Landsdown v. Jones
Plaintiff: Ronnie Landsdown
Defendant: Dawn Jones
Case Number: 4:2019cv00618
Filed: August 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Greg Kays
Referring Judge: Prisoner Pro Se
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 19, 2019 Filing 8 PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE of change of address filed by Ronnie Landsdown. New address is Federal Correctional Complex, P.O. Box 9000, Forrest City, AR 72336. CM/ECF updated. (Willis, Kathy)
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER that Plaintiff provide an updated address on or before October 3, 2019, or this case may be DISMISSED without further notice. Signed on 09/19/2019 by District Judge Greg Kays. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Willis, Kathy)
September 11, 2019 Filing 6 Inmate ACCOUNT STATEMENT filed by St. Clair County Sheriff's Department in response to Doc. #5 . The Sheriff's Department states that plaintiff was released to the Springfield US Marshals on 8/22/19 and is no longer in their custody. (Davies, Cindy)
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: ORDERED that: (1) Plaintiff is granted provisional leave to proceed in forma pauperis; (2) the agency having custody of Plaintiff will be required to forward to the Clerk of the Court monthly payments of 20 percent of the preceding month's income credited to Plaintiff's inmate account each time the amount in that account exceeds $10 until the balance of the $350 filing fee is paid.; (3) the Clerk of the Court is directed to send Plaintiff another set of civil rights forms for his use in filing an amended complaint; (4) Plaintiff is directed to file a single amended complaint, as specifically discussed above; and (5) Plaintiff's failure to amend the complaint as directed, on or before September 19, 2019, will result in the dismissal of this case without further notice. Signed on September 5, 2019 by District Judge Greg Kays. (CLERK'S NOTE: Civil rights forms mailed to plaintiff with copy of order as directed.) (Davies, Cindy)
August 15, 2019 Filing 4 Inmate ACCOUNT STATEMENT filed by Ronnie Landsdown. (Davies, Cindy)
August 1, 2019 Filing 2 IFP FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT filed by Ronnie Landsdown. (Davies, Cindy)
August 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Nurse Dawn Jones filed by Ronnie Landsdown. (Attachment: #1 Exhibit)(Davies, Cindy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Landsdown v. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronnie Landsdown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dawn Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?