United States of America v. Real Property Located at 8819 Antioch Road, Overland Park, Kansas
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Real Property Located at 8819 Antioch Road, Overland Park, Kansas along with all its Buildings, Appurtenances and Improvements
Claimant: Jesse Gaddy Estate, Erma Gaddy, Dennis McCallen and Janet Bramer
Case Number: 4:2019cv00517
Filed: July 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Brian C Wimes
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:881
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 31, 2019 Filing 10 RETURN OF SERVICE of Rule G forfeiture action executed as to Dennis McCallen. Dennis McCallen served on 7/30/19. (Perkins Rock, Stacey)
July 10, 2019 Filing 9 RETURN OF SERVICE of Rule G forfeiture action executed as to Jesse Gaddy Estate. Jesse Gaddy Estate served on 7/9/2019. (Perkins Rock, Stacey)
July 10, 2019 Filing 8 RETURN OF SERVICE of Rule G forfeiture action executed as to Erma Gaddy. Erma Gaddy served on 7/9/2019. (Perkins Rock, Stacey)
July 10, 2019 Filing 7 RETURN OF SERVICE of Rule G forfeiture action executed as to Janet Bramer. Janet Bramer served on 7/9/2019. (Perkins Rock, Stacey)
July 10, 2019 Filing 6 RETURN OF SERVICE of Rule G forfeiture action executed as to Real Property Located at 8819 Antioch Road, Overland Park, Kansas along with all its Buildings, Appurtenances and Improvements. Real Property Located at 8819 Antioch Road, Overland Park, Kansas along with all its Buildings, Appurtenances and Improvements served on 7/9/2019. (Perkins Rock, Stacey)
July 10, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of filing Notice of Complaint to Dennis McLallen by United States of America (Perkins Rock, Stacey)
July 9, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of filing Notice of Complaint to Janet Bramer by United States of America (Perkins Rock, Stacey)
July 9, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of filing Notice of Complaint to Jesse E. Gaddy Estate, c/o Erma Gaddy by United States of America (Perkins Rock, Stacey)
July 9, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of filing Notice of Complaint to Erma Gaddy by United States of America (Perkins Rock, Stacey)
July 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT For Forfeiture In Rem against Real Property Located at 8819 Antioch Road, Overland Park, Kansas along with all its Buildings, Appurtenances and Improvements filed by Stacey Elaine Perkins Rock on behalf of United States of America. Filing fee waived. Service due by 10/1/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Perkins Rock, Stacey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Real Property Located at 8819 Antioch Road, Overland Park, Kansas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Real Property Located at 8819 Antioch Road, Overland Park, Kansas along with all its Buildings, Appurtenances and Improvements
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Stacey Elaine Perkins Rock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Jesse Gaddy Estate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Erma Gaddy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Dennis McCallen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Janet Bramer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?