Howard v. Reliastar Life Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Johnny Howard
Defendant: Voya Financial, Inc. and Reliastar Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 4:2019cv00521
Filed: July 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Greg Kays
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 RULE 16 NOTICE. Rule 26 conference due by 9/27/2019. Proposed scheduling order due by 10/11/2019. Signed on 8/30/19 by District Judge Greg Kays. (Strodtman, Tracy)
August 27, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, on behalf of Voya Financial, Inc..(Bien, Richard)
August 27, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, on behalf of Reliastar Life Insurance Company.(Bien, Richard)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants' responsive pleadings are due 8/27/2019. Signed on 8/20/19 by District Judge Greg Kays. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Law clerk)
August 20, 2019 Filing 5 Consent MOTION for extension of time to file answer re #1 Complaint, filed by Richard N Bien on behalf of Reliastar Life Insurance Company, Voya Financial, Inc.. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 9/3/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #1 ) (Bien, Richard)
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed on 7/30/19 by District Judge Greg Kays. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Law clerk)
July 30, 2019 Filing 3 Consent MOTION for extension of time to file answer re #1 Complaint, filed by Richard N Bien on behalf of Reliastar Life Insurance Company, Voya Financial, Inc.. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 8/13/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #1 ) (Attorney Richard N Bien added to party Reliastar Life Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Richard N Bien added to party Voya Financial, Inc.(pty:dft))(Bien, Richard)
July 5, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Reliastar Life Insurance Company, Voya Financial, Inc.. (Woods, Gloria)
July 5, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to Program Director. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Woods, Gloria)
July 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Reliastar Life Insurance Company, Voya Financial, Inc. filed by Kyle Henry Sciolaro on behalf of Johnny Howard. Filing fee $400, receipt number AMOWDC-6386884. Service due by 10/3/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Sciolaro, Kyle)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Howard v. Reliastar Life Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Voya Financial, Inc.
Represented By: Richard N Bien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reliastar Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Richard N Bien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johnny Howard
Represented By: Kyle Henry Sciolaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?