Bowers v. Alpine Property Management et al
Plaintiff: Eric Bowers
Defendant: Alpine Property Management, Cara Painter and Marcus Painter
Case Number: 4:2019cv00901
Filed: November 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Gary A Fenner
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:0106A
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 30, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for default judgment as to Defendant Alpine Property Management filed by Richard A. Voytas, Jr on behalf of Eric Bowers. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 1/13/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Proposed Order)(Voytas, Richard)
December 12, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #8 MOTION for entry of default. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 12/26/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Houston, Kiambu)
December 12, 2019 Filing 8 Application for Clerk's Entry of Default by Eric Bowers (Attachments: #1 Proposed Entry)(Voytas, Richard) Modified on 12/13/2019 to reflect as motion/application (Houston, Kiambu).
December 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE why case should not be dismissed against defendant Alpine Property Management.Show Cause Response due by 1/2/2020. Signed on 12/11/19 by District Judge Gary A. Fenner. (Mitchell, Lisa) Copy mailed on 12/11/2019 to Alpine Property Management, Kansas City LLC, Registered Agent, Julie Anderson, Esq., 4006 Central St., Kansas City MO 64111 (Houston, Kiambu).
December 4, 2019 Filing 6 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Eric Bowers. Alpine Property Management served on 11/15/2019, answer due 12/6/2019. (Voytas, Richard)
November 8, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to Program Director. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Kern, Kendra)
November 8, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Alpine Property Management, Cara Painter, Marcus Painter. (Kern, Kendra)
November 8, 2019 Filing 4 ***Remark A copy of AO 121, complaint and docket sheet mailed via regular mail to: Register of Copyrights U.S. Copyright Office 101 Independence Ave. S.E. Washington, D.C. 20559-6000. (Kern, Kendra)
November 8, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of filing AO 121 Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or Appeal Regarding a Copyright by Eric Bowers (Voytas, Richard)
November 8, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of appearance by Richard A. Voytas, Jr on behalf of Eric Bowers (Voytas, Richard)
November 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Alpine Property Management, Cara Painter, Marcus Painter filed by Richard A. Voytas, Jr on behalf of Eric Bowers. Filing fee $400, receipt number AMOWDC-6575616. Service due by 2/6/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5)(Voytas, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bowers v. Alpine Property Management et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alpine Property Management
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cara Painter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marcus Painter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Bowers
Represented By: Nathan Kyle Bruns
Represented By: Richard A. Voytas, Jr.
Represented By: Nathan Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?