Doe v. HRB Professional Resources LLC
Plaintiff: John Doe
Defendant: HRB Professional Resources LLC
Case Number: 4:2019cv00817
Filed: October 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Howard F Sachs
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 29:0794
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 5, 2019 Filing 12 SUGGESTIONS in opposition re #6 MOTION to dismiss case or, in the alternative, to stay proceedings and compel arbitration filed by Mark V. Dugan on behalf of Plaintiff AB. Reply suggestions due by 12/19/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Arbitration agreement with opt-out addendum, #2 Exhibit B, Declaration of AB)(Related document(s) #6 ) (Dugan, Mark)
December 5, 2019 Filing 11 REPLY SUGGESTIONS to motion re #2 MOTION for leave to file Anonymously filed by Mark V. Dugan on behalf of Plaintiff AB. (Related document(s) #2 ) (Dugan, Mark)
December 5, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of appearance by Whitney Fay on behalf of HRB Professional Resources LLC (Attorney Whitney Fay added to party HRB Professional Resources LLC(pty:dft))(Fay, Whitney)
December 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 RULE 16 NOTICE. Proposed scheduling order due by 1/24/2020. Signed on 12/4/19 by District Judge Howard F. Sachs. (Anderson, Christy)
November 21, 2019 Filing 8 SUGGESTIONS in opposition re #2 MOTION for leave to file Anonymously filed by Daniel B. Boatright on behalf of Defendant HRB Professional Resources LLC. Reply suggestions due by 12/5/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #2 ) (Boatright, Daniel)
November 21, 2019 Filing 7 SUGGESTIONS in support re #6 MOTION to dismiss case or, in the alternative, to stay proceedings and compel arbitration filed by Daniel B. Boatright on behalf of Defendant HRB Professional Resources LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Crew Declaration, #2 Exhibit B- Boatright Declaration, #3 Exhibit C- Orders)(Related document(s) #6 ) (Boatright, Daniel)
November 21, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to dismiss case or, in the alternative, to stay proceedings and compel arbitration filed by Daniel B. Boatright on behalf of HRB Professional Resources LLC. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 12/5/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attorney Daniel B. Boatright added to party HRB Professional Resources LLC(pty:dft))(Boatright, Daniel)
November 18, 2019 HRB Professional Resources LLC answer due 11/21/2019. (Ellis, Lindsey)
November 15, 2019 Filing 5 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by AB. served on 10/31/2019, answer due 11/21/2019. (Schlozman, Heather) Modified on 11/18/2019 to show date of service and set answer deadline; NEF regenerated (Ellis, Lindsey).
October 15, 2019 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT First Amended Complaint against HRB Professional Resources LLC filed by Mark V. Dugan on behalf of John Doe. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Charge of Discrimination, #2 Exhibit B, Notice of Right to Sue, #3 Exhibit C, Charge of Discrimination, #4 Exhibit D, Notice of Right to Sue)(Dugan, Mark)
October 8, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to HRB Professional Resources LLC. (Woods, Gloria)
October 8, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to United States Magistrate Judge Lajuana M. Counts. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Woods, Gloria)
October 7, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for leave to file Anonymously filed by Mark V. Dugan on behalf of John Doe. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 10/21/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Dugan, Mark)
October 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against HRB Professional Resources LLC filed by Mark V. Dugan on behalf of John Doe. Filing fee $400, receipt number AMOWDC-6527369. Service due by 1/6/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Charge of Discrimination, #2 Exhibit B, Notices of Right to Sue, #3 Exhibit C, Charge of Discrimination, #4 Exhibit D, Notices of Right to Sue, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Dugan, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doe v. HRB Professional Resources LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HRB Professional Resources LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe
Represented By: Mark V. Dugan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?