A. G. v. The Housing Authority of Kansas City, Missouri et al
Plaintiff: A. G.
Defendant: The Housing Authority of Kansas City, Missouri and Securitas Security Services, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2019cv00531
Filed: July 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Fernando J Gaitan
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accomodations
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 5, 2019 Filing 19 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Anthony E. LaCroix on behalf of A. G.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Service Agreement, #2 Exhibit B - Request for Proposal)(LaCroix, Anthony)
August 28, 2019 NOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your post-mediation status report is due within 10 calendar days after the mediation. See MAP FAQs on Court's website for specifics and submit report(s) to: map@mow.uscourts.gov. (ADI, MAP)
August 27, 2019 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES filed by Anthony E. LaCroix on behalf of Plaintiff A. G..(LaCroix, Anthony)
August 27, 2019 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES filed by Jennifer P. Kyner on behalf of Defendant The Housing Authority of Kansas City, Missouri.(Kyner, Jennifer)
August 27, 2019 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES filed by Stanley N Wilkins on behalf of Defendant Securitas Security Services, Inc..(Wilkins, Stanley)
August 27, 2019 Filing 15 Joint PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER AND DISCOVERY PLAN by A. G.. (LaCroix, Anthony)
August 27, 2019 Filing 14 DESIGNATION OF MEDIATOR naming William Sanders, Jr.(Kyner, Jennifer)
August 23, 2019 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by A. G. of First Request for Production to Defendant HAKC and First Request for Production to Defendant Securitas filed by Anthony E. LaCroix on behalf of Plaintiff A. G..(LaCroix, Anthony)
August 21, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of filing to Take Videotaped Deposition of A.G. by Securitas Security Services, Inc. (Wilkins, Stanley)
August 21, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of filing of Issuance of Subpoena for Production of Documents by Securitas Security Services, Inc. (Wilkins, Stanley)
August 21, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of filing of Issuance of Subpoena for Production of Documents by Securitas Security Services, Inc. (Wilkins, Stanley)
August 20, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by The Housing Authority of Kansas City, Missouri AMENDED filed by Jennifer P. Kyner on behalf of Defendant The Housing Authority of Kansas City, Missouri.(Kyner, Jennifer)
August 20, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by The Housing Authority of Kansas City, Missouri filed by Jennifer P. Kyner on behalf of Defendant The Housing Authority of Kansas City, Missouri.(Kyner, Jennifer)
August 19, 2019 Filing 7 Joint MOTION for protective order filed by Jennifer P. Kyner on behalf of The Housing Authority of Kansas City, Missouri. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 9/3/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Stipulated Protective Order)(Kyner, Jennifer)
July 17, 2019 NOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your Designation of Mediator is due soon (filed as an ADR event in CM/ECF). See Notice of Inclusion and MAP General Order for specifics. (ADI, MAP)
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 RULE 16 NOTICE. Please see text of order. Signed on 7/16/2019 by District Judge Fernando J. Gaitan, Jr. (Shawver, Marylynn)
July 15, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint on behalf of The Housing Authority of Kansas City, Missouri.(Kyner, Jennifer)
July 10, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of appearance by Stanley N Wilkins on behalf of Securitas Security Services, Inc. (Wilkins, Stanley)
July 10, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand on behalf of Securitas Security Services, Inc..(Hunt, Patrick)
July 10, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Woods, Gloria)
July 9, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Jackson County County, case number 1916-CV15643, filed by Patrick Michael Hunt on behalf of Securitas Security Services, Inc.. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMOWDC-6392171. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hunt, Patrick)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: A. G. v. The Housing Authority of Kansas City, Missouri et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Housing Authority of Kansas City, Missouri
Represented By: Jennifer P. Kyner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Securitas Security Services, Inc.
Represented By: Patrick Michael Hunt
Represented By: Stanley N Wilkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A. G.
Represented By: Anthony E. LaCroix
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?