Steinmeir et al v. United States of America
Plaintiff: George Steinmeir and Farm Bureau Town & Country Insurance Company of Missouri
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 4:2019cv00638
Filed: August 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Nanette K Laughrey
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 2, 2019 Filing 6 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by George Steinmeir. United States of America served on 9/26/2019, answer due 11/25/2019. (Roby, Eric)
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER by Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. Plaintiffs' motion for extension of her time to obtain service, Doc. #4 , is GRANTED. Plaintiffs must file proof of service on or before October 8, 2019. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Sreeprakash, Netra)
September 24, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for extension of time filed by Eric D. Roby on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 10/8/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Roby, Eric)
September 24, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to United States of America, U.S. Attorney's Office, Kansas City, MO. (Woods, Gloria)
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER ON PRETRIAL PROCEDURES. Service must be obtained on all defendants within forty (40) days of the date of this Order unless otherwise authorized by the Court. Signed on 8/15/19 by District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. (Matthes Mitra, Renea)
August 15, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to United States Bankruptcy Judge Cynthia A. Norton. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Kern, Kendra)
August 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs George Steinmeir, Farm Bureau Town & Country Insurance Company of Missouri. Filing fee $400, receipt number AMOWDC-6446209. Service due by 11/12/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court.(Roby, Eric) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/24/2019: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Woods, Gloria).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Steinmeir et al v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Steinmeir
Represented By: Eric D. Roby
Represented By: William L. Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Farm Bureau Town & Country Insurance Company of Missouri
Represented By: Eric D. Roby
Represented By: William L. Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?