Dudley v. Walgreens Pharmacy et al
Plaintiff: Gene E Dudley, Sr and Gene E. Dudley, Sr.
Defendant: Walgreens Pharmacy, Otis S Latimer, MO HealthNet and Otis S. Latimer
Interested Party: United States of America
Case Number: 4:2019cv00505
Filed: June 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: John T Maughmer
Referring Judge: Brian C Wimes
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 42:0233
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 SCHEDULING AND JURY TRIAL ORDER: Jury Trial set for 8/24/2020 09:00 AM in Courtroom 7D, Kansas City (BCW) before District Judge Brian C. Wimes. Final Pretrial Teleconference set for 7/23/2020 at 2:00 p.m. Conference call-in numbers provided in order. Copy of order mailed to pro se plaintiff this date. Signed on 8/16/19 by District Judge Brian C. Wimes. (Baldwin, Joella)
August 16, 2019 Filing 17 Minute Entry. Proceedings held before District Judge Brian C. Wimes: SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held on 8/16/2019; order to issue. Counsel appearing for Plaintiff(s): Not present. Counsel appearing for Defendant(s): Aaron Schuman. Time in court: 9:10 a.m. to 9:16 a.m. To order a transcript of this hearing please contact Denise Halasey, 816-512-5657, denise_halasey@mow.uscourts.gov. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Baldwin, Joella)
August 7, 2019 Filing 16 AMENDED NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP re-assignment to Program Director. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Woods, Gloria)
July 31, 2019 Filing 15 Joint PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER by United States of America, Walgreens Pharmacy. (Morrow, James)
July 22, 2019 Filing 14 REPLY SUGGESTIONS to motion re #2 MOTION to substitute party substituting the United States for Otis Latimer, M.D. filed by Jeffrey P. Ray on behalf of Defendant Otis S. Latimer, interested party United States of America. (Related document(s) #2 ) (Ray, Jeffrey)
July 16, 2019 Filing 13 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by James C. Morrow on behalf of Defendant Walgreens Pharmacy.(Morrow, James)
July 16, 2019 Filing 12 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Walgreens Pharmacy. (Morrow, James)
July 12, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of filing state court case filing by Gene E. Dudley, Sr (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(Houston, Kiambu)
July 10, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to withdraw as attorney and Substitution of Counsel filed by Steven G. Brown on behalf of Otis S. Latimer. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 7/24/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Brown, Steven)
July 9, 2019 Filing 9 PRO SE SUGGESTIONS in opposition re #2 MOTION to substitute party substituting the United States for Otis Latimer, M.D. on behalf of Plaintiff Gene E. Dudley, Sr. Reply suggestions due by 7/23/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(Related document(s) #2 ) (Kern, Kendra)
July 3, 2019 Filing 7 ***Remark A copy of all attachments and current docket sheet in this case have been mailed to: Gene E. Dudley, Sr. 4247 Agnes Avenue Kansas City, MO 64130 to ensure Pro Se Plaintiff has received all documents filed in this matter to date. (Kern, Kendra)
July 3, 2019 NOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your Designation of Mediator is due soon (filed as an ADR event in CM/ECF). See Notice of Inclusion and MAP General Order for specifics. (ADI, MAP)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 RULE 16 NOTICE. Proposed scheduling order due by 7/31/2019. Rule 26 conference due by 7/17/2019. Scheduling Conference set for 8/16/2019 09:00 AM in Courtroom 7D, Kansas City (BCW) before District Judge Brian C. Wimes. Copy of order to be mailed to pro se plaintiff this date. Signed on 7/1/19 by District Judge Brian C. Wimes. (Baldwin, Joella)
July 1, 2019 Filing 5 ADMINISTRATIVE TRANSFER. Due to a conflict of interest by the Honorable Judge John T. Maughmer, this case is randomly reassigned to the Honorable Judge Brian C. Wimes for all further proceedings. Please note the new case number: 4:19-00505-CV-W-BCW. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Moore, Terri). NEF mailed to pro se Plaintiff on 7/1/2019. (Moore, Terri).
June 28, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , MOTION to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction filed by Jeffrey P. Ray on behalf of Otis S. Latimer, United States of America. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 7/12/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attorney Jeffrey P. Ray added to party United States of America(pty:intp))(Ray, Jeffrey)
June 28, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Melvin, Greg)
June 27, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to substitute party substituting the United States for Otis Latimer, M.D. filed by Jeffrey P. Ray on behalf of Otis S Latimer. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 7/11/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Ray, Jeffrey)
June 27, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Jackson County Circuit Court County, case number 1916-CV04846, filed by Jeffrey P. Ray on behalf of Otis S Latimer. Filing fee $ 400 (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(Ray, Jeffrey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dudley v. Walgreens Pharmacy et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreens Pharmacy
Represented By: Aaron Russell Schuman
Represented By: James C. Morrow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Otis S Latimer
Represented By: Jeffrey P. Ray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MO HealthNet
Represented By: Caleb Joseph Wagner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Otis S. Latimer
Represented By: Jeffrey P. Ray
Represented By: Steven G. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gene E Dudley, Sr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gene E. Dudley, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: United States of America
Represented By: Jeffrey P. Ray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?