iVet, L.L.C., d/b/a iVet Professional Formulas v. iVet360 Inc.
Plaintiff: iVet, L.L.C.
Defendant: iVet360 Inc.
Case Number: 4:2019cv00694
Filed: September 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Gary A Fenner
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:44
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 19, 2019 Filing 4 RETURN OF WAIVER OF SERVICE filed by iVet, L.L.C.. Waiver sent to iVet360 Inc. on 9/5/2019, answer due 11/4/2019. (Bubeck, Kellie)
September 4, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Melvin, Greg)
September 3, 2019 Filing 2 Report on the filing of an action regarding trademark number(s) 306064 and 85661916. Plaintiff(s): iVet, L.L.C. Lead Attorney for Plaintiff(s): Kellie Mitchell Bubeck, Copilevitz, Lam & Raney, 310 W. 20th Street, Suite 300, Kansas City, MO 64108 Defendant(s): iVet360 Inc. Lead Attorney for Defendant(s): n/a The civil complaint is attached. (Attachments: #1 AO 120) (Melvin, Greg)
September 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Kellie Mitchell Bubeck on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Filing fee $400, receipt number AMOWDC-6471636. Service due by 12/2/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Bubeck, Kellie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: iVet, L.L.C., d/b/a iVet Professional Formulas v. iVet360 Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: iVet, L.L.C.
Represented By: Kellie Mitchell Bubeck
Represented By: Anna Foote
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: iVet360 Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?