Sorenson v. Farmers Insurance Company, Inc.

Plaintiff: Sorenson Richard and Richard Sorenson
Defendant: Farmers Insurance Company, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2019cv00386
Filed: May 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Beth Phillips
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 3/20/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 4/21/2020. Teleconference set for 9/3/2020 10:00 AM. Pretrial Conference set for 9/18/2020, 1:30 PM Courtroom 7A, Kansas City (BP) before Chief District Judge Beth Phillips. Jury Trial set for 9/28/2020, 8:30 AM in Courtroom 7A, Kansas City (BP) before Chief District Judge Beth Phillips. Signed on 7/10/19 by Chief District Judge Beth Phillips. (Cordell, Annette)
July 8, 2019 Filing 14 PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER by Farmers Insurance Company, Inc.. (Wolf, Timothy)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER. The parties were ordered to file a proposed scheduling order on or before July 1, 2019 (see Doc. 7, Rule 16 Order). To date, none has been filed. The parties are ordered to confer and file a proposed scheduling order by July 26, 2019. Signed on 7/8/19 by Chief District Judge Beth Phillips. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Cordell, Annette)
June 24, 2019 Filing 12 DESIGNATION of Mediator Certificate by Farmers Insurance Company, Inc.. (Wolf, Timothy)
June 12, 2019 Filing 11 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Richard Sorenson. (Shumate, Travis)
June 12, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of appearance by Travis W. Shumate on behalf of Richard Sorenson (Attorney Travis W. Shumate added to party Richard Sorenson(pty:pla))(Shumate, Travis) (Main Document 10 replaced on 6/12/2019 at the request of filer wrong document selected during upload; NEF regenerated) (Ellis, Lindsey).
June 12, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Farmers Insurance Company, Inc. re First Interrogatories, First Request for Production and First Requests for Admissions to Plaintiff filed by Timothy J Wolf on behalf of Defendant Farmers Insurance Company, Inc..(Wolf, Timothy)
May 22, 2019 NOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your Designation of Mediator is due soon (filed as an ADR event in CM/ECF). See Notice of Inclusion and MAP General Order for specifics. (ADI, MAP)
May 21, 2019 Filing 8 Defendant Farmers Insurance Company, Inc.'s ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand on behalf of Farmers Insurance Company, Inc..(Wolf, Timothy) (Additional attachment(s) added at counsel's request on 5/21/2019: #1 Exhibit A) (Houston, Kiambu).
May 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER. RULE 16 NOTICE. Proposed scheduling order due by 7/1/2019. Rule 26 conference due by 6/17/2019. Signed on 5/17/19 by Chief District Judge Beth Phillips. (Cordell, Annette)
May 15, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Woods, Gloria)
May 15, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of filing Notice to Plaintiff of Filing Notice of Removal by Farmers Insurance Company, Inc. (Wolf, Timothy)
May 15, 2019 Filing 4 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS Certificate filed by Timothy J Wolf on behalf of Defendant Farmers Insurance Company, Inc..(Wolf, Timothy)
May 15, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of appearance by Lucas Ude on behalf of Farmers Insurance Company, Inc. (Attorney Lucas Ude added to party Farmers Insurance Company, Inc.(pty:dft))(Ude, Lucas)
May 15, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of appearance by Timothy J Wolf on behalf of Farmers Insurance Company, Inc. (Wolf, Timothy)
May 15, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Johnson County, Missouri County, case number 1916-CV11030, filed by Timothy J Wolf on behalf of Farmers Insurance Company, Inc.. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMOWDC-6315600. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Wolf, Timothy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sorenson v. Farmers Insurance Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sorenson Richard
Represented By: Scott S. Bethune
Represented By: James Stigall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Sorenson
Represented By: Scott S. Bethune
Represented By: James Stigall
Represented By: Travis W. Shumate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Farmers Insurance Company, Inc.
Represented By: Lucas Ude
Represented By: Timothy J Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?