Matte v. Elite Financial Services, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Erica Matte
Defendant: Berlin-Wheeler, Inc., Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Trans Union, LLC, Kansas Counselors, Inc., Enhanced Recovery Company, LLC, Central States Recovery, Inc., Equifax Credit Information Services, Inc., Ameri-Collect, Inc., Accounts Management Services, Accountable Finance, Inc., Elite Financial Services, Inc. and Diversified Consultants, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2019cv00444
Filed: June 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Gary A Fenner
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 4, 2019 Filing 28 STIPULATION of dismissal Defendant Central States Recovery, Inc. by Erica Matte. (Lloyd, Chiya)
July 31, 2019 Filing 27 NOTICE of settlement as to Defendant Accountable Finance by Erica Matte (Lloyd, Chiya)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting #23 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. answer due 8/16/2019. Signed on 7/29/19 by District Judge Gary A. Fenner. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Mitchell, Lisa)
July 25, 2019 Filing 25 MOTION for leave to file Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint out of Time filed by Dennis J. Barton, III on behalf of Kansas Counselors, Inc.. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 8/8/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A - Proposed Answer)(Barton, Dennis)
July 25, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE of appearance by Dennis J. Barton, III on behalf of Kansas Counselors, Inc. (Attorney Dennis J. Barton, III added to party Kansas Counselors, Inc.(pty:dft))(Barton, Dennis)
July 24, 2019 Filing 23 MOTION for extension of time to file answer UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT filed by Andrea S. McMurtry on behalf of Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 8/7/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attorney Andrea S. McMurtry added to party Experian Information Solutions, Inc.(pty:dft))(McMurtry, Andrea)
July 24, 2019 Filing 22 STIPULATION (Joint) As To Plaintiff's First Amended Petition by Trans Union, LLC. (Jones, Erik)
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Order of Dismissal of defendants Account Management and Enhanced Recovery. Signed on 7/19/19 by District Judge Gary A. Fenner. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Mitchell, Lisa)
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Order of Dismissal of defendants Elite Financial Services, Inc. and Ameri-Collect. Signed on 7/19/19 by District Judge Gary A. Fenner. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Mitchell, Lisa)
July 18, 2019 Filing 19 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Erica Matte. Kansas Counselors, Inc. served on 6/25/2019, answer due 7/16/2019. (Attachments: #1 Supplement)(Lloyd, Chiya)
July 18, 2019 Filing 18 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Erica Matte. Central States Recovery, Inc. served on 7/16/2019, answer due 8/6/2019. (Attachments: #1 Supplement)(Lloyd, Chiya)
July 18, 2019 Filing 17 STIPULATION of dismissal Defendants Elite Financial and Ameri-Collect by Erica Matte. (Lloyd, Chiya)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER denying #6 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; denying as moot #9 motion to amend/correct. Signed on 7/18/19 by District Judge Gary A. Fenner. (Mitchell, Lisa)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #12 motion to appear pro hac vice entered by Clerk of Court. Attorney Vanessa Healy for Experian Information Solutions, Inc. allowed to appear pro hac vice. This entry will serve as authorization for the pro hac participation by the attorney. Western District of Missouri Local Rule 5.1 requires documents to be filed electronically. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for a WDMO e-filing account for NextGen CM/ECF. This will enable counsel to electronically file documents and receive electronic notification of filings. Register for a WDMO e-filing account at #PACER. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Geiser, Angel)
July 16, 2019 Filing 14 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS of Defendant Equifax Information Services LLC filed by Guillermo G. Zorogastua on behalf of Defendant Equifax Credit Information Services, Inc..(Zorogastua, Guillermo)
July 16, 2019 Filing 13 Defendant Equifax Information Services LLC's ANSWER to #1 Complaint, and Defenses on behalf of Equifax Credit Information Services, Inc..(Attorney Guillermo G. Zorogastua added to party Equifax Credit Information Services, Inc.(pty:dft))(Zorogastua, Guillermo)
July 16, 2019 Filing 12 Motion to allow Vanessa V. Healy to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-6401871) filed by Danne Wayne Webb on behalf of Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Attorney Danne Wayne Webb added to party Experian Information Solutions, Inc.(pty:dft))(Webb, Danne)
July 15, 2019 Filing 11 STIPULATION of dismissal Defendants Accounts Management and Enhanced Recovery by Erica Matte. (Lloyd, Chiya)
July 15, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, And Affirmative Defenses on behalf of Trans Union, LLC.(Jones, Erik)
July 13, 2019 Filing 9 First MOTION to amend/correct #1 Complaint, filed by Chiya C Lloyd on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 7/29/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1st Amended Petition)(Related document(s) #1 ) (Lloyd, Chiya)
July 12, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Diversified Consultants, Inc. SUMMONS REISSUED as to Central States Recovery, Inc. (Ellis, Lindsey)
July 10, 2019 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT #1 against All Defendants filed by Chiya C Lloyd on behalf of All Plaintiffs.(Lloyd, Chiya)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #5 motion to appear pro hac vice entered by Clerk of Court. Attorney Erik J Jones for Trans Union, LLC allowed to appear pro hac vice. This entry will serve as authorization for the pro hac participation by the attorney. Western District of Missouri Local Rule 5.1 requires documents to be filed electronically. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for a WDMO e-filing account for NextGen CM/ECF. This will enable counsel to electronically file documents and receive electronic notification of filings. Register for a WDMO e-filing account at #PACER. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Geiser, Angel)
July 1, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Mark H Epstein on behalf of Accountable Finance, Inc.. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 7/15/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attorney Mark H Epstein added to party Accountable Finance, Inc.(pty:dft))(Epstein, Mark)
June 28, 2019 Filing 5 Motion to allow Erik J. Jones to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-6378737) filed by Todd A. Lubben on behalf of Trans Union, LLC. (Lubben, Todd)
June 28, 2019 Filing 4 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Todd A. Lubben on behalf of Defendant Trans Union, LLC.(Lubben, Todd)
June 28, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of appearance by Todd A. Lubben on behalf of Trans Union, LLC (Attorney Todd A. Lubben added to party Trans Union, LLC(pty:dft))(Lubben, Todd)
June 24, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Central States Recovery, Inc.. (Woods, Gloria)
June 21, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Accounts Management Services, Ameri-Collect, Inc., Experian Information Solutions, Inc. (Crocker, Susan)
June 11, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Accountable Finance, Inc., Berlin-Wheeler, Inc., Elite Financial Services, Inc., Enhanced Recovery Company, LLC, Equifax Credit Information Services, Inc., Kansas Counselors, Inc., Trans Union, LLC. (Woods, Gloria)
June 11, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Woods, Gloria)
June 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Chiya C Lloyd on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Filing fee $400, receipt number 382992. Service due by 9/9/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Cover Sheet)(Lloyd, Chiya)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Matte v. Elite Financial Services, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Berlin-Wheeler, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Andrea S. McMurtry
Represented By: Vanessa Healy
Represented By: Danne Wayne Webb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trans Union, LLC
Represented By: Erik J Jones
Represented By: Todd A. Lubben
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kansas Counselors, Inc.
Represented By: Dennis J. Barton, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Enhanced Recovery Company, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Central States Recovery, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Credit Information Services, Inc.
Represented By: Guillermo G. Zorogastua
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ameri-Collect, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Accounts Management Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Accountable Finance, Inc.
Represented By: Mark H Epstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elite Financial Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diversified Consultants, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erica Matte
Represented By: Chiya C Lloyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?