Tradebot Systems v. O'Hara et al
Plaintiff: Tradebot Systems, Inc.
Defendant: Michael McAtee, Andrew O'Hara, Tyler O'Connor, Clayton Harper, Benjamin Andelin, Daniel Krejci and Brendan Forrest
Case Number: 4:2019cv00632
Filed: August 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Brian C Wimes
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 4, 2019 Filing 29 NOTICE of filing Intent to Serve Subpoena on Jump Operations, LLC by Tradebot Systems, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Murray, Casey)
October 3, 2019 Filing 28 MOTION for extension of time to file response/reply as to #23 Suggestions in Support of Motion, #22 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Casey P. Murray on behalf of Tradebot Systems, Inc.. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 10/17/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #23 , #22 ) (Murray, Casey)
October 3, 2019 Filing 27 PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER and Jury Trial Order by Tradebot Systems, Inc.. (Murray, Casey) Modified on 10/4/2019 main document 27 replaced to remove signature block of Judge. NEF regenerated to all parties. (Kern, Kendra)
October 2, 2019 Filing 26 DESIGNATION OF MEDIATOR naming The Honorable Jay Daugherty(Murray, Casey)
October 1, 2019 Filing 25 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES filed by Jeffrey Eberhard on behalf of Defendants Benjamin Andelin, Brendan Forrest, Clayton Harper, Daniel Krejci, Michael McAtee, Tyler O'Connor, Andrew O'Hara.(Eberhard, Jeffrey)
September 30, 2019 Filing 24 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES filed by Casey P. Murray on behalf of Plaintiff Tradebot Systems, Inc..(Murray, Casey)
September 26, 2019 Filing 23 SUGGESTIONS in support re #22 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Jeffrey Eberhard on behalf of Defendants Benjamin Andelin, Brendan Forrest, Clayton Harper, Daniel Krejci, Michael McAtee, Tyler O'Connor, Andrew O'Hara. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Related document(s) #22 ) (Eberhard, Jeffrey)
September 26, 2019 Filing 22 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Jeffrey Eberhard on behalf of Benjamin Andelin, Brendan Forrest, Clayton Harper, Daniel Krejci, Michael McAtee, Tyler O'Connor, Andrew O'Hara. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 10/10/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Eberhard, Jeffrey)
September 19, 2019 Filing 21 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by All Defendants of First Set of Interrogatories & First Requests for Production of Documents to Plaintiff filed by Brian J. Zickefoose on behalf of Defendants Benjamin Andelin, Brendan Forrest, Clayton Harper, Daniel Krejci, Michael McAtee, Tyler O'Connor, Andrew O'Hara.(Zickefoose, Brian)
September 18, 2019 Filing 20 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Tradebot Systems, Inc. re First Discovery Requests to all Defendants filed by Douglas M Weems on behalf of Plaintiff Tradebot Systems, Inc..(Weems, Douglas)
September 13, 2019 Filing 19 **AMENDED** NOTICE OF HEARING - This is the official notice for this hearing. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. Due to a conflict on the Court's calendar, the Scheduling Conference is RESET for 10/17/2019 09:00 AM in Courtroom 7D, Kansas City (BCW) before District Judge Brian C. Wimes. (Baldwin, Joella)
September 6, 2019 Filing 18 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Tradebot Systems, Inc.. Andrew O'Hara served on 8/19/2019, answer due 9/26/2019. (Murray, Casey)
September 6, 2019 Filing 17 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Tradebot Systems, Inc.. Brendan Forrest served on 8/19/2019, answer due 9/26/2019. (Murray, Casey)
September 6, 2019 Filing 16 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Tradebot Systems, Inc.. Tyler O'Connor served on 8/19/2019, answer due 9/26/2019. (Murray, Casey)
September 6, 2019 Filing 15 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Tradebot Systems, Inc.. Benjamin Andelin served on 8/19/2019, answer due 9/26/2019. (Murray, Casey)
September 6, 2019 Filing 14 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Tradebot Systems, Inc.. Daniel Krejci served on 8/19/2019, answer due 9/26/2019. (Murray, Casey)
September 6, 2019 Filing 13 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Tradebot Systems, Inc.. Michael McAtee served on 8/15/2019, answer due 9/26/2019. (Murray, Casey)
September 6, 2019 Filing 12 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Tradebot Systems, Inc.. Clayton Harper served on 8/15/2019, answer due 9/26/2019. (Murray, Casey)
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDERED Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead (Doc. #4) is, with Plaintiff having no objection, GRANTED. Defendants shall file a response to the complaint on or before September 26, 2019. Signed on 9/6/2019 by District Judge Brian C. Wimes. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Boyd, Margaret)
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #6 & #7 motions to appear pro hac vice entered by Clerk of Court. Attorneys Jeffrey Eberhard and Chris Gair for defendants allowed to appear pro hac vice. This entry will serve as authorization for the pro hac participation by the attorney. Western District of Missouri Local Rule 5.1 requires documents to be filed electronically. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for a WDMO e-filing account for NextGen CM/ECF. This will enable counsel to electronically file documents and receive electronic notification of filings. Register for a WDMO e-filing account at #PACER. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Geiser, Angel)
September 6, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of appearance by Brendan L. McPherson on behalf of All Defendants (McPherson, Brendan)
September 5, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of appearance by Eric E. Packel on behalf of All Defendants (Attorney Eric E. Packel added to party Benjamin Andelin(pty:dft), Attorney Eric E. Packel added to party Brendan Forrest(pty:dft), Attorney Eric E. Packel added to party Clayton Harper(pty:dft), Attorney Eric E. Packel added to party Daniel Krejci(pty:dft), Attorney Eric E. Packel added to party Michael McAtee(pty:dft), Attorney Eric E. Packel added to party Tyler O'Connor(pty:dft), Attorney Eric E. Packel added to party Andrew O'Hara(pty:dft))(Packel, Eric)
September 5, 2019 Filing 7 Motion to allow Chris Gair to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-6476946) filed by Brian J. Zickefoose on behalf of All Defendants. (Zickefoose, Brian)
September 5, 2019 Filing 6 Motion to allow Jeffrey Eberhard to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-6476916) filed by Brian J. Zickefoose on behalf of All Defendants. (Zickefoose, Brian)
September 4, 2019 NOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your Designation of Mediator is due soon (filed as an ADR event in CM/ECF). See Notice of Inclusion and MAP General Order for specifics. (ADI, MAP)
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 RULE 16 NOTICE. Proposed scheduling order due by 10/3/2019. Rule 26 conference due by 9/19/2019. Scheduling Conference set for 10/16/2019 09:00 AM before District Judge Brian C. Wimes. Signed on 9/3/19 by District Judge Brian C. Wimes. (Baldwin, Joella)
September 3, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for extension of time to file answer re #1 Complaint,,, : AGREED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE PLEAD filed by Brian J. Zickefoose on behalf of Benjamin Andelin, Brendan Forrest, Clayton Harper, Daniel Krejci, Michael McAtee, Tyler O'Connor, Andrew O'Hara. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 9/17/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #1 ) (Attorney Brian J. Zickefoose added to party Benjamin Andelin(pty:dft), Attorney Brian J. Zickefoose added to party Brendan Forrest(pty:dft), Attorney Brian J. Zickefoose added to party Clayton Harper(pty:dft), Attorney Brian J. Zickefoose added to party Daniel Krejci(pty:dft), Attorney Brian J. Zickefoose added to party Michael McAtee(pty:dft), Attorney Brian J. Zickefoose added to party Tyler O'Connor(pty:dft), Attorney Brian J. Zickefoose added to party Andrew O'Hara(pty:dft))(Zickefoose, Brian)
August 15, 2019 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Angus White Dwyer on behalf of Plaintiff Tradebot Systems, Inc..(Dwyer, Angus)
August 12, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Benjamin Andelin, Brendan Forrest, Clayton Harper, Daniel Krejci, Michael McAtee, Tyler O'Connor, Andrew O'Hara. (Woods, Gloria)
August 9, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Woods, Gloria)
August 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Benjamin Andelin, Brendan Forrest, Clayton Harper, Daniel Krejci, Michael McAtee, Tyler O'Connor, Andrew O'Hara filed by Douglas M Weems on behalf of Tradebot Systems, Inc.. Filing fee $400, receipt number AMOWDC-6438872. Service due by 11/7/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Employment Agreement Brendan Forrest, #2 Exhibit B - Employment Agreement Andrew O'Hara, #3 Exhibit C - Employment Agreement Daniel A. Krejci, #4 Exhibit D - Employment Agreement Michael McAtee, #5 Exhibit E - Employment Agreement Benjamin Andelin, #6 Exhibit F - Employment Agreement Clayton Harper, #7 Exhibit G - Tyler O'Connor)(Weems, Douglas) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/9/2019: #8 Civil Cover Sheet) (Woods, Gloria).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tradebot Systems v. O'Hara et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael McAtee
Represented By: Eric E. Packel
Represented By: Jeffrey Eberhard
Represented By: Brian J. Zickefoose
Represented By: Brendan L. McPherson
Represented By: Chris Gair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew O'Hara
Represented By: Eric E. Packel
Represented By: Jeffrey Eberhard
Represented By: Brian J. Zickefoose
Represented By: Brendan L. McPherson
Represented By: Chris Gair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyler O'Connor
Represented By: Eric E. Packel
Represented By: Jeffrey Eberhard
Represented By: Brian J. Zickefoose
Represented By: Brendan L. McPherson
Represented By: Chris Gair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clayton Harper
Represented By: Eric E. Packel
Represented By: Jeffrey Eberhard
Represented By: Brian J. Zickefoose
Represented By: Brendan L. McPherson
Represented By: Chris Gair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Benjamin Andelin
Represented By: Eric E. Packel
Represented By: Jeffrey Eberhard
Represented By: Brian J. Zickefoose
Represented By: Brendan L. McPherson
Represented By: Chris Gair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Krejci
Represented By: Eric E. Packel
Represented By: Jeffrey Eberhard
Represented By: Brian J. Zickefoose
Represented By: Brendan L. McPherson
Represented By: Chris Gair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brendan Forrest
Represented By: Eric E. Packel
Represented By: Jeffrey Eberhard
Represented By: Brian J. Zickefoose
Represented By: Brendan L. McPherson
Represented By: Chris Gair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tradebot Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Douglas M Weems
Represented By: Angus White Dwyer
Represented By: Casey P. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?