Prince v. Kansas City Tree Care, LLC
Plaintiff: William Prince
Defendant: Kansas City Tree Care, LLC
Case Number: 4:2019cv00622
Filed: August 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Fernando J Gaitan
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:0216
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 4, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to reassign/transfer case Agreed Motion to Transfer Venue and Stay Deadlines to Respond to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss filed by Eric L. Dirks on behalf of William Prince. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 10/18/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Dirks, Eric)
September 30, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of filing Consent to Become Party Plaintiff by William Prince (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Dirks, Eric)
September 25, 2019 NOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your Designation of Mediator is due soon (filed as an ADR event in CM/ECF). See Notice of Inclusion and MAP General Order for specifics. (ADI, MAP)
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 RULE 16 NOTICE. Please see text of order. Signed on 9/23/2019 by District Judge Fernando J. Gaitan, Jr. (Shawver, Marylynn)
September 20, 2019 Filing 10 SUGGESTIONS in support re #9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by John Ivan on behalf of Defendant Kansas City Tree Care, LLC. (Related document(s) #9 ) (Ivan, John)
September 20, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by John Ivan on behalf of Kansas City Tree Care, LLC. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 10/4/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Ivan, John)
September 13, 2019 Filing 8 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by John Ivan on behalf of Defendant Kansas City Tree Care, LLC.(Ivan, John)
September 13, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of appearance by John Ivan on behalf of Kansas City Tree Care, LLC (Attorney John Ivan added to party Kansas City Tree Care, LLC(pty:dft))(Ivan, John)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #4 & #5 motions to appear pro hac vice entered by Clerk of Court. Attorneys Andrew W. Dunlap and Richard M. Schreiber for William Prince allowed to appear pro hac vice. This entry will serve as authorization for the pro hac participation by the attorney. Western District of Missouri Local Rule 5.1 requires documents to be filed electronically. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for a WDMO e-filing account for NextGen CM/ECF. This will enable counsel to electronically file documents and receive electronic notification of filings. Register for a WDMO e-filing account at #PACER. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Geiser, Angel)
September 11, 2019 Filing 5 Motion to allow Richard M. Schreiber to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-6486191) filed by Eric L. Dirks on behalf of William Prince. (Dirks, Eric)
September 11, 2019 Filing 4 Motion to allow Andrew W. Dunlap to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-6486187) filed by Eric L. Dirks on behalf of William Prince. (Dirks, Eric)
September 10, 2019 Filing 3 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by William Prince. Kansas City Tree Care, LLC served on 8/16/2019, answer due 9/6/2019. (Dirks, Eric)
August 8, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Kansas City Tree Care, LLC. (Woods, Gloria)
August 8, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Woods, Gloria)
August 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Kansas City Tree Care, LLC filed by Eric L. Dirks on behalf of William Prince. Filing fee $400, receipt number AMOWDC-6435422. Service due by 11/5/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Dirks, Eric)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Prince v. Kansas City Tree Care, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kansas City Tree Care, LLC
Represented By: John Ivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Prince
Represented By: Eric L. Dirks
Represented By: Andrew W. Dunlap
Represented By: Richard M. Schreiber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?