Bowers v. Freshstart Restoration, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Eric Bowers
Defendant: Ben Fetzer, Katie Fetzer and Freshstart Restoration, LLC
Case Number: 4:2019cv00435
Filed: June 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Roseann Ketchmark
Referring Judge: Ortrie D Smith
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORAL ORDER MAP Mediation Conference set for 10/17/2019 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 6E, Kansas City (LMC) before Magistrate Judge Lajuana M. Counts. The parties are directed to review Judge Counts' Standing Order for MAP Mediations and Settlement Conferences located on the Court's website at https://www.mow.uscourts.gov/judges/counts and comply with its directives. Furthermore, the parties are directed to review the MAP General Order found on the Mediation and Assessment Program section of the Court's website. The parties are directed to contact chambers forthwith if they believe the mediation conference will exceed half-a-day. Signed on July 16, 2019 by Magistrate Judge Lajuana M. Counts. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Clinton, Erica)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 RULE 16 NOTICE. Proposed scheduling order due by 8/12/2019. Rule 26 conference due by 7/28/2019. Signed on 6/28/2019 by District Judge Roseann Ketchmark. (Stout, Courtney)
June 27, 2019 Filing 9 Defendants ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand of all issues on behalf of Freshstart Restoration, LLC.(Attorney Kevin J Berger added to party Freshstart Restoration, LLC(pty:dft))(Berger, Kevin)
June 14, 2019 Filing 8 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Eric Bowers. Freshstart Restoration, LLC served on 6/9/2019, answer due 7/1/2019. (Voytas, Richard)
June 14, 2019 Filing 7 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Eric Bowers. Ben Fetzer served on 6/9/2019, answer due 7/1/2019. (Voytas, Richard)
June 14, 2019 Filing 6 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Eric Bowers. Katie Fetzer served on 6/9/2019, answer due 7/1/2019. (Voytas, Richard)
June 6, 2019 Filing 5 (DOCUMENT DELETED; ENTERED IN ERROR). ***Remark - AO-121 Report on the Filing or Determination of An Action or Appeal Regarding a Copyright; copy sent to Register of Copyrights via first class mail. (Woods, Gloria). Modified on 6/6/2019: Document deleted as it was entered in the wrong case. NEF regenerated. (Moore, Terri)
June 5, 2019 Filing 4 ADMINISTRATIVE TRANSFER. With the consent of the Honorable Judge Ortrie D. Smith, this case is randomly reassigned to the Honorable Judge Roseann Ketchmark for all further proceedings. Please note the new case number: 4:19-00435-CV-W-RK. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Moore, Terri)
June 5, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Ben Fetzer, Katie Fetzer, Freshstart Restoration, LLC. (Woods, Gloria)
June 5, 2019 Filing 3 ***Remark - AO-121 Report on the Filing or Determination of An Action or Appeal Regarding a Copyright; copy sent to Register of Copyrights via first class mail. (Woods, Gloria)
June 5, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to United States Magistrate Judge Lajuana M. Counts. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Woods, Gloria)
June 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Ben Fetzer, Katie Fetzer, Freshstart Restoration, LLC filed by Richard A. Voytas, Jr on behalf of Eric Bowers. Filing fee $400, receipt number AMOWDC-6342129. Service due by 9/3/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Voytas, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bowers v. Freshstart Restoration, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ben Fetzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Katie Fetzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Freshstart Restoration, LLC
Represented By: Kevin J Berger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Bowers
Represented By: Richard A. Voytas, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?