Smith v. LBV Realty LLC
Plaintiff: Gregory Wayne Smith
Defendant: LBV Realty LLC
Case Number: 4:2019cv00539
Filed: July 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Nanette K Laughrey
Referring Judge: Ortrie D Smith
Nature of Suit: Commerce ICC Rates, Etc.
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 13, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of filing by Gregory Wayne Smith. (Melvin, Greg)
August 13, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of filing by Gregory Wayne Smith. (Melvin, Greg)
August 13, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of filing by Gregory Wayne Smith. (Melvin, Greg)
August 5, 2019 Filing 7 CLERK'S JUDGMENT (Matthes Mitra, Renea) Modified on 8/5/2019 to reflect copy of this Judgment has been mailed with Order #6 (Ellis, Lindsey).
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER entered by Judge Nanette K. Laughrey denying Plaintiff's motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. Signed on 8/5/19 by District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. (Matthes Mitra, Renea) Modified on 8/5/2019 to reflect copy of Order has been mailed to: Gregory Wayne Smith; 12310 3rd Street; Apt 2; Grandview, MO 64030 (Ellis, Lindsey).
July 12, 2019 Filing 5 ADMINISTRATIVE TRANSFER. Due to a conflict of interest by the Honorable Judge Ortrie D. Smith, this case is reassigned to the Honorable Judge Nanette K. Laughrey for all further proceedings. Please note the new case number: 4:19-00539-CV-W-NKL. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Moore, Terri). Copy mailed to pro se Plaintiff on 7/12/2019. (Moore, Terri).
July 11, 2019 Filing 4 PRO SE SUGGESTIONS in support re #3 MOTION to Transfer on behalf of Plaintiff Gregory Wayne Smith. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Related document(s) #3 ) (Ellis, Lindsey)
July 11, 2019 Filing 3 PRO SE MOTION to Transfer filed by Gregory Wayne Smith. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 7/25/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Ellis, Lindsey)
July 11, 2019 Filing 2 FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT by Gregory Wayne Smith. (Ellis, Lindsey)
July 11, 2019 Filing 1 PRO SE MOTION for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by Gregory Wayne Smith. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 7/25/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ellis, Lindsey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. LBV Realty LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LBV Realty LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory Wayne Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?