Davis v. Waypoint Resource Group, LLC
Plaintiff: LaTasha Davis
Defendant: Waypoint Resource Group, LLC
Case Number: 4:2019cv00814
Filed: October 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Nanette K Laughrey
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 27, 2019 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES filed by Matthew D. Guletz on behalf of Defendant Waypoint Resource Group, LLC.(Guletz, Matthew)
November 20, 2019 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES filed by Brandon B Carney on behalf of Plaintiff LaTasha Davis.(Carney, Brandon)
November 15, 2019 Filing 11 RULES OF TRIAL. Signed on 11/14/19 by District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. (Matthes Mitra, Renea)
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 4/13/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 5/4/2020. Pretrial Conference set for 9/2/2020 at 02:00 PM. Jury Trial set for 9/14/2020 at 09:00 AM. Signed on 11/14/19 by District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. (Attachments: #1 Memo on PTC) (Matthes Mitra, Renea)
November 13, 2019 Filing 9 DESIGNATION OF MEDIATOR naming Richard Mcleod(Carney, Brandon)
November 13, 2019 Filing 8 Joint PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER by LaTasha Davis. (Carney, Brandon)
October 30, 2019 NOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your Designation of Mediator is due soon (filed as an ADR event in CM/ECF). See Notice of Inclusion and MAP General Order for specifics. (ADI, MAP)
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER entered by Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. Proposed scheduling order due by 11/18/2019. Rule 26 conference due by 11/12/2019. Signed on 10/28/19 by District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. (Matthes Mitra, Renea)
October 27, 2019 Filing 6 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Matthew D. Guletz on behalf of Defendant Waypoint Resource Group, LLC.(Guletz, Matthew)
October 27, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint on behalf of Waypoint Resource Group, LLC.(Attorney Matthew D. Guletz added to party Waypoint Resource Group, LLC(pty:dft))(Guletz, Matthew)
October 17, 2019 Filing 4 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by LaTasha Davis. LaTasha Davis served on 10/8/2019, answer due 10/29/2019. (Carney, Brandon)
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER ON PRETRIAL PROCEDURES. Service must be obtained on all defendants within forty (40) days of the date of this Order unless otherwise authorized by the Court. Signed on 10/8/19 by District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. (Matthes Mitra, Renea)
October 7, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Waypoint Resource Group, LLC. (Woods, Gloria)
October 7, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Woods, Gloria)
October 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against LaTasha Davis LaTasha Davis. Filing fee $400, receipt number AMOWDC-6526575. Service due by 1/6/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Carney, Brandon)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davis v. Waypoint Resource Group, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Waypoint Resource Group, LLC
Represented By: Matthew D. Guletz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LaTasha Davis
Represented By: Brandon B Carney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?