Lloyd v. FedLoan Servicing et al
Plaintiff: Chiya Lloyd
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC, FedLoan Servicing, Experian Information Solutions Inc. and TransUnion LLC
Case Number: 4:2019cv00762
Filed: September 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Fernando J Gaitan
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 12, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Defendant Equifax Information Services LLC's Motion to Dismiss filed by Guillermo G. Zorogastua on behalf of Equifax Information Services, LLC. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 11/26/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 7)(Zorogastua, Guillermo)
October 31, 2019 Filing 15 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Danne Wayne Webb on behalf of Defendant Experian Information Solutions Inc..(Webb, Danne)
October 31, 2019 Filing 14 Affirmative Defenses and ANSWER to #1 Complaint, on behalf of Experian Information Solutions Inc..(Webb, Danne)
October 18, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, And Affirmative Defenses on behalf of TransUnion LLC.(Policchio, James)
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER - GRANTING #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC answer is due 11/12/2019. Signed on 10/17/19 by District Judge Fernando J. Gaitan, Jr. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Anderson, Christy)
October 17, 2019 Filing 11 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Guillermo G. Zorogastua on behalf of Defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC.(Zorogastua, Guillermo)
October 17, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for extension of time to file answer Defendant Equifax Information Services LLC's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time filed by Guillermo G. Zorogastua on behalf of Equifax Information Services, LLC. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 10/31/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attorney Guillermo G. Zorogastua added to party Equifax Information Services, LLC(pty:dft))(Zorogastua, Guillermo)
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER - GRANTING #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant Experian Information Solutions Inc. answer due 10/31/2019. Signed on 10/15/19 by District Judge Fernando J. Gaitan, Jr. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Anderson, Christy)
October 15, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for extension of time to file answer UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND filed by Danne Wayne Webb on behalf of Experian Information Solutions Inc.. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 10/29/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attorney Danne Wayne Webb added to party Experian Information Solutions Inc.(pty:dft))(Webb, Danne)
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #5 motion to appear pro hac vice entered by Clerk of Court. Attorney James L Policchio for TransUnion LLC allowed to appear pro hac vice. This entry will serve as authorization for the pro hac participation by the attorney. Western District of Missouri Local Rule 5.1 requires documents to be filed electronically. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for a WDMO e-filing account for NextGen CM/ECF. This will enable counsel to electronically file documents and receive electronic notification of filings. Register for a WDMO e-filing account at #PACER. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Russel, Jeri)
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 RULE 16 NOTICE. Please see text of order. Signed on 10/10/2019 by District Judge Fernando J. Gaitan, Jr. (Shawver, Marylynn)
October 9, 2019 Filing 5 Motion to allow James L. Policchio to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-6531414) filed by Todd A. Lubben on behalf of TransUnion LLC. (Lubben, Todd)
October 9, 2019 Filing 4 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Todd A. Lubben on behalf of Defendant TransUnion LLC.(Lubben, Todd)
October 9, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of appearance by Todd A. Lubben on behalf of TransUnion LLC (Attorney Todd A. Lubben added to party TransUnion LLC(pty:dft))(Lubben, Todd)
September 20, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Equifax Information Services, LLC, Experian Information Solutions Inc., FedLoan Servicing, TransUnion LLC. (Woods, Gloria)
September 20, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to United States Bankruptcy Judge Cynthia A. Norton. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Woods, Gloria)
September 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Chiya C Lloyd on behalf of Chiya Lloyd. Filing fee $400, receipt number AMOWDC-6499557. Service due by 12/18/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Cover Sheet)(Lloyd, Chiya)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lloyd v. FedLoan Servicing et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FedLoan Servicing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TransUnion LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chiya Lloyd
Represented By: Chiya C Lloyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?