Madearis v. Sandberg, Phoenix & Von Gontard
Plaintiff: Rachel Madearis
Defendant: Sandberg, Phoenix & Von Gontard
Case Number: 4:2019cv00865
Filed: October 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Greg Kays
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 24, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Blake Michael Edwards on behalf of Sandberg, Phoenix & Von Gontard. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 1/7/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Suggestions In Support)(Attorney Blake Michael Edwards added to party Sandberg, Phoenix & Von Gontard(pty:dft))(Edwards, Blake)
December 18, 2019 Filing 7 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Rachel Madearis. Sandberg, Phoenix & Von Gontard served on 12/4/2019, answer due 12/26/2019. (Crocker, Susan)
December 3, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Sandberg, Phoenix & Von Gontard. USM285, certified order, and complaint hand delivered to USM this date. (Woods, Gloria)
November 25, 2019 Filing 6 COMPLAINT against Sandberg, Phoenix & Von Gontard by Rachel Madearis. Partial Filing fee of $100 paid 11/25/19. Service due by 2/24/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Attachment, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Crocker, Susan)
November 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER denying #3 motion to appoint counsel. A copy has been mailed to Plaintiff. Signed on 11/1/19 by District Judge Greg Kays. (Law clerk)
October 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting in part #1 motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. A copy has been mailed to Plaintiff. Signed on 10/30/19 by District Judge Greg Kays. (Law clerk)
October 28, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to appoint counsel filed by Rachel Madearis. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 11/12/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Woods, Gloria)
October 28, 2019 Filing 2 FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT by Rachel Madearis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Woods, Gloria)
October 28, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by Rachel Madearis. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 11/12/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Attachment to Complaint, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Woods, Gloria)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Madearis v. Sandberg, Phoenix & Von Gontard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rachel Madearis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandberg, Phoenix & Von Gontard
Represented By: Blake Michael Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?