West Central Missouri Community Action Agency v. United States Department of Health and Human Services et al
Plaintiff: West Central Missouri Community Action Agency
Defendant: Clarence Small, Alex M. Azar, Lynn Johnson, Administration for Children and Families and United States Department of Health and Human Services
Case Number: 4:2019cv00598
Filed: July 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Beth Phillips
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05:551
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 27, 2019 Answer due date for All Defendants set 11/15/19. (Cordell, Annette)
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #23 Defendants' Motion for Order Extending Time in Which Defendants the United States Department of Health and Human Services and Administration for Children and Families May Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint, and Setting a Single Date by Which All Defendants May Answer or Otherwise Respond (Doc. 23) is GRANTED. The deadline for all Defendants to file an answer or to otherwise respond to the Complaint is on or before November 15, 2019. Signed on 9/27/19 by Chief District Judge Beth Phillips. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Cordell, Annette)
September 25, 2019 Filing 23 MOTION for extension of time in Which Defendants the United States Department of Health and Human Services and Administration for Children and Families May Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint, and Setting a Single Date by Which all Defendants May Answer of Otherwise Respond filed by Charles M. Thomas on behalf of All Defendants. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 10/9/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attorney Charles M. Thomas added to party Administration for Children and Families(pty:dft), Attorney Charles M. Thomas added to party Alex M. Azar(pty:dft), Attorney Charles M. Thomas added to party Lynn Johnson(pty:dft), Attorney Charles M. Thomas added to party Clarence Small(pty:dft), Attorney Charles M. Thomas added to party United States Department of Health and Human Services(pty:dft))(Thomas, Charles)
September 23, 2019 Filing 22 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by West Central Missouri Community Action Agency. Lynn Johnson c/o Attorney General of the United States served on 9/18/2019. (Gallagher, Timothy)
September 23, 2019 Filing 21 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by West Central Missouri Community Action Agency. Alex M. Azar c/o Attorney General of the United States served on 9/18/2019. (Gallagher, Timothy)
September 23, 2019 Filing 20 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by West Central Missouri Community Action Agency. Alex M. Azar served on 9/16/2019, answer due 11/15/2019. (Gallagher, Timothy)
September 23, 2019 Filing 19 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by West Central Missouri Community Action Agency. Lynn Johnson served on 9/16/2019, answer due 11/15/2019. (Gallagher, Timothy)
September 23, 2019 Filing 18 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by West Central Missouri Community Action Agency. Clarence Small, Region 7 of the Administration for Children and Families served on 8/8/2019. (Gallagher, Timothy)
September 13, 2019 SUMMONS REISSUED as to Alex M. Azar, Lynn Johnson, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Woods, Gloria)
September 9, 2019 Filing 17 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by West Central Missouri Community Action Agency. Administration for Children and Families served on 8/8/2019, answer due 10/7/2019. (Gallagher, Timothy)
September 9, 2019 Filing 16 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by West Central Missouri Community Action Agency. United States Dept of Health and Human Services, Office of General Counsel, Kansas City, MO served on 8/8/2019. (Gallagher, Timothy)
September 9, 2019 Filing 15 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by West Central Missouri Community Action Agency. Clarence Small, Regional Program Manager, Region 7, Civil Process Clerk served on 8/8/2019. (Gallagher, Timothy)
September 9, 2019 Filing 14 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by West Central Missouri Community Action Agency. United States Department of Health and Human Services served on 8/12/2019, answer due 10/11/2019. (Gallagher, Timothy)
September 9, 2019 Filing 13 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by West Central Missouri Community Action Agency. Administration for Children and Families, Attorney General of the United States served on 8/13/2019. (Gallagher, Timothy)
September 9, 2019 Filing 12 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by West Central Missouri Community Action Agency. Clarence Small, Regional Program Manager, Region 7 of Administration for Children and Families, Attorney General of the United States served on 8/13/2019. (Gallagher, Timothy)
September 9, 2019 Filing 11 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by West Central Missouri Community Action Agency. Clarence Small, Regional Program Manager, Region 7 Administration for Children and Families, Office of General Counsel served on 8/12/2019. (Gallagher, Timothy)
September 9, 2019 Filing 10 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by West Central Missouri Community Action Agency. US Department of Health and Human Services, General Counsel served on 8/12/2019. (Gallagher, Timothy)
September 9, 2019 Filing 9 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by West Central Missouri Community Action Agency. United States Departmen tof Health and Human Services served on 8/13/2019. (Gallagher, Timothy)
September 9, 2019 Filing 8 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by West Central Missouri Community Action Agency. Administration for Children and Families, Attorney General of the United States served on 8/13/2019. (Gallagher, Timothy)
September 9, 2019 Filing 7 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by West Central Missouri Community Action Agency. United States Dept of Health and Human Services, Attorney General of the United States served on 8/13/2019. (Gallagher, Timothy)
August 2, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to All Defendants., SUMMONS ISSUED as to All Defendants, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Woods, Gloria)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #3 and #4 motions to appear pro hac vice entered by Clerk of Court. Attorneys Timothy Gallagher and Robert Sasser for West Central Missouri Community Action Agency allowed to appear pro hac vice. This entry will serve as authorization for the pro hac participation by the attorney. Western District of Missouri Local Rule 5.1 requires documents to be filed electronically. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for a WDMO e-filing account for NextGen CM/ECF. This will enable counsel to electronically file documents and receive electronic notification of filings. Register for a WDMO e-filing account at #PACER. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Geiser, Angel)
July 31, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to Program Director. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Woods, Gloria)
July 30, 2019 Filing 4 Motion to allow Robert E. Sasser to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-6422929) filed by Yvonne Marie Ernzen on behalf of West Central Missouri Community Action Agency. (Ernzen, Yvonne)
July 30, 2019 Filing 3 Motion to allow Timothy J.F. Gallagher to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-6422923) filed by Yvonne Marie Ernzen on behalf of West Central Missouri Community Action Agency. (Ernzen, Yvonne)
July 30, 2019 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Yvonne Marie Ernzen on behalf of Plaintiff West Central Missouri Community Action Agency.(Ernzen, Yvonne)
July 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Yvonne Marie Ernzen on behalf of West Central Missouri Community Action Agency. Filing fee $400, receipt number AMOWDC-6422610. Service due by 10/28/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ernzen, Yvonne)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: West Central Missouri Community Action Agency v. United States Department of Health and Human Services et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clarence Small
Represented By: Charles M. Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alex M. Azar
Represented By: Charles M. Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lynn Johnson
Represented By: Charles M. Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Administration for Children and Families
Represented By: Charles M. Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Health and Human Services
Represented By: Charles M. Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: West Central Missouri Community Action Agency
Represented By: Yvonne Marie Ernzen
Represented By: Timothy J.F. Gallagher
Represented By: Robert E Sasser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?