Bank of the West v. The Vessel "Liquid Assets", Her Mast, Sales, Rigging, Engine, Anchors, Furniture, Equipment and Other Appurtenances, in REM et al
Plaintiff: Bank of the West
Defendant: The Vessel "Liquid Assets", Her Mast, Sales, Rigging, Engine, Anchors, Furniture, Equipment and Other Appurtenances, in REM et al, Martin Brooks and Brianna Brooks
Case Number: 4:2019cv00588
Filed: July 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Stephen R Bough
Referring Judge: Howard F Sachs
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 46:31301
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: Before the Court is Plaintiff's Motion for Entry of Order to Issue Maritime Arrest Warrant (Doc. #10). For the following reasons, Plaintiff's Motion is GRANTED. Signed on 9/24/19 by District Judge Stephen R. Bough. Four certified copies of Order hand delivered to USM for service per Order of the Court. (Ellis, Lindsey)
September 5, 2019 NOTICE OF DOCKET MODIFICATION. A modification has been made to the document filed on 9/4/19 as Document No. 10, MOTION for order Motion for Entry of Order to Issue Maritime Arrest Warrant. The proposed order attached to the motion has been deleted. Per Administrative Procedures any proposed orders are to be emailed to the Courtroom Deputy in Word format. This is a text entry only - no document is attached. (Ellis, Lindsey)
September 4, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for order Motion for Entry of Order to Issue Maritime Arrest Warrant filed by J. Michael Bridges on behalf of Bank of the West. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 9/18/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Bridges, J.)
August 14, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Bank of the West filed by J. Michael Bridges on behalf of Plaintiff Bank of the West.(Bridges, J.)
August 14, 2019 Filing 8 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Bank of the West. The Vessel "Liquid Assets", Her Mast, Sales, Rigging, Engine, Anchors, Furniture, Equipment and Other Appurtenances, in REM et al served on 8/5/2019, answer due 8/26/2019. (Bridges, J.)
August 14, 2019 Filing 7 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Bank of the West. Martin Brooks served on 8/2/2019, answer due 8/23/2019. (Bridges, J.)
August 14, 2019 Filing 6 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Bank of the West. Brianna Brooks served on 8/5/2019, answer due 8/26/2019., ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE executed Acknowledgement filed by Bank of the West. (Bridges, J.)
August 8, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of filing Organizational Interests Disclosure Statement by Bank of the West (Robinson, Laura)
July 29, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Brianna Brooks, Martin Brooks, The Vessel "Liquid Assets", Her Mast, Sales, Rigging, Engine, Anchors, Furniture, Equipment and Other Appurtenances, in REM et al. (Woods, Gloria)
July 29, 2019 Filing 4 ADMINISTRATIVE TRANSFER. Due to a conflict of interest by the Honorable Howard F. Sachs, this case has been randomly reassigned to the Honorable Stephen R. Bough for all further proceedings. Please note the new case number: 4:19-00588-CV-W-SRB. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Jones, Robin) Modified on 7/29/2019 to correct Judge's initials in case number (Jones, Robin).
July 26, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Woods, Gloria)
July 26, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of appearance by Laura C Robinson on behalf of Bank of the West (Attorney Laura C Robinson added to party Bank of the West(pty:pla))(Robinson, Laura)
July 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Verified Complaint against Brianna Brooks, Martin Brooks, The Vessel "Liquid Assets", Her Mast, Sales, Rigging, Engine, Anchors, Furniture, Equipment and Other Appurtencances, in REM filed by J. Michael Bridges on behalf of Bank of the West. Filing fee $400, receipt number AMOWDC-6417141. Service due by 10/24/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Bridges, J.) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/26/2019: #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Woods, Gloria).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bank of the West v. The Vessel "Liquid Assets", Her Mast, Sales, Rigging, Engine, Anchors, Furniture, Equipment and Other Appurtenances, in REM et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Vessel "Liquid Assets", Her Mast, Sales, Rigging, Engine, Anchors, Furniture, Equipment and Other Appurtenances, in REM et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martin Brooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brianna Brooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bank of the West
Represented By: J. Michael Bridges
Represented By: Laura C Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?