Wells v. Cumulus Media Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Kandance A. Wells
Defendant: Cumulus Media Corporation and Access One Corporation
Case Number: 4:2019cv00530
Filed: July 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Fernando J Gaitan
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 29, 2019 Filing 7 PRO SE NOTICE OF APPEAL by Kandance A. Wells. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number not paid. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Envelope)(Ellis, Lindsey)
August 29, 2019 Filing 6 PRO SE MOTION for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by Kandance A. Wells. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 9/12/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(Ellis, Lindsey)
July 29, 2019 Filing 5 CLERK'S JUDGMENT. Copy mailed via first class mail to Kandance A. Wells at 10208 King's Cove Drive #201, Merriam, KS 66203. (Anderson, Christy)
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: The Court hereby DENIES Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed informa pauperis (Doc. No. 1), and DISMISSES Plaintiff's Complaint without prejudice. All remaining motions are denied as moot. Signed on 7/26/19 by District Judge Fernando J. Gaitan, Jr. Copy of this Order has been mailed to Plaintiff, Kandance A. Wells at10208 King's Cove Drive #201 in Merriam, KS 66203. (Ellis, Lindsey)
July 9, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to appoint counsel filed by Kandance A. Wells. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 7/23/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Woods, Gloria)
July 9, 2019 Filing 2 FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT by Kandance A. Wells. (Woods, Gloria)
July 9, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by Kandance A. Wells. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 7/23/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Woods, Gloria)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wells v. Cumulus Media Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cumulus Media Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Access One Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kandance A. Wells
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?