Alberson v. Reyes et al
Plaintiff: Melissa Alberson
Defendant: Garda CL Southwest Inc. and Frankie Reyes
Case Number: 4:2019cv00548
Filed: July 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Stephen R Bough
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 5, 2019 Filing 11 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Melissa Alberson. (Ludwig, Jason)
August 29, 2019 Filing 10 SUGGESTIONS in opposition re #6 MOTION to remand and Response to Defendants' Notice of Removal filed by Jeremy K Schrag on behalf of Defendants Garda CL Southwest Inc., Frankie Reyes. Reply suggestions due by 9/12/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Declaration of Reyes)(Related document(s) #6 ) (Schrag, Jeremy)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: Before the Court is an Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. (Doc. #8). For good cause stated the Motion is granted. Defendants are granted an extension of time until and including August 29, 2019, to file a response to Plaintiffs Motion to Remand. Signed on 8/26/19 by District Judge Stephen R. Bough. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Ellis, Lindsey)
August 26, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for extension of time to file response/reply as to #6 MOTION to remand and Response to Defendants' Notice of Removal (Unopposed) filed by Jeremy K Schrag on behalf of Garda CL Southwest Inc., Frankie Reyes. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 9/9/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #6 ) (Schrag, Jeremy)
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 RULE 16 NOTICE. Proposed scheduling order due by 10/9/2019. Scheduling Conference set for 10/23/2019 09:00 AM in Courtroom 7B, Kansas City (SRB) before District Judge Stephen R. Bough. Signed on 8/16/19 by District Judge Stephen R. Bough. (Diefenbach, Tracy)
August 12, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to remand and Response to Defendants' Notice of Removal filed by Jason H. Ludwig on behalf of Melissa Alberson. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 8/26/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Ludwig, Jason)
July 19, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand on behalf of Frankie Reyes.(Schrag, Jeremy)
July 16, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of filing Notice of Removal in State Court Action by Frankie Reyes (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Notice of Filing Notice of Removal)(Schrag, Jeremy)
July 12, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to Program Director. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Ellis, Lindsey)
July 12, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of filing Consent to Removal by Garda CL Southwest Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal, (Schrag, Jeremy)
July 12, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Jackson County Circuit Court County, case number 1916-cv02399, filed by Jeremy K Schrag on behalf of Frankie Reyes. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMOWDC-6398257. (Attachments: #1 State Court Docket Sheet and State Court Records, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Schrag, Jeremy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alberson v. Reyes et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melissa Alberson
Represented By: Jason H. Ludwig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Garda CL Southwest Inc.
Represented By: Jeremy K Schrag
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frankie Reyes
Represented By: Jeremy K Schrag
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?