Hose v. Wilke et al
Plaintiff: Kimberly C Hose
Defendant: Brian William McEachen, Trustee Robert Wilke and Trustee C. Allen Parker
Case Number: 4:2019cv00573
Filed: July 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Fernando J Gaitan
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2019 Filing 10 PRO SE OBJECTIONS (non motions) To Order and Dismissal by Kimberly C Hose. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-F)(Ellis, Lindsey)
July 25, 2019 Filing 9 PRO SE NOTICE of filing- Writ of Evidence by Kimberly C Hose (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Ellis, Lindsey)
July 25, 2019 Filing 8 PRO SE MOTION for order - to Stay Eviction filed by Kimberly C Hose. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 8/8/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Ellis, Lindsey)
July 25, 2019 Filing 7 CLERK'S JUDGMENT. Copy mailed to plaintiff Kimberly Hose with #6 Order. (Anderson, Christy)
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER - DENYING #1 pro se motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. DENYING as MOOT #3 pro se motion for emergency stay of eviction. This case is hereby dismissed without prejudice for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Signed on 7/25/19 by District Judge Fernando J. Gaitan, Jr. Copy of Order mailed via first class mail to Kimberly C Hose at 111 NW Hackberry Street, Lee's Summit, MO 64064. (Anderson, Christy)
July 23, 2019 Filing 5 PRO SE NOTICE of filing- Writ of Inquiry by Kimberly C Hose (Ellis, Lindsey)
July 19, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Kern, Kendra)
July 19, 2019 Filing 3 PRO SE MOTION for emergency stay of eviction filed by Kimberly C Hose. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 8/2/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Kern, Kendra)
July 19, 2019 Filing 2 FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT by Kimberly C Hose. (Kern, Kendra)
July 19, 2019 Filing 1 PRO SE MOTION for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by Kimberly C Hose. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 8/2/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Kern, Kendra) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/19/2019: #1 comp, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 State documents) (Kern, Kendra).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hose v. Wilke et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian William McEachen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trustee Robert Wilke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trustee C. Allen Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly C Hose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?