Pollack v. Saul
Plaintiff: James Michael Pollack
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Case Number: 4:2019cv00892
Filed: November 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: John T Maughmer
Referring Judge: Brian C Wimes
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 27, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT from Magistrate Judge John T. Maughmer to District Judge Brian C. Wimes. Please note the new case number: 19-892-CV-W-BCW. (Melvin, Greg)
November 12, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Andrew M. Saul, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Kern, Kendra)
November 6, 2019 NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE ASSIGNMENT. This is a docket entry only. No document is attached. Magistrate Return due by 11/27/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. Form e-mailed to Plaintiff's counsel.(Kern, Kendra)
November 5, 2019 Filing 1 SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT filed by Roger M. Driskill on behalf of James Michael Pollack. (Filing fee $400 receipt number AMOWDC-6570821) Service due by 2/3/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Driskill, Roger)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pollack v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Represented By: OGCSSAR7
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Michael Pollack
Represented By: Roger M. Driskill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?