Haake v. VR Groups, LLC
Plaintiff: Christopher Haake
Defendant: VR Groups, LLC
Case Number: 4:2019cv00706
Filed: September 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Beth Phillips
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 2, 2019 Filing 5 RETURN OF WAIVER OF SERVICE filed by Christopher Haake. Waiver sent to VR Groups, LLC on 9/5/2019, answer due 11/4/2019. (Shaffer, Arthur)
September 6, 2019 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of service sent to Remil J. Raju on 9/5/2019 by Christopher Haake. Waiver of Service due by 10/7/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Acknowledgment of Waiver_unsigned)(Shaffer, Arthur)
September 6, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Melvin, Greg)
September 6, 2019 Filing 2 ***Remark: Report on the Filing of an Action Regarding a Copyright and a copy of complaint mailed to Register of Copyrights. (Melvin, Greg)
September 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Copyright Infringement and Breach of Contract against VR Groups, LLC filed by Arthur K. Shaffer on behalf of Christopher Haake. Filing fee $400, receipt number AMOWDC-6476991. Service due by 12/4/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Copyright Registration)(Shaffer, Arthur) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/5/2019: #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Crocker, Susan).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Haake v. VR Groups, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Haake
Represented By: Arthur K. Shaffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VR Groups, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?