Baskin v. Turner et al
Plaintiff: John H Baskin, II
Defendant: Diann Turner and Darryl Forte
Case Number: 4:2019cv00576
Filed: July 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Nanette K Laughrey
Referring Judge: Prisoner Pro Se
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2019 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by John H Baskin, II, on court-approved forms as directed by Order dated 08/27/2019.(Willis, Kathy)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: ORDERED that: (1) Plaintiff is GRANTED provisional leave to proceed as a pauper; (2) the Clerk of the Court send Plaintiff a 42 U.S.C. 1983 complaint form; (3) using that form, and following all instructions on that form, Plaintiff file an amended complaint in which he names as Defendants the specific individuals he claims were responsible for violating his rights under federal law, (4) Plaintiff file his amended complaint no later than September 10, 2019; and (5) Plaintiffs motion for appointed counsel (Doc. 3) is DENIED without prejudice, see Phillips v. Jasper County Jail, 437 F.3d 791, 794 (8th Cir. 2006) (no constitutional or statutory right to counsel in civil cases; criteria for appointment). Signed on 08/27/2019 by District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. (Willis, Kathy) (CLERK'S NOTE: 42 U.S.C. 1983 complaint form mailed to Plaintiff as directed.)
July 25, 2019 Filing 5 Inmate ACCOUNT STATEMENT filed by John H Baskin, II. (Davies, Cindy)
July 19, 2019 Filing 3 PLAINTIFF'S MOTION for appointment of counsel filed by John H Baskin, II. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 8/5/2019. (Davies, Cindy)
July 19, 2019 Filing 2 IFP FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT filed by John H Baskin, II. (Davies, Cindy)
July 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by John H Baskin, II.(Davies, Cindy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Baskin v. Turner et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diann Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darryl Forte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John H Baskin, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?