Galvez-Diaz v. Felix et al
Plaintiff: Pedro Galvez-Diaz
Defendant: Akah, Diann Turner, McDowell and Felix
Case Number: 4:2019cv00581
Filed: July 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Gary A Fenner
Referring Judge: Prisoner Pro Se
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 9, 2019 Filing 9 CLERK'S JUDGMENT: This case is DISMISSED, without prejudice, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(b) for failure to prosecute and for failure to comply with this Courts Order. Any motion to reopen must be filed in a timely manner and must be accompanied by notice of Plaintiffs current address and the $27.66 initial partial filing fee. (Willis, Kathy)
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: ORDERED that this case is DISMISSED, without prejudice, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(b) for failure to prosecute and for failure to comply with this Court's Order. Any motion to reopen must be filed in a timely manner and must be accompanied by notice of Plaintiff's current address and the $27.66 initial partial filing fee. Signed on 08/09/2019 by District Judge Gary A. Fenner. (Willis, Kathy)
August 1, 2019 MAIL RETURNED as undeliverable, marked "ADDRESSEE NOT HERE" sent to Pedro Galvez-Diaz. (Related documents #5 , #7 , 4 ) (Willis, Kathy)
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: ORDERED that: (1) Plaintiff is granted leave to proceed in forma pauperis; (2) Plaintiff shall pay to the clerk of the court for the Western District of Missouri, Western Division, an initial partial filing fee of $27.66; and (3) Plaintiff's failure to pay the required initial partial filing fee on or before August 8, 2019, will result in the dismissal of this case without further notice. Signed on July 25, 2019 by District Judge Gary A. Fenner. (Davies, Cindy)
July 25, 2019 Filing 6 Inmate ACCOUNT STATEMENT filed by Pedro Galvez-Diaz. (Davies, Cindy)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER that Plaintiff's motion for appointment of counsel (Doc. 4 ) is denied without prejudice. Signed on 7/23/2019 by District Judge Gary A. Fenner. (Doty, Greg)
July 22, 2019 Filing 3 PLAINTIFF'S MOTION for appointment of counsel filed by Pedro Galvez-Diaz. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 8/6/2019. (Davies, Cindy)
July 22, 2019 Filing 2 IFP FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT filed by Pedro Galvez-Diaz. (Davies, Cindy)
July 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Pedro Galvez-Diaz. (Davies, Cindy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Galvez-Diaz v. Felix et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Akah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diann Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McDowell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Felix
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pedro Galvez-Diaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?