Dugas v. Saul
Plaintiff: Kristen Brooke Dugas
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Case Number: 4:2019cv00883
Filed: November 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: John T Maughmer
Referring Judge: Beth Phillips
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT from Magistrate Judge John T. Maughmer to Chief District Judge Beth Phillips. Please note the new case number: 19-883-CV-W-BP. (Melvin, Greg)
December 19, 2019 SECOND NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE ASSIGNMENT emailed to plaintiff's counsel. This is a docket entry only. No document is attached. Magistrate Return due by 1/9/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Melvin, Greg)
November 25, 2019 NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE ASSIGNMENT. This is a docket entry only. No document is attached. Magistrate Return due by 12/16/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Kern, Kendra)
November 18, 2019 Filing 3 SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT filed by Cathleen A Shine on behalf of Kristen Brooke Dugas. (Filing fee $400 receipt number ifp) filed byCathleen A Shine on behalf of Kristen Brooke Dugas. Service due by 2/18/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court.(Shine, Cathleen)
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER granting #1 motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. Counsel for plaintiff shall be responsible for electronically filing the complaint within ten days from the date of this Order and for service of process in accordance with Rule 4 of the Fed. Rules of Civil Procedure, Signed on 11/12/19 by Magistrate Judge John T. Maughmer. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Alexander, Pam)
November 3, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by Cathleen A Shine on behalf of Kristen Brooke Dugas. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 11/18/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Affidavit, #3 Exhibit)(Attorney Cathleen A Shine added to party Kristen Brooke Dugas(pty:pla))(Shine, Cathleen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dugas v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Represented By: OGCSSAR7
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristen Brooke Dugas
Represented By: Cathleen A Shine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?