Roberts v. SSA
Plaintiff: Reahlene Roberts
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Case Number: 4:2019cv00880
Filed: November 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Willie J Epps
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405si
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 16, 2019 Filing 6 RETURN OF SERVICE of Social Security complaint on United States Attorney. Summons served on 11/27/2019 Social security answer due by 1/27/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. Record of Submission due by 2/25/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Smith, James)
December 2, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Magistrate Assignment Returned by Reahlene Roberts, Andrew M. Saul. Jurisdiction by magistrate accepted. ALL PARTIES HAVE CONSENTED. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent defendant)(Geiser, Angel)
November 7, 2019 Filing 4 SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT filed by James M Smith on behalf of Reahlene Roberts. (Filing fee $400 receipt number ifp) filed byJames M Smith on behalf of Reahlene Roberts. Service due by 2/5/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court.(Smith, James)
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #1 motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. Signed on 11/4/2019 by Magistrate Judge Willie J. Epps, Jr. (Warren, Jonathan)
November 1, 2019 NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE ASSIGNMENT e-mailed to Plaintiff's counsel. This is a docket entry only. No document is attached. Magistrate Return due by 11/22/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Woods, Gloria)
November 1, 2019 Filing 2 SUGGESTIONS in support re #1 MOTION for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by James M Smith on behalf of Plaintiff Reahlene Roberts. (Related document(s) #1 ) (Smith, James)
November 1, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by James M Smith on behalf of Reahlene Roberts. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 11/15/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit Proposed Complaint, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Attorney James M Smith added to party Reahlene Roberts(pty:pla))(Smith, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roberts v. SSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Represented By: OGCSSAR7
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reahlene Roberts
Represented By: James M Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?