Smith v. Bough
Plaintiff: Gregory Wayne Smith
Defendant: Judge Stephen R Bough
Case Number: 4:2019cv00460
Filed: June 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: John T Maughmer
Referring Judge: Beth Phillips
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1346
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 26, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of filing by Gregory Wayne Smith. (Melvin, Greg)
June 26, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of filing by Gregory Wayne Smith. (Melvin, Greg)
June 24, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of filing by Gregory Wayne Smith. (Kern, Kendra)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER denying #1 Plaintiff's Motion to proceed In Forma Pauperis is DENIED and this case is dismissed. Plaintiff's Motion to Transfer case #3 is DENIED. Signed on 6/21/19 by Chief District Judge Beth Phillips. A copy of this Order was mailed via regular US Mail on 6/21/19 to Gregory Wayne Smith, 12310 3rd St., Apt 2, Grandview, MO 64030. (Cordell, Annette)
June 20, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of filing by Gregory Wayne Smith (Houston, Kiambu)
June 18, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT from Magistrate Judge John T. Maughmer to Chief District Judge Beth Phillips. Please note the new case number: 19-460-CV-W-BP. (Melvin, Greg)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER that given the unique nature of this matter, and the unlikelihood of consent to proceed before a Magistrte Judge, the Clerk of the Court shall transfer and reassign this matter to a District Court Judge for consideration of the pending motion for informa pauperis status and for all further proceedings. Signed on 6/17/19 by Magistrate Judge John T. Maughmer. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Alexander, Pam)
June 14, 2019 NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE ASSIGNMENT. This is a docket entry only. No document is attached. (Mailed to plaintiff at address on file) Magistrate Return due by 7/5/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Houston, Kiambu)
June 13, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to transfer filed by Gregory Wayne Smith. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 6/27/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Houston, Kiambu)
June 13, 2019 Filing 2 FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT by Gregory Wayne Smith. (Houston, Kiambu)
June 13, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by Gregory Wayne Smith. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 6/27/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Houston, Kiambu)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Bough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory Wayne Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judge Stephen R Bough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?