Classified By Court: Corelogic, Inc.
Interested Party: United States
Case Number: 4:2019cv00332
Filed: April 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Stephen R Bough
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:1
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 24, 2020 Filing 215 NOTICE OF HEARING - This is the official notice for this hearing. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. Status Conferences set for 3/26/2020 09:00 AM, 4/6/2020 09:00 AM, 5/6/2020 09:00 AM, 6/11/2020 09:00 AM, 7/10/2020 09:00 AM, 8/3/2020 09:00 AM, 9/11/2020 09:00 AM, 10/6/2020 09:00 AM, 11/6/2020 09:00 AM and 12/7/2020 09:00 AM in Courtroom 7B, Kansas City (SRB) before District Judge Stephen R. Bough. (Diefenbach, Tracy)
February 21, 2020 Filing 214 RETURN OF SERVICE (non cmp) Return of Service - Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corp. (Dameron, Matthew)
February 21, 2020 Filing 213 RETURN OF SERVICE (non cmp) Return of Service - Federal National Mortgage Association (Dameron, Matthew)
February 20, 2020 Filing 212 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by All Plaintiffs Certificate of Service of Plaintiffs' Answers to Defendant Re/Max LLC's First Set of Interrogatories filed by Matthew Lee Dameron on behalf of Plaintiffs Rhonda Burnett, Scott Burnett, Ryan Hendrickson, Joshua Sitzer, Amy Winger.(Dameron, Matthew)
February 19, 2020 Filing 211 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Realogy Holdings Corp. filed by Kenneth M. Kliebard on behalf of Defendant Realogy Holdings Corp..(Kliebard, Kenneth)
February 10, 2020 Filing 210 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Keller Williams Realty, Inc. filed by David R. Buchanan on behalf of Defendant Keller Williams Realty, Inc..(Buchanan, David)
February 10, 2020 Filing 209 NOTICE of filing Intent to Issue Subpoena to Produce Documents by Rhonda Burnett, Scott Burnett, Ryan Hendrickson, Joshua Sitzer, Amy Winger (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Dameron, Matthew)
February 10, 2020 Filing 208 NOTICE of filing Notice of Intent to Issue Subpoena to Produce Documents by Rhonda Burnett, Scott Burnett, Ryan Hendrickson, Joshua Sitzer, Amy Winger (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Dameron, Matthew)
February 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 207 ORDER granting #205 motion to appear pro hac vice entered by Clerk of Court. Attorney Jeremy J. Gray for Re/Max LLC allowed to appear pro hac vice. This entry will serve as authorization for the pro hac participation by the attorney. Western District of Missouri Local Rule 5.1 requires documents to be filed electronically. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for a WDMO e-filing account for NextGen CM/ECF. This will enable counsel to electronically file documents and receive electronic notification of filings. Register for a WDMO e-filing account at #PACER. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Geiser, Angel)
February 3, 2020 Filing 206 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Keller Williams Realty, Inc. filed by David R. Buchanan on behalf of Defendant Keller Williams Realty, Inc..(Buchanan, David)
February 3, 2020 Filing 205 Motion to allow Jeremy J. Gray to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-6706619) filed by Danne Wayne Webb on behalf of Re/Max LLC. (Webb, Danne)
January 31, 2020 Set/Reset Hearings: Jury Trial set for 7/11/2022 09:00 AM in Courtroom 7B, Kansas City (SRB) before District Judge Stephen R. Bough. Pretrial Conference set for 6/10/2022 09:00 AM Courtroom 7B, Kansas City (SRB) before District Judge Stephen R. Bough. (Woods, Gloria)
January 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 204 ORDER: Before the Court is RE/MAX, LLCs Motion to Withdraw as Counsel. (Doc. #202 ). For good cause stated the motion is granted. Erin L. Shencopp is removed as counsel of record for Defendant RE/MAX, LLC. Signed on 1/31/2020 by District Judge Stephen R. Bough. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Woods, Gloria)
January 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 203 ORDER: Before the Court is a Joint Motion to Amend Scheduling Order and to Set Status Conferences. (Doc. #201 ). The Motion is granted. The Court will contact the parties to arrange monthly status conferences. Signed on 1/31/2020 by District Judge Stephen R. Bough. (Woods, Gloria)
January 31, 2020 Filing 202 MOTION to withdraw as attorney filed by Danne Wayne Webb on behalf of Re/Max LLC. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 2/14/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Webb, Danne)
January 30, 2020 Filing 201 Joint MOTION to amend/correct Scheduling Order and to set Status Conferences filed by Matthew Lee Dameron on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 2/13/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attorney Matthew Lee Dameron added to party Rhonda Burnett(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew Lee Dameron added to party Scott Burnett(pty:pla))(Dameron, Matthew)
January 30, 2020 Filing 200 RETURN OF SERVICE (non cmp) on FBS Flex re #194 Notice of filing. (Buchanan, David)
January 23, 2020 Filing 199 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Keller Williams Realty, Inc. filed by David R. Buchanan on behalf of Defendant Keller Williams Realty, Inc..(Buchanan, David)
January 23, 2020 Filing 198 RETURN OF SERVICE (non cmp) FBS Flex (Dameron, Matthew)
January 21, 2020 Filing 197 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Re/Max LLC of Defendant RE/MAX, LLC's First Set of Interrogatories to Plaintiffs filed by Stephen James Miller on behalf of Defendant Re/Max LLC.(Miller, Stephen)
January 17, 2020 Filing 196 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Realogy Holdings Corp. of First Production of Documents filed by Kenneth M. Kliebard on behalf of Defendant Realogy Holdings Corp..(Kliebard, Kenneth)
January 16, 2020 Filing 195 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by National Association of Realtors filed by Suzanne L. Wahl on behalf of Defendant National Association of Realtors.(Wahl, Suzanne)
January 8, 2020 Filing 194 NOTICE of filing Notice of Intent to Issue Subpoena to Produce Documents by Keller Williams Realty, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Buchanan, David)
January 7, 2020 Filing 193 NOTICE of filing Amended Notice of Intent to Issue Subpoena to Produce Documents by Rhonda Burnett, Scott Burnett, Ryan Hendrickson, Joshua Sitzer, Amy Winger (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Dameron, Matthew)
January 6, 2020 Filing 192 NOTICE of filing Notice of Intent to Issue Subpoena to Produce Documents by Rhonda Burnett, Scott Burnett, Ryan Hendrickson, Joshua Sitzer, Amy Winger (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Dameron, Matthew)
December 23, 2019 Filing 191 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by National Association of Realtors filed by Gregory Dickinson on behalf of Defendant National Association of Realtors.(Dickinson, Gregory)
December 23, 2019 Filing 190 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Realogy Holdings Corp. filed by Karrie J. Clinkinbeard on behalf of Defendant Realogy Holdings Corp..(Clinkinbeard, Karrie)
December 20, 2019 Filing 189 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by BHH Affiliates, LLC, HSF Affiliates, LLC, HomeServices of America, Inc. HomeServices Defendants' Answer to Plaintiffs' First Set of Interrogatories to Corporate Defendants filed by Brian C Fries on behalf of Defendants BHH Affiliates, LLC, HSF Affiliates, LLC, HomeServices of America, Inc..(Fries, Brian)
December 20, 2019 Filing 188 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Re/Max LLC of Responses and Objections to Plaintiffs' First Set of Interrogatories to Corporate Defendants filed by Stephen James Miller on behalf of Defendant Re/Max LLC.(Miller, Stephen)
December 20, 2019 Filing 187 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by National Association of Realtors Objections and Responses of National Association of Realtors to Plaintiffs First Set of Interrogatories filed by Suzanne L. Wahl on behalf of Defendant National Association of Realtors.(Wahl, Suzanne)
December 20, 2019 Filing 186 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Keller Williams Realty, Inc. filed by David R. Buchanan on behalf of Defendant Keller Williams Realty, Inc..(Buchanan, David)
December 13, 2019 Filing 185 OBJECTIONS (non motions) by Columbia Board of Realtors, Kansas City Regional Association of Realtors, MARIS MLS, Missouri Association of Realtors, Southern Missouri Regional MLS LLC re #152 Notice of filing, #148 Notice of filing, #147 Notice of filing, #149 Notice of filing, #153 Notice of filing Non-Party Subpoenaed Entities Objections to Requests for Production Served Under Defendants Subpoenas. Related document: #152 Notice of filing filed by Re/Max LLC, #148 Notice of filing filed by Keller Williams Realty, Inc., #147 Notice of filing filed by Keller Williams Realty, Inc., #149 Notice of filing filed by Keller Williams Realty, Inc., #153 Notice of filing filed by Re/Max LLC.(Henderson, Robert)
December 13, 2019 Filing 184 OBJECTIONS (non motions) by Columbia Board of Realtors, Kansas City Regional Association of Realtors, MARIS MLS, Missouri Association of Realtors, Southern Missouri Regional MLS LLC re #129 Notice of filing, #130 Notice of filing, #126 Notice of filing, #127 Notice of filing, #128 Notice of filing Non-Party Subpoenaed Entities Objections to Requests for Production Served Under Plaintiffs Subpoenas. Related document: #129 Notice of filing filed by Ryan Hendrickson, Joshua Sitzer, Rhonda Burnett, Amy Winger, Scott Burnett, #130 Notice of filing filed by Ryan Hendrickson, Joshua Sitzer, Rhonda Burnett, Amy Winger, Scott Burnett, #126 Notice of filing filed by Ryan Hendrickson, Joshua Sitzer, Rhonda Burnett, Amy Winger, Scott Burnett, #127 Notice of filing filed by Ryan Hendrickson, Joshua Sitzer, Rhonda Burnett, Amy Winger, Scott Burnett, #128 Notice of filing filed by Ryan Hendrickson, Joshua Sitzer, Rhonda Burnett, Amy Winger, Scott Burnett.(Henderson, Robert)
November 25, 2019 Filing 183 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by National Association of Realtors of Supplement to First Production of Documents filed by Suzanne L. Wahl on behalf of Defendant National Association of Realtors.(Wahl, Suzanne)
November 22, 2019 Filing 182 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Corelogic, Inc. filed by James Dale Lawrence on behalf of Miscellaneous Corelogic, Inc..(Lawrence, James)
November 21, 2019 Filing 181 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Re/Max LLC of subpoena to produce documents to CoreLogic, Inc. filed by Odeshoo Hasdoo on behalf of Defendant Re/Max LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service)(Hasdoo, Odeshoo)
November 18, 2019 Filing 180 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Rhonda Burnett, Scott Burnett, Ryan Hendrickson, Joshua Sitzer, Amy Winger Certificate of Service filed by Matthew Lee Dameron on behalf of Plaintiffs Rhonda Burnett, Scott Burnett, Ryan Hendrickson, Joshua Sitzer, Amy Winger.(Dameron, Matthew)
November 18, 2019 Filing 179 Before the Court is Non-Party CoreLogic, Inc.'s Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. (Doc. #177). Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 6(b)(1)(A), for good cause stated the Motion is granted. Non-party CoreLogic, Inc. is granted an extension of time until and including November 22, 2019, to file its response, objections, or motion to modify Defendant RE/MAX, LLC's subpoena for documents. Signed on 11/18/19 by District Judge Stephen R. Bough. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Diefenbach, Tracy)
November 18, 2019 Filing 178 Before the Court is Non-Party CoreLogic, Inc.'s Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. (Doc. #176). Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 6(b)(1)(A), for good cause stated the Motion is granted. Non-party CoreLogic, Inc. is granted an extension of time until and including November 22, 2019, to file its response, objections, or motion to modify Plaintiffs' subpoena for documents. Signed on 11/18/19 by District Judge Stephen R. Bough. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Diefenbach, Tracy)
November 15, 2019 Filing 177 MOTION for extension of time (Unopposed) regarding Defendant RE/MAX's Subpoena filed by James Dale Lawrence on behalf of Corelogic, Inc.. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 11/29/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Lawrence, James)
November 15, 2019 Filing 176 MOTION for extension of time (Unopposed) filed by James Dale Lawrence on behalf of Corelogic, Inc.. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 11/29/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Lawrence, James)
November 15, 2019 Filing 175 Before the Court is Non-Parties Missouri Association of Realtors, Columbia Board of Realtors, Kansas City Regional Association of Realtors, MARIS MLS, and Southern Missouri Regional MLS LLC's Second Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. (Doc. #174). Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 6(b)(1)(A), for good cause stated the motion is granted. Non-parties Missouri Association of Realtors, Columbia Board of Realtors, Kansas City Regional Association of Realtors, MARIS MLS, and Southern Missouri Regional MLS LLC are granted an extension of time until and including December 13, 2019, to file their responses, objections, or motions to modify Plaintiffs' subpoena for documents. Signed on 11/15/19 by District Judge Stephen R. Bough. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Diefenbach, Tracy)
November 15, 2019 Filing 174 Second MOTION for extension of time filed by Robert A. Henderson on behalf of Columbia Board of Realtors, Kansas City Regional Association of Realtors, MARIS MLS, Missouri Association of Realtors, Southern Missouri Regional MLS LLC. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 11/29/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Henderson, Robert)
November 14, 2019 Filing 173 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by National Association of Realtors of Second Production of Documents filed by Suzanne L. Wahl on behalf of Defendant National Association of Realtors.(Wahl, Suzanne)
November 13, 2019 Filing 172 ANSWER to #38 Amended Complaint, on behalf of BHH Affiliates, LLC, HSF Affiliates, LLC, HomeServices of America, Inc..(Fries, Brian)
November 13, 2019 Filing 171 ANSWER to #38 Amended Complaint, on behalf of Realogy Holdings Corp..(Ochs, Megan)
November 13, 2019 Filing 170 ANSWER to #38 Amended Complaint, on behalf of National Association of Realtors.(Hatfield, Charles)
November 13, 2019 Filing 169 ANSWER to #38 Amended Complaint, on behalf of Re/Max LLC.(Hasdoo, Odeshoo)
November 13, 2019 Filing 168 ANSWER to #38 Amended Complaint, on behalf of Keller Williams Realty, Inc..(Buchanan, David)
November 12, 2019 Filing 167 Before the Court is Non-Parties Missouri Association of Realtors, Kansas City Regional Association of Realtors, and MARIS MLS's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. (Doc. #164). Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 6(b)(1)(A), for good cause stated the motion is granted. Non-parties Missouri Association of Realtors, Kansas City Regional Association of Realtors, and MARIS MLS are granted an extension of time until and including December 13, 2019, to file their responses, objections, or motions to modify Defendant Keller Williams Realty, Inc.'s subpoena for documents. Signed on 11/12/19 by District Judge Stephen R. Bough. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Diefenbach, Tracy)
November 12, 2019 Filing 166 Before the Court is Non-Parties Columbia Board of Realtors and Southern Missouri Regional MLS, LLC's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. (Doc. #165). Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 6(b)(1)(A), for good cause stated the motion is granted. Non-parties Columbia Board of Realtors and Southern Missouri Regional MLS, LLC are granted an extension of time until and including December 13, 2019, to file their responses, objections, or motions to modify Defendant Re/Max LLC,'s subpoena for documents. Signed on 11/12/19 by District Judge Stephen R. Bough. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Diefenbach, Tracy)
November 11, 2019 Filing 165 MOTION for extension of time Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time filed by Robert A. Henderson on behalf of Columbia Board of Realtors, Southern Missouri Regional MLS LLC. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 11/25/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Henderson, Robert)
November 11, 2019 Filing 164 MOTION for extension of time Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time filed by Robert A. Henderson on behalf of Kansas City Regional Association of Realtors, MARIS MLS, Missouri Association of Realtors. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 11/25/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Henderson, Robert)
November 7, 2019 Filing 163 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by All Plaintiffs [First Set of Interrogatories to the National Association of Realtors and First Set of Interrogatories to the Corporate Defendants] filed by Brandon J.B. Boulware on behalf of Plaintiffs Rhonda Burnett, Scott Burnett, Ryan Hendrickson, Joshua Sitzer, Amy Winger.(Boulware, Brandon)
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 162 ORDER granting #158 motion to appear pro hac vice entered by Clerk of Court. Attorney Stephen J. Miller for RE/MAX Holdings, Inc. and Re/Max LLC allowed to appear pro hac vice. This entry will serve as authorization for the pro hac participation by the attorney. Western District of Missouri Local Rule 5.1 requires documents to be filed electronically. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for a WDMO e-filing account for NextGen CM/ECF. This will enable counsel to electronically file documents and receive electronic notification of filings. Register for a WDMO e-filing account at #PACER. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Geiser, Angel)
November 1, 2019 Filing 161 Before the Court is Non-Party CoreLogic, Inc.'s Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. (Doc. #160). Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 6(b)(1)(A), for good cause stated the Motion is granted. Non-party CoreLogic, Inc. is granted an extension of time until and including November 15, 2019, to file its response, objections, or motion to modify Plaintiffs' subpoena for documents. Signed on 11/1/19 by District Judge Stephen R. Bough. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Diefenbach, Tracy)
November 1, 2019 Filing 160 MOTION for extension of time (Unopposed) filed by James Dale Lawrence on behalf of Corelogic, Inc.. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 11/15/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attorney James Dale Lawrence added to party Corelogic, Inc.(pty:misc))(Lawrence, James)
November 1, 2019 Filing 159 NOTICE of appearance by Phillip James Richard Zeeck on behalf of Columbia Board of Realtors, Kansas City Regional Association of Realtors, MARIS MLS, Missouri Association of Realtors, Southern Missouri Regional MLS LLC (Attorney Phillip James Richard Zeeck added to party Columbia Board of Realtors(pty:mov), Attorney Phillip James Richard Zeeck added to party Kansas City Regional Association of Realtors(pty:mov), Attorney Phillip James Richard Zeeck added to party MARIS MLS(pty:mov), Attorney Phillip James Richard Zeeck added to party Missouri Association of Realtors(pty:mov), Attorney Phillip James Richard Zeeck added to party Southern Missouri Regional MLS LLC(pty:mov))(Zeeck, Phillip)
October 31, 2019 Filing 158 Motion to allow Stephen J. Miller to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-6564306) filed by Danne Wayne Webb on behalf of RE/MAX Holdings, Inc., Re/Max LLC. (Webb, Danne)
October 31, 2019 Filing 157 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Re/Max LLC of subpoena to produce documents to T3 Sixty filed by Odeshoo Hasdoo on behalf of Defendant Re/Max LLC.(Hasdoo, Odeshoo)
October 30, 2019 Filing 156 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Re/Max LLC of subpoena to produce documents to Southern Missouri Regional MLS filed by Odeshoo Hasdoo on behalf of Defendant Re/Max LLC.(Hasdoo, Odeshoo)
October 30, 2019 Filing 155 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Re/Max LLC of subpoena to produce documents to Columbia Board of Realtors filed by Odeshoo Hasdoo on behalf of Defendant Re/Max LLC.(Hasdoo, Odeshoo)
October 30, 2019 Filing 154 NOTICE of filing Intent to Issue Subpoena to Produce Documents by Re/Max LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Hasdoo, Odeshoo)
October 30, 2019 Filing 153 NOTICE of filing Intent to Issue Subpoena to Produce Documents by Re/Max LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Hasdoo, Odeshoo)
October 30, 2019 Filing 152 NOTICE of filing Intent to Issue Subpoena to Produce Documents by Re/Max LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Hasdoo, Odeshoo)
October 30, 2019 Filing 151 Before the Court is Missouri Association of Realtors, Columbia Board of Realtors, Kansas City Regional Association of Realtors, MARIS MLS, and Southern Missouri Regional MLS, LLCs (collectively, Subpoenaed Entities) Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. (Doc. #150). For good cause stated the Motion is granted. Subpoenaed Entities' are granted an extension of time until and including November 15, 2019, to file any responses, objections, or modifications to Plaintiffs' subpoenas to produce documents. Signed on 10/30/19 by District Judge Stephen R. Bough. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Diefenbach, Tracy)
October 29, 2019 Filing 150 Consent MOTION for extension of time NONPARTIES' UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO OBJECT OR RESPOND TO THIRD-PARTY SUBPOENAS filed by Robert A. Henderson on behalf of Missouri Association of Realtors, MARIS MLS, Columbia Board of Realtors, Kansas City Regional Association of Realtors, Southern Missouri Regional MLS LLC. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 11/12/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attorney Robert A. Henderson added to party Missouri Association of Realtors(pty:mov), Attorney Robert A. Henderson added to party MARIS MLS(pty:mov), Attorney Robert A. Henderson added to party Columbia Board of Realtors(pty:mov), Attorney Robert A. Henderson added to party Kansas City Regional Association of Realtors(pty:mov), Attorney Robert A. Henderson added to party Southern Missouri Regional MLS LLC(pty:mov))(Henderson, Robert)
October 28, 2019 Filing 149 NOTICE of filing Notice of Intent to Issue Subpoena to Produce Documents by Keller Williams Realty, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Buchanan, David)
October 28, 2019 Filing 148 NOTICE of filing Notice of Intent to Issue Subpoena to Produce Documents by Keller Williams Realty, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Buchanan, David)
October 28, 2019 Filing 147 NOTICE of filing Notice of Intent to Issue Subpoena to Produce Documents by Keller Williams Realty, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Buchanan, David)
October 25, 2019 Filing 146 NOTICE of filing Intent to Issue Subpoena to Produce Documents by Re/Max LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Hasdoo, Odeshoo)
October 24, 2019 Filing 145 NOTICE of filing Supplemental Notice of Intent to Issue Subpoena to Produce Documents by Rhonda Burnett, Scott Burnett, Ryan Hendrickson, Joshua Sitzer, Amy Winger (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Dameron, Matthew)
October 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 144 SCHEDULING ORDER: Pretrial Conference set for 12/10/2021 09:00 AM Courtroom 7B, Kansas City (SRB) before District Judge Stephen R. Bough. Jury Trial set for 1/10/2022 09:00 AM in Courtroom 7B, Kansas City (SRB) before District Judge Stephen R. Bough. Signed on 10/23/19 by District Judge Stephen R. Bough. (Diefenbach, Tracy)
October 23, 2019 Filing 143 RULES OF TRIAL Signed on 10/23/19 by District Judge Stephen R. Bough. (Diefenbach, Tracy)
October 22, 2019 Filing 142 RETURN OF SERVICE (non cmp) Southern Missouri Regional MLS, LLC (Dameron, Matthew)
October 22, 2019 Filing 141 RETURN OF SERVICE (non cmp) Columbia Board of Realtors (Dameron, Matthew)
October 22, 2019 Filing 140 RETURN OF SERVICE (non cmp) Missouri Association of Realtors (Dameron, Matthew)
October 22, 2019 Filing 139 RETURN OF SERVICE (non cmp) T3Sixty (Dameron, Matthew)
October 22, 2019 Filing 138 RETURN OF SERVICE (non cmp) CoreLogic, Inc. (Dameron, Matthew)
October 21, 2019 Filing 137 Minute Entry. Proceedings held before District Judge Stephen R. Bough: SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held on 10/21/2019. Scheduling order to be entered. Time in court: 10:20 am to 10:50 am. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Diefenbach, Tracy)
October 21, 2019 Filing 136 NOTICE of appearance by Andrea S. McMurtry on behalf of Re/Max LLC (Attorney Andrea S. McMurtry added to party Re/Max LLC(pty:dft))(McMurtry, Andrea)
October 18, 2019 Filing 135 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Re/Max LLC of Defendants' First Set of Requests for Production of Documents to Plaintiffs filed by Odeshoo Hasdoo on behalf of Defendant Re/Max LLC.(Hasdoo, Odeshoo)
October 18, 2019 Filing 134 RETURN OF SERVICE (non cmp) Kansas City Regional Association of Realtors (Dameron, Matthew)
October 18, 2019 Filing 133 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by National Association of Realtors of First Production of Documents filed by Suzanne L. Wahl on behalf of Defendant National Association of Realtors.(Wahl, Suzanne)
October 18, 2019 Filing 132 RETURN OF SERVICE (non cmp) Return of Service - MARIS (Dameron, Matthew)
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 131 ORDERED that Defendant National Association of Realtor's Motion toDismiss (Doc. #76) is denied. It is further ORDERED that Corporate Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (Doc. #78) is denied. Signed on 10/16/19 by District Judge Stephen R. Bough. (Diefenbach, Tracy)
October 10, 2019 Filing 130 NOTICE of filing Intent to Issue Subpoena to Produce Documents by Rhonda Burnett, Scott Burnett, Ryan Hendrickson, Joshua Sitzer, Amy Winger (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Dameron, Matthew)
October 10, 2019 Filing 129 NOTICE of filing Intent to Issue Subpoena to Produce Documents by Rhonda Burnett, Scott Burnett, Ryan Hendrickson, Joshua Sitzer, Amy Winger (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Dameron, Matthew)
October 10, 2019 Filing 128 NOTICE of filing Intent to Issue Subpoena to Produce Documents by Rhonda Burnett, Scott Burnett, Ryan Hendrickson, Joshua Sitzer, Amy Winger (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Dameron, Matthew)
October 10, 2019 Filing 127 NOTICE of filing Intent to Issue Subpoena to Produce Documents by Rhonda Burnett, Scott Burnett, Ryan Hendrickson, Joshua Sitzer, Amy Winger (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Dameron, Matthew)
October 10, 2019 Filing 126 NOTICE of filing Intent to Issue Subpoena to Produce Documents by Rhonda Burnett, Scott Burnett, Ryan Hendrickson, Joshua Sitzer, Amy Winger (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Dameron, Matthew)
October 10, 2019 Filing 125 NOTICE of filing Intent to Issue Subpoena to Produce Documents by Rhonda Burnett, Scott Burnett, Ryan Hendrickson, Joshua Sitzer, Amy Winger (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Dameron, Matthew)
October 10, 2019 Filing 124 NOTICE of filing Intent to Issue Subpoena to Produce Documents by Rhonda Burnett, Scott Burnett, Ryan Hendrickson, Joshua Sitzer, Amy Winger (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Dameron, Matthew)
October 7, 2019 Filing 123 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Realogy Holdings Corp. filed by Kenneth M. Kliebard on behalf of Defendant Realogy Holdings Corp..(Kliebard, Kenneth)
October 7, 2019 Filing 122 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by National Association of Realtors filed by Gregory Dickinson on behalf of Defendant National Association of Realtors.(Dickinson, Gregory)
October 7, 2019 Filing 121 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Re/Max LLC filed by Odeshoo Hasdoo on behalf of Defendant Re/Max LLC.(Hasdoo, Odeshoo)
October 7, 2019 Filing 120 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Keller Williams Realty, Inc. filed by David R. Buchanan on behalf of Defendant Keller Williams Realty, Inc..(Buchanan, David)
October 4, 2019 Filing 119 REPLY SUGGESTIONS to motion re #76 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction filed by Gregory Dickinson on behalf of Defendant National Association of Realtors. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Related document(s) #76 ) (Dickinson, Gregory)
October 4, 2019 Filing 118 REPLY SUGGESTIONS to motion re #78 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by David R. Buchanan on behalf of Defendant Keller Williams Realty, Inc.. (Related document(s) #78 ) (Buchanan, David)
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORDER granting #116 motion to appear pro hac vice entered by Clerk of Court. Attorney Suzanne L. Wahl for National Association of Realtors allowed to appear pro hac vice. This entry will serve as authorization for the pro hac participation by the attorney. Western District of Missouri Local Rule 5.1 requires documents to be filed electronically. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for a WDMO e-filing account for NextGen CM/ECF. This will enable counsel to electronically file documents and receive electronic notification of filings. Register for a WDMO e-filing account at #PACER. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Geiser, Angel)
October 2, 2019 Filing 116 Motion to allow Suzanne L. Wahl to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-6519070) filed by Charles W. Hatfield on behalf of National Association of Realtors. (Hatfield, Charles)
October 1, 2019 Filing 115 Before the Court is Plaintiffs' Voluntary Dismissal, Without Prejudice, Only as to Defendant The Long & Foster Companies, Inc. (Doc. #114). The Motion is granted. Defendant The Long & Foster Companies, Inc. is hereby dismissed from this case without prejudice. Signed on 10/1/19 by District Judge Stephen R. Bough. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Diefenbach, Tracy)
September 30, 2019 Filing 114 NOTICE of filing Plaintiffs' Notice of Dismissal, Without Prejudice, Only As To Defendant The Long & Foster Companies, Inc. by Rhonda Burnett, Scott Burnett, Ryan Hendrickson, Joshua Sitzer, Amy Winger (Suhr, Jeremy)
September 30, 2019 Filing 113 NOTICE of filing Statement of Interest by United States (Attachments: #1 Amended Complaint, #2 Realtor Magazine)(Mintz, Steven)
September 30, 2019 Filing 112 NOTICE of appearance by Steven J. Mintz on behalf of United States (Attorney Steven J. Mintz added to party United States(pty:dft))(Mintz, Steven)
September 30, 2019 Filing 111 Before the Court is a Consent Motion to Exceed Page Limit. (Doc. #110). For good cause stated the Motion is granted. The Corporate Defendants and NAR are granted leave to file their reply suggestions in support of their respective motions to dismiss in a length up to and including fifteen pages. Signed on 9/30/19 by District Judge Stephen R. Bough. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Diefenbach, Tracy)
September 30, 2019 Filing 110 Consent MOTION for leave to file excess pages filed by David R. Buchanan on behalf of Keller Williams Realty, Inc.. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 10/15/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Buchanan, David)
September 27, 2019 Filing 109 NOTICE OF HEARING - This is the official notice for this hearing. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. Scheduling Conference set for 10/21/2019 10:30 AM in Courtroom 7B, Kansas City (SRB) before District Judge Stephen R. Bough. (Diefenbach, Tracy)
September 26, 2019 Filing 108 NOTICE of appearance by Danne Wayne Webb on behalf of Re/Max LLC (Webb, Danne)
September 26, 2019 Filing 107 NOTICE of appearance by Danne Wayne Webb on behalf of Re/Max LLC (Webb, Danne)
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER: Before the Court is a Motion of the National Association of Realtors for Reconsideration of Decision not to Certify Denial of Motion to Transfer this Case (Doc. #86). For the reasons stated in this Order, the motion is DENIED. Signed on 9/24/19 by District Judge Stephen R. Bough. (Ellis, Lindsey)
September 23, 2019 Filing 105 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES filed by Brian C Fries on behalf of Defendant The Long & Foster Companies, Inc..(Fries, Brian)
September 23, 2019 Filing 104 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES filed by Brian C Fries on behalf of Defendant HSF Affiliates, LLC.(Fries, Brian)
September 23, 2019 Filing 103 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES filed by Brian C Fries on behalf of Defendant BHH Affiliates, LLC.(Fries, Brian)
September 23, 2019 Filing 102 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES filed by Brian C Fries on behalf of Defendant HomeServices of America, Inc..(Fries, Brian)
September 23, 2019 Filing 101 REPLY SUGGESTIONS to motion re #86 MOTION for reconsideration filed by Gregory Dickinson on behalf of Defendant National Association of Realtors. (Related document(s) #86 ) (Dickinson, Gregory)
September 23, 2019 Filing 100 Amended CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES To Amend document Number 96 filed by David R. Buchanan on behalf of Defendant Keller Williams Realty, Inc..(Buchanan, David)
September 20, 2019 Filing 99 Joint PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER by Rhonda Burnett, Scott Burnett, Ryan Hendrickson, Joshua Sitzer, Amy Winger. (Dameron, Matthew)
September 20, 2019 Filing 98 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES filed by Megan J. Ochs on behalf of Defendant Realogy Holdings Corp..(Ochs, Megan)
September 20, 2019 Filing 97 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES filed by Odeshoo Hasdoo on behalf of Defendant Re/Max LLC.(Hasdoo, Odeshoo)
September 20, 2019 Filing 96 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES filed by David R. Buchanan on behalf of Defendant Keller Williams Realty, Inc..(Buchanan, David)
September 20, 2019 Filing 95 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES filed by Gregory Dickinson on behalf of Defendant National Association of Realtors.(Dickinson, Gregory)
September 20, 2019 Filing 94 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES Certificate of Service filed by Courtney Marie Stout on behalf of Plaintiffs Rhonda Burnett, Scott Burnett, Ryan Hendrickson, Joshua Sitzer, Amy Winger.(Stout, Courtney)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER REGARDING PRODUCTION OF ELECTRONICALLY STORED INFORMATION AND PAPER DOCUMENTS. Signed on 9/12/19 by District Judge Stephen R. Bough. (Diefenbach, Tracy)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 92 PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed on 9/12/19 by District Judge Stephen R. Bough. (Diefenbach, Tracy)
September 12, 2019 Filing 91 Joint MOTION for protective order and ESI Order filed by Brandon J.B. Boulware on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 9/26/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Boulware, Brandon)
September 9, 2019 Filing 90 SUGGESTIONS in opposition re #86 MOTION for reconsideration filed by Courtney Marie Stout on behalf of Plaintiffs Rhonda Burnett, Scott Burnett, Ryan Hendrickson, Joshua Sitzer, Amy Winger. Reply suggestions due by 9/23/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #86 ) (Stout, Courtney)
September 6, 2019 Filing 89 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by All Plaintiffs [First Set of Requests for Production of Documents to NAR and First Set of Requests for Production of Documents to Corporate Defendants] filed by Brandon J.B. Boulware on behalf of Plaintiffs Rhonda Burnett, Scott Burnett, Ryan Hendrickson, Joshua Sitzer, Amy Winger.(Boulware, Brandon)
September 5, 2019 Reset Deadlines as to #76 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction . Reply suggestions due by 10/4/2019 as previously ordered by the Court. (Diefenbach, Tracy)
September 4, 2019 Filing 88 SUGGESTIONS in opposition re #76 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction , #78 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Plaintiffs' Combined Suggestions in Opposition to All Defendants' Motions to Dismiss First Amended Complaint filed by Jeremy M. Suhr on behalf of Plaintiffs Rhonda Burnett, Scott Burnett, Ryan Hendrickson, Joshua Sitzer, Amy Winger. Reply suggestions due by 9/18/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #76 , #78 ) (Suhr, Jeremy)
August 27, 2019 Filing 87 NOTICE of appearance by Courtney Marie Stout on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attorney Courtney Marie Stout added to party Rhonda Burnett(pty:pla), Attorney Courtney Marie Stout added to party Scott Burnett(pty:pla), Attorney Courtney Marie Stout added to party Ryan Hendrickson(pty:pla), Attorney Courtney Marie Stout added to party Joshua Sitzer(pty:pla), Attorney Courtney Marie Stout added to party Amy Winger(pty:pla))(Stout, Courtney)
August 26, 2019 Filing 86 MOTION for reconsideration filed by Gregory Dickinson on behalf of National Association of Realtors. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 9/9/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Dickinson, Gregory)
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER granting #83 motion to appear pro hac vice entered by Clerk of Court. Attorney Karoline E. Jackson for defendants BHH Affiliates, LLC, HSF Affiliates, LLC, HomeServices of America, Inc., and The Long & Foster Companies, Inc. allowed to appear pro hac vice. This entry will serve as authorization for the pro hac participation by the attorney. Western District of Missouri Local Rule 5.1 requires documents to be filed electronically. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for a WDMO e-filing account for NextGen CM/ECF. This will enable counsel to electronically file documents and receive electronic notification of filings. Register for a WDMO e-filing account at #PACER. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Geiser, Angel)
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER: Before the Court is the Corporate Defendants' Motion to Transfer (Doc. #61). The motion is DENIED. Signed on 8/22/19 by District Judge Stephen R. Bough. (Ellis, Lindsey)
August 21, 2019 Filing 83 Motion to allow Karoline E. Jackson to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-6454472) filed by Brian C Fries on behalf of BHH Affiliates, LLC, HSF Affiliates, LLC, HomeServices of America, Inc., The Long & Foster Companies, Inc.. (Fries, Brian)
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER: Motion of the National Association of Realtors to Transfer this Case to the Northern District of Illinois (Doc. #58) is DENIED. Signed on 8/19/19 by District Judge Stephen R. Bough. (Diefenbach, Tracy)
August 6, 2019 Filing 81 NOTICE of appearance by Brian C Fries on behalf of BHH Affiliates, LLC (Attorney Brian C Fries added to party BHH Affiliates, LLC(pty:dft))(Fries, Brian)
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER granting #75 motion to appear pro hac vice entered by Clerk of Court. Attorney David C. Kully for Keller Williams Realty, Inc. allowed to appear pro hac vice. This entry will serve as authorization for the pro hac participation by the attorney. Western District of Missouri Local Rule 5.1 requires documents to be filed electronically. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for a WDMO e-filing account for NextGen CM/ECF. This will enable counsel to electronically file documents and receive electronic notification of filings. Register for a WDMO e-filing account at #PACER. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Geiser, Angel)
August 5, 2019 Filing 79 SUGGESTIONS in support re #78 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Odeshoo Hasdoo on behalf of Defendants BHH Affiliates, LLC, HSF Affiliates, LLC, HomeServices of America, Inc., Keller Williams Realty, Inc., Re/Max LLC, Realogy Holdings Corp., The Long & Foster Companies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Chad Allen, #2 Exhibit HousingWire Article, #3 Exhibit International Real Estate Review Article)(Related document(s) #78 ) (Hasdoo, Odeshoo)
August 5, 2019 Filing 78 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Odeshoo Hasdoo on behalf of BHH Affiliates, LLC, HSF Affiliates, LLC, HomeServices of America, Inc., Keller Williams Realty, Inc., Re/Max LLC, Realogy Holdings Corp., The Long & Foster Companies, Inc.. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 8/19/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attorney Odeshoo Hasdoo added to party Re/Max LLC(pty:dft))(Hasdoo, Odeshoo)
August 5, 2019 Filing 77 SUGGESTIONS in support re #76 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction filed by Gregory Dickinson on behalf of Defendant National Association of Realtors. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Katie Johnson)(Related document(s) #76 ) (Dickinson, Gregory)
August 5, 2019 Filing 76 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , MOTION to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction filed by Gregory Dickinson on behalf of National Association of Realtors. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 8/19/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Dickinson, Gregory)
August 5, 2019 Filing 75 Motion to allow David C. Kully to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-6430897) filed by David R. Buchanan on behalf of Keller Williams Realty, Inc.. (Buchanan, David)
July 30, 2019 Filing 74 NOTICE of filing Sur-Reply Suggestions in Opposition to Motion of Defendant National Association of Realtors to Transfer this Case to the Northern District of Illinois by Rhonda Burnett, Scott Burnett, Ryan Hendrickson, Joshua Sitzer, Amy Winger re #58 MOTION to reassign/transfer case (Boulware, Brandon)
July 30, 2019 Filing 73 Before this Court is Plaintiffs Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply Suggestions in Opposition to Motion of Defendant National Association of Realtors to Transfer This Case to the Northern District of Illinois. (Doc. #72). The motion is granted. Plaintiffs are granted leave to file a sur-reply of a length not to exceed five (5) pages on or before July 31, 2019. Signed on 7/30/19 by District Judge Stephen R. Bough. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Diefenbach, Tracy)
July 30, 2019 Filing 72 MOTION for leave to file Sur-Reply Suggestions in Opposition to Motion of Defendant National Association of Realtors to Transfer This Case to the Northern District of Illinois filed by Brandon J.B. Boulware on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 8/13/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-[Proposed] Sur-Reply Suggestions in Opposition)(Boulware, Brandon)
July 29, 2019 Filing 71 REPLY SUGGESTIONS to motion re #58 MOTION to reassign/transfer case filed by Gregory Dickinson on behalf of Defendant National Association of Realtors. (Related document(s) #58 ) (Dickinson, Gregory)
July 29, 2019 Filing 70 REPLY SUGGESTIONS to motion re #61 MOTION for order filed by Megan J. Ochs on behalf of Defendants HomeServices of America, Inc., Keller Williams Realty, Inc., Re/Max LLC, Realogy Holdings Corp.. (Related document(s) #61 ) (Ochs, Megan)
July 29, 2019 Filing 69 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by All Plaintiffs. The Long & Foster Companies, Inc. served on 6/27/2019, answer due 7/18/2019. (Boulware, Brandon)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER: Before this Court is Defendants' Consent Motion to Exceed Page Limit. (Doc. #67). For good cause stated the motion is granted. Defendants are granted leave to file their suggestions in support of their respective motions to dismiss in a length up to and including twenty-five (25) pages. Plaintiffs are granted leave to file their suggestions in opposition to Defendants' motions to dismiss in a length up to and including twenty-five (25) pages, to the extent that Plaintiffs file separate oppositions, or in a length up to and including fifty (50) pages, to the extent Plaintiffs file a joint opposition. Signed on 7/29/19 by District Judge Stephen R. Bough. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Ellis, Lindsey)
July 26, 2019 Filing 67 Consent MOTION for leave to file excess pages filed by Karrie J. Clinkinbeard on behalf of Realogy Holdings Corp.. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 8/9/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Clinkinbeard, Karrie)
July 23, 2019 Reset Deadlines per document 64 as to #61 MOTION to Transfer and #58 MOTION to reassign/transfer case . Reply suggestions due by 7/29/2019. (Diefenbach, Tracy)
July 22, 2019 Filing 66 SUGGESTIONS in opposition re #61 MOTION for order filed by Brandon J.B. Boulware on behalf of Plaintiffs Rhonda Burnett, Scott Burnett, Ryan Hendrickson, Joshua Sitzer, Amy Winger. Reply suggestions due by 8/5/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Related document(s) #61 ) (Boulware, Brandon)
July 22, 2019 Filing 65 SUGGESTIONS in opposition re #58 MOTION to reassign/transfer case filed by Brandon J.B. Boulware on behalf of Plaintiffs Rhonda Burnett, Scott Burnett, Ryan Hendrickson, Joshua Sitzer, Amy Winger. Reply suggestions due by 8/5/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Conference Tweets, #2 Exhibit B-NAR Handbook, #3 Exhibit C-Summary Chart)(Related document(s) #58 ) (Boulware, Brandon)
July 19, 2019 Filing 64 Before this Court is Plaintiffs' Consent Motion for Extension of Time. (Doc. #63). For good cause stated the motion is granted. Plaintiffs are granted an extension of time until and including July 22, 2019, to file their response to Defendant National Association of Realtors' Motion to Transfer and Corporate Defendants' Motion to Transfer. Defendants are granted an extension of time until and including July 29, 2019, to file their replies. Signed on 7/19/19 by District Judge Stephen R. Bough. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Diefenbach, Tracy)
July 18, 2019 Filing 63 Consent MOTION for extension of time filed by Brandon J.B. Boulware on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 8/1/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Boulware, Brandon)
July 12, 2019 Pursuant to the order entered 7/2/19 - Deadlines reset as to #58 and #61 MOTIONs to transfer case - Suggestions in opposition due by 7/19/2019. (Diefenbach, Tracy)
July 10, 2019 Filing 62 SUGGESTIONS in support re #61 MOTION to change venue filed by Karrie J. Clinkinbeard on behalf of Defendants BHH Affiliates, LLC, HSF Affiliates, LLC, HomeServices of America, Inc., Keller Williams Realty, Inc., Re/Max LLC, Realogy Holdings Corp., The Long & Foster Companies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D)(Related document(s) #61 ) (Clinkinbeard, Karrie)
July 10, 2019 Filing 61 MOTION to transfer filed by Karrie J. Clinkinbeard on behalf of BHH Affiliates, LLC, HSF Affiliates, LLC, HomeServices of America, Inc., Keller Williams Realty, Inc., Re/Max LLC, Realogy Holdings Corp., The Long & Foster Companies, Inc.. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 7/24/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court.)(Clinkinbeard, Karrie) Modified on 7/11/2019 to correct filing event, docket text and to correct Attorney Clinkinbeard's representation of the proper party of Realogy Holdings Corp only. Document remains the same; NEF regenerated to all parties (Ellis, Lindsey).
July 10, 2019 Filing 60 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Karrie J. Clinkinbeard on behalf of Defendant Realogy Holdings Corp..(Clinkinbeard, Karrie)
July 10, 2019 Filing 59 SUGGESTIONS in support re #58 MOTION to reassign/transfer case filed by Gregory Dickinson on behalf of Defendant National Association of Realtors. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of John Pierpoint)(Related document(s) #58 ) (Dickinson, Gregory)
July 10, 2019 Filing 58 MOTION to reassign/transfer case filed by Gregory Dickinson on behalf of National Association of Realtors. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 7/24/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Dickinson, Gregory)
July 10, 2019 Filing 57 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Gregory Dickinson on behalf of Defendant National Association of Realtors.(Dickinson, Gregory)
July 10, 2019 Filing 56 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Danne Wayne Webb on behalf of Defendant Re/Max LLC.(Attorney Danne Wayne Webb added to party Re/Max LLC(pty:dft))(Webb, Danne)
July 10, 2019 Filing 55 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Brian C Fries on behalf of Defendant The Long & Foster Companies, Inc..(Attorney Brian C Fries added to party The Long & Foster Companies, Inc.(pty:dft))(Fries, Brian)
July 10, 2019 Filing 54 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Brian C Fries on behalf of Defendant HSF Affiliates, LLC.(Attorney Brian C Fries added to party HSF Affiliates, LLC(pty:dft))(Fries, Brian)
July 10, 2019 Filing 53 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Brian C Fries on behalf of Defendant HomeServices of America, Inc..(Fries, Brian)
July 10, 2019 Filing 52 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by David R. Buchanan on behalf of Defendant Keller Williams Realty, Inc..(Buchanan, David)
July 8, 2019 Filing 51 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by All Plaintiffs. BHH Affiliates, LLC served on 6/27/2019, answer due 7/18/2019. (Boulware, Brandon)
July 8, 2019 Filing 50 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by All Plaintiffs. HSF Affiliates, LLC served on 6/27/2019, answer due 7/18/2019. (Boulware, Brandon)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER: On July 1, 2019, the Court held a discovery dispute teleconference. In accordance with its rulings at the teleconference, the Court orders the following: 1) Defendants shall file their motions pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1406 on or before July 10, 2019; 2) Plaintiffs shall file their responses on or before July 19, 2019; 3) Defendants shall file their replies on or before July 26, 2019; and 4) the parties shall not conduct their conference required under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f) or make or arrange their Rule 26(a)(1) initial disclosures until this Court has ruled on Defendants' 1406 motions. Signed on 7/2/19 by District Judge Stephen R. Bough. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Diefenbach, Tracy)
July 1, 2019 Filing 48 Minute Entry. Proceedings held before District Judge Stephen R. Bough: DISCOVERY DISPUTE TELEPHONE CONFERENCE held on 7/1/2019. Order to be entered. Time in court: 3:30 pm to 3:55 pm. To order a transcript of this hearing please contact Gayle Wambolt, 816-512-5641, gayle_wambolt@mow.uscourts.gov. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Diefenbach, Tracy)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER granting #45 & #46 motions to appear pro hac vice entered by Clerk of Court. Attorneys Gregory Dickinson and Jack R. Bierig for National Association of Realtors allowed to appear pro hac vice. This entry will serve as authorization for the pro hac participation by the attorney. Western District of Missouri Local Rule 5.1 requires documents to be filed electronically. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for a WDMO e-filing account for NextGen CM/ECF. This will enable counsel to electronically file documents and receive electronic notification of filings. Register for a WDMO e-filing account at #PACER. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Geiser, Angel)
June 25, 2019 Filing 46 Motion to allow Jack R. Bierig to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-6371401) filed by Charles W. Hatfield on behalf of National Association of Realtors. (Hatfield, Charles)
June 25, 2019 Filing 45 Motion to allow Gregory Dickinson to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-6371351) filed by Charles W. Hatfield on behalf of National Association of Realtors. (Hatfield, Charles)
June 25, 2019 Filing 44 NOTICE OF HEARING - This is the official notice for this hearing. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. Discovery Dispute Telephone Conference set for 7/1/2019 03:30 PM in Chambers before District Judge Stephen R. Bough. Conference call information emailed to counsel. (Diefenbach, Tracy)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER denying #33 motion to appear pro hac vice entered by Clerk of Court. The court has denied your pro hac vice motion because the attorney seeking admission was not a member of a Federal Court at the time of the filing of the motion. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Geiser, Angel)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER granting #30 , #31 , #32 , #34 motion to appear pro hac vice entered by Clerk of Court. Attorneys Timothy Ray, Martin G. Durkin, Anna P. Hayes, William F. Farley for Keller Williams Realty, Inc. allowed to appear pro hac vice. This entry will serve as authorization for the pro hac participation by the attorney. Western District of Missouri Local Rule 5.1 requires documents to be filed electronically. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for a WDMO e-filing account for NextGen CM/ECF. This will enable counsel to electronically file documents and receive electronic notification of filings. Register for a WDMO e-filing account at #PACER. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Geiser, Angel)
June 24, 2019 Filing 41 NOTICE of appearance by Alex Barrett on behalf of National Association of Realtors (Attorney Alex Barrett added to party National Association of Realtors(pty:dft))(Barrett, Alex)
June 24, 2019 Filing 40 NOTICE of appearance by Charles W. Hatfield on behalf of National Association of Realtors (Attorney Charles W. Hatfield added to party National Association of Realtors(pty:dft))(Hatfield, Charles)
June 24, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to BHH Affiliates, LLC, HSF Affiliates, LLC, Re/Max LLC, The Long & Foster Companies, Inc.. (Woods, Gloria)
June 24, 2019 Filing 39 Before the Court is a Stipulation of Dismissal without Prejudice as to RE/MAX Holdings, Inc. (Doc. #37). Accordingly, RE/MAX Holdings, Inc. is dismissed from this action without prejudice. Signed on 6/24/19 by District Judge Stephen R. Bough. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Diefenbach, Tracy)
June 21, 2019 Filing 38 AMENDED COMPLAINT [First Amended] against HomeServices of America, Inc., Keller Williams Realty, Inc., National Association of Realtors, Realogy Holdings Corp., BHH Affiliates, LLC, HSF Affiliates, LLC, The Long & Foster Companies, Inc., Re/Max LLC filed by Brandon J.B. Boulware on behalf of All Plaintiffs.(Boulware, Brandon)
June 21, 2019 Filing 37 STIPULATION of Dismissal without Prejudice as to Re/Max Holdings, Inc. by Joshua Sitzer, Amy Winger. (Boulware, Brandon)
June 19, 2019 Filing 36 Before this Court is Plaintiffs' Consent Motion for Filing of Amended Class Action Complaint and Briefing Schedule. (Doc. #35). Because Defendants consent and leave to amend pleadings should be freely given when justice so requires, the motion for leave to file is granted. Accordingly, Plaintiffs are granted leave to file their Amended Class Action Complaint on or before June 21, 2019. For good cause stated, the motion for briefing schedule is granted. Accordingly, the Court adopts the following briefing schedule regarding Plaintiffs' Amended Class Action Complaint: Defendants shall file their response to Plaintiffs' Amended Class Action Complaint on or before August 5, 2019; Plaintiffs shall file their opposition to Defendants' response on or before September 4, 2019; and Defendants shall file their reply in support of their response on or before October 4, 2019. Signed on 6/19/19 by District Judge Stephen R. Bough. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Diefenbach, Tracy)
June 19, 2019 Filing 35 Consent MOTION for order for Filing of Amended Class Action Complaint and Briefing Schedule filed by Brandon J.B. Boulware on behalf of Joshua Sitzer, Amy Winger. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 7/3/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Boulware, Brandon)
June 18, 2019 Filing 34 Motion to allow William F. Farley to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-6362143) filed by David R. Buchanan on behalf of Keller Williams Realty, Inc.. (Buchanan, David) (Main Document 34 replaced on 6/24/2019) (Geiser, Angel).
June 18, 2019 Filing 33 Motion to allow David C. Kully to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-6362140) filed by David R. Buchanan on behalf of Keller Williams Realty, Inc.. (Buchanan, David)
June 18, 2019 Filing 32 Motion to allow Anna P. Hayes to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-6362125) filed by David R. Buchanan on behalf of Keller Williams Realty, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Buchanan, David) (Main Document 32 replaced on 6/24/2019) (Geiser, Angel).
June 18, 2019 Filing 31 Motion to allow Martin G. Durkin to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-6362109) filed by David R. Buchanan on behalf of Keller Williams Realty, Inc.. (Buchanan, David) (Main Document 31 replaced on 6/24/2019) (Geiser, Angel).
June 18, 2019 Filing 30 Motion to allow Timothy Ray to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-6362080) filed by David R. Buchanan on behalf of Keller Williams Realty, Inc.. (Buchanan, David) (Main Document 30 replaced on 6/25/2019) (Geiser, Angel).
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting #27 & #28 motions to appear pro hac vice entered by Clerk of Court. Attorneys Jay N. Varon and Jennifer M. Keas for HomeServices of America, Inc. allowed to appear pro hac vice. This entry will serve as authorization for the pro hac participation by the attorney. Western District of Missouri Local Rule 5.1 requires documents to be filed electronically. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for a WDMO e-filing account for NextGen CM/ECF. This will enable counsel to electronically file documents and receive electronic notification of filings. Register for a WDMO e-filing account at #PACER. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Geiser, Angel)
June 12, 2019 Filing 28 Motion to allow Jennifer M. Keas to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-6354925) filed by Brian C Fries on behalf of HomeServices of America, Inc.. (Fries, Brian)
June 12, 2019 Filing 27 Motion to allow Jay N. Varon to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-6354879) filed by Brian C Fries on behalf of HomeServices of America, Inc.. (Fries, Brian)
June 11, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE of appearance by David R. Buchanan on behalf of Keller Williams Realty, Inc. (Attorney David R. Buchanan added to party Keller Williams Realty, Inc.(pty:dft))(Buchanan, David)
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting #23 & #24 motion to appear pro hac vice entered by Clerk of Court. Attorneys Kenneth M. Kliebard and Stacey A. Mahoney for Realogy Holdings Corp. allowed to appear pro hac vice. This entry will serve as authorization for the pro hac participation by the attorney. Western District of Missouri Local Rule 5.1 requires documents to be filed electronically. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for a WDMO e-filing account for NextGen CM/ECF. This will enable counsel to electronically file documents and receive electronic notification of filings. Register for a WDMO e-filing account at #PACER. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Geiser, Angel)
June 4, 2019 Filing 24 Motion to allow Stacey Ann Mahoney to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-6341306) filed by Megan J. Ochs on behalf of Realogy Holdings Corp.. (Ochs, Megan)
June 4, 2019 Filing 23 Motion to allow Kenneth M. Kliebard to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-6341200) filed by Megan J. Ochs on behalf of Realogy Holdings Corp.. (Ochs, Megan)
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting admission pro hac vice for Paula Render re 20 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice #14 . Order denied in error, now granted. Paula Render allowed to enter pro hac vice for defendant on behalf of RE/MAX Holdings, Inc. Western District of Missouri Local Rule 5.1 requires documents to be filed electronically. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for a WDMO e-filing account for NextGen CM/ECF. This will enable counsel to electronically file documents and receive electronic notification of filings. Register for a WDMO e-filing account at PACER. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Geiser, Angel) Modified on 6/3/2019 (Russel, Jeri).
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #16 , #17 , #18 motion to appear pro hac vice entered by Clerk of Court. Attorneys Robert D MacGill, Matthew B Barr, and Matthew T Ciulla for HomeServices of America, Inc. allowed to appear pro hac vice. This entry will serve as authorization for the pro hac participation by the attorney. Western District of Missouri Local Rule 5.1 requires documents to be filed electronically. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for a WDMO e-filing account for NextGen CM/ECF. This will enable counsel to electronically file documents and receive electronic notification of filings. Register for a WDMO e-filing account at #PACER. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Geiser, Angel)
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER denying #14 motion to appear pro hac vice entered by Clerk of Court in regards to Paula Render. Attorney is not eligible to enter through pro hac vice motion. Attorney must reinstate in the Western District before being eligible to practice in this court. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Geiser, Angel)
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #12 & #13 motion to appear pro hac vice entered by Clerk of Court. Attorneys Erin Shencopp and Odeshoo Hasdoo for RE/MAX Holdings, Inc. allowed to appear pro hac vice. This entry will serve as authorization for the pro hac participation by the attorney. Western District of Missouri Local Rule 5.1 requires documents to be filed electronically. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for a WDMO e-filing account for NextGen CM/ECF. This will enable counsel to electronically file documents and receive electronic notification of filings. Register for a WDMO e-filing account at #PACER. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Geiser, Angel)
May 30, 2019 Filing 18 Motion to allow Matthew T. Ciulla to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-6334183) filed by Brian C Fries on behalf of HomeServices of America, Inc.. (Fries, Brian) (Main Document 18 replaced on 6/3/2019) (Geiser, Angel).
May 30, 2019 Filing 17 Motion to allow Matthew B. Barr to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-6334157) filed by Brian C Fries on behalf of HomeServices of America, Inc.. (Fries, Brian) Modified on 5/30/2019 to correct clerical error on docket text only; document remains the same; NEF regenerated (Ellis, Lindsey). (Main Document 17 replaced on 6/3/2019) (Geiser, Angel).
May 30, 2019 Filing 16 Motion to allow Robert D. MacGill to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-6334075) filed by Brian C Fries on behalf of HomeServices of America, Inc.. (Fries, Brian) (Main Document 16 replaced on 6/3/2019) (Geiser, Angel).
May 29, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of appearance by Brian C Fries on behalf of HomeServices of America, Inc. (Attorney Brian C Fries added to party HomeServices of America, Inc.(pty:dft))(Fries, Brian)
May 29, 2019 Filing 14 Motion to allow Paula Render to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-6331809) filed by Danne Wayne Webb on behalf of RE/MAX Holdings, Inc.. (Webb, Danne) (Main Document 14 replaced on 6/3/2019) (Geiser, Angel).
May 29, 2019 Filing 13 Motion to allow Odeshoo Hasdoo to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-6331791) filed by Danne Wayne Webb on behalf of RE/MAX Holdings, Inc.. (Webb, Danne)
May 29, 2019 Filing 12 Motion to allow Erin Shencopp to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-6331742) filed by Danne Wayne Webb on behalf of RE/MAX Holdings, Inc.. (Attorney Danne Wayne Webb added to party RE/MAX Holdings, Inc.(pty:dft))(Webb, Danne)
May 28, 2019 NOTICE OF DOCKET MODIFICATION. A modification has been made to the document filed on 5/28/19 as Document No. 10, Notice of Appearance. Attorney was associated with correct party. This is a text entry only - no document is attached. (James, Carrie)
May 28, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of appearance by Karrie J. Clinkinbeard on behalf of Realogy Holdings Corp. (Attorney Karrie J. Clinkinbeard added to party Realogy Holdings Corp.(pty:dft))(Clinkinbeard, Karrie)
May 28, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of appearance by Megan J. Ochs on behalf of Realogy Holdings Corp, Inc. (Ochs, Megan) Modified on 5/28/2019 to correct attorney association(James, Carrie).
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: Before the Court is a Consent Motion for Order Extending Time for Defendants to File Motions to Dismiss and Setting Briefing Schedule. (Doc. #8). For good cause stated the Motion is granted. Defendants are granted an extension of time until and including June 21, 2019, to file motions to dismiss or otherwise respond to the Complaint. Plaintiffs' oppositions to motions to dismiss shall be filed on or before July 19, 2019. Defendants' replies shall be filed on or before August 16, 2019. Signed on 5/24/19 by District Judge Stephen R. Bough. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Ellis, Lindsey)
May 23, 2019 Filing 8 Consent MOTION for extension of time [for Defendants to File Motions to Dismiss and Setting Briefing Schedule] filed by Jeremy M. Suhr on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 6/6/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Suhr, Jeremy)
May 10, 2019 Filing 7 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by All Plaintiffs. RE/MAX Holdings, Inc. served on 5/6/2019, answer due 5/28/2019. (Boulware, Brandon)
May 10, 2019 Filing 6 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by All Plaintiffs. Realogy Holdings Corp. served on 5/6/2019, answer due 5/28/2019. (Boulware, Brandon)
May 10, 2019 Filing 5 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by All Plaintiffs. National Association of Realtors served on 5/6/2019, answer due 5/28/2019. (Boulware, Brandon)
May 10, 2019 Filing 4 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by All Plaintiffs. Keller Williams Realty, Inc. served on 5/6/2019, answer due 5/28/2019. (Boulware, Brandon)
May 10, 2019 Filing 3 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by All Plaintiffs. HomeServices of America, Inc. served on 5/6/2019, answer due 5/28/2019. (Boulware, Brandon)
April 30, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to HomeServices of America, Inc., Keller Williams Realty, Inc., National Association of Realtors, RE/MAX Holdings, Inc., Realogy Holdings Corp.. (Woods, Gloria)
April 30, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Woods, Gloria)
April 29, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Brandon J.B. Boulware on behalf of Joshua Sitzer, Amy Winger. Filing fee $400, receipt number AMOWDC-6289926. Service due by 7/29/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Boulware, Brandon)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sitzer et al v. National Association of Realtors et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RE/MAX Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Paula W. Render
Represented By: Erin Shencopp
Represented By: Danne Wayne Webb
Represented By: Odeshoo Hasdoo
Represented By: Stephen James Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Realogy Holdings Corp.
Represented By: Karrie J. Clinkinbeard
Represented By: Megan J. Ochs
Represented By: Kenneth M. Kliebard
Represented By: Stacey A. Mahoney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Association of Realtors
Represented By: Jack R. Bierig
Represented By: Gregory Dickinson
Represented By: Alex Barrett
Represented By: Charles W. Hatfield
Represented By: Suzanne L. Wahl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keller Williams Realty, Inc.
Represented By: Martin G. Durkin, Jr
Represented By: Anna P. Hayes
Represented By: William F. Farley
Represented By: Timothy Ray
Represented By: David R. Buchanan
Represented By: David C. Kully
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HomeServices of America, Inc.
Represented By: Jennifer M. Keas
Represented By: Robert D MacGill
Represented By: Jay N. Varon
Represented By: Matthew B Barr
Represented By: Brian C Fries
Represented By: Matthew T Ciulla
Represented By: Karoline E. Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Re/Max LLC
Represented By: Paula W. Render
Represented By: Danne Wayne Webb
Represented By: Erin Shencopp
Represented By: Odeshoo Hasdoo
Represented By: Jeremy J. Gray
Represented By: Stephen James Miller
Represented By: Andrea S. McMurtry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Long & Foster Companies, Inc.
Represented By: Brian C Fries
Represented By: Karoline E. Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HSF Affiliates, LLC
Represented By: Brian C Fries
Represented By: Karoline E. Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BHH Affiliates, LLC
Represented By: Karoline E. Jackson
Represented By: Brian C Fries
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua Sitzer
Represented By: Brandon J.B. Boulware
Represented By: Jeremy M. Suhr
Represented By: Erin D Lawrence
Represented By: Amy R Jackson
Represented By: Eric L. Dirks
Represented By: Matthew Lee Dameron
Represented By: Courtney Marie Stout
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amy Winger
Represented By: Brandon J.B. Boulware
Represented By: Jeremy M. Suhr
Represented By: Erin D Lawrence
Represented By: Amy R Jackson
Represented By: Eric L. Dirks
Represented By: Matthew Lee Dameron
Represented By: Courtney Marie Stout
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Burnett
Represented By: Brandon J.B. Boulware
Represented By: Jeremy M. Suhr
Represented By: Erin D Lawrence
Represented By: Amy R Jackson
Represented By: Eric L. Dirks
Represented By: Matthew Lee Dameron
Represented By: Courtney Marie Stout
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rhonda Burnett
Represented By: Brandon J.B. Boulware
Represented By: Jeremy M. Suhr
Represented By: Erin D Lawrence
Represented By: Amy R Jackson
Represented By: Eric L. Dirks
Represented By: Matthew Lee Dameron
Represented By: Courtney Marie Stout
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryan Hendrickson
Represented By: Brandon J.B. Boulware
Represented By: Jeremy M. Suhr
Represented By: Erin D Lawrence
Represented By: Amy R Jackson
Represented By: Eric L. Dirks
Represented By: Matthew Lee Dameron
Represented By: Courtney Marie Stout
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Corelogic, Inc.
Represented By: James Dale Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: MARIS MLS
Represented By: Robert A. Henderson
Represented By: Phillip James Richard Zeeck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Kansas City Regional Association of Realtors
Represented By: Robert A. Henderson
Represented By: Phillip James Richard Zeeck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Missouri Association of Realtors
Represented By: Robert A. Henderson
Represented By: Phillip James Richard Zeeck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Columbia Board of Realtors
Represented By: Robert A. Henderson
Represented By: Phillip James Richard Zeeck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Southern Missouri Regional MLS LLC
Represented By: Robert A. Henderson
Represented By: Phillip James Richard Zeeck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: United States
Represented By: Steven J. Mintz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?