Collins v. Exlservice.com
Plaintiff: Lezlie Collins
Defendant: Exlservice.com
Case Number: 4:2019cv00660
Filed: August 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: John T Maughmer
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Magistrate Assignment Returned by Lezlie Collins, Exlservice.com. Jurisdiction by magistrate accepted. ALL PARTIES HAVE CONSENTED. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent)(Melvin, Greg)
September 25, 2019 NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE ASSIGNMENT emailed to counsel for defendant. This is a docket entry only. No document is attached. Magistrate Return due by 10/16/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Melvin, Greg)
September 23, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, on behalf of Exlservice.com.(Attorney Daniel B. Boatright added to party Exlservice.com(pty:dft))(Boatright, Daniel)
September 12, 2019 Filing 4 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Lezlie Collins. Exlservice.com served on 9/9/2019, answer due 9/30/2019. (Dirks, Eric)
August 23, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Exlservice.com. (Woods, Gloria)
August 23, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of appearance by Courtney Marie Stout on behalf of Lezlie Collins (Stout, Courtney)
August 22, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to Program Director. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Woods, Gloria)
August 22, 2019 NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE ASSIGNMENT e-mailed to Plaintiff's attorney. This is a docket entry only. No document is attached. Magistrate Return due by 9/12/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Woods, Gloria)
August 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Michael A Hodgson on behalf of Lezlie Collins. Filing fee $400, receipt number AMOWDC-6457217. Service due by 11/20/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Collins Consent to Join)(Hodgson, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Collins v. Exlservice.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Exlservice.com
Represented By: Daniel B. Boatright
Represented By: Whitney Fay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lezlie Collins
Represented By: Courtney Marie Stout
Represented By: Eric L. Dirks
Represented By: Michael A Hodgson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?