Powers v. Life Insurance Company of North America
Plaintiff: Freida Powers
Defendant: Life Insurance Company of North America
Case Number: 4:2019cv00906
Filed: November 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Lajuana M Counts
Referring Judge: Fernando J Gaitan
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 3, 2020 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, on behalf of Life Insurance Company of North America.(Attorney Christopher J. Leopold added to party Life Insurance Company of North America(pty:dft))(Leopold, Christopher)
December 25, 2019 NOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your Designation of Mediator is due soon (filed as an ADR event in CM/ECF). See Notice of Inclusion and MAP General Order for specifics. (ADI, MAP)
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 RULE 16 NOTICE. Please see text of order. Signed on 12/20/2019 by District Judge Fernando J. Gaitan, Jr. (Shawver, Marylynn)
December 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER - GRANTING #6 Defendant's Second Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Life Insurance Company of North America answer is due on or before 1/3/2020. Signed on 12/19/19 by District Judge Fernando J. Gaitan, Jr. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Anderson, Christy)
December 18, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for extension of time To File Answer filed by William E. Hanna on behalf of Life Insurance Company of North America. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 1/2/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Hanna, William)
December 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER - GRANTING #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant Life Insurance Company of North America answer is due on or before 12/20/2019. Signed on 12/10/19 by District Judge Fernando J. Gaitan, Jr. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Anderson, Christy)
December 10, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for extension of time to file answer Unopposed filed by William E. Hanna on behalf of Life Insurance Company of North America. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 12/24/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attorney William E. Hanna added to party Life Insurance Company of North America(pty:dft))(Hanna, William)
November 15, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT from Magistrate Judge Lajuana M. Counts to District Judge Fernando J. Gaitan, Jr. Please note the new case number: 19-906-CV-W-FJG. (Melvin, Greg)
November 14, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Life Insurance Company of North America. (Kern, Kendra)
November 14, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Kern, Kendra)
November 14, 2019 NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE ASSIGNMENT. This is a docket entry only. No document is attached. Magistrate Return due by 12/5/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. Form emailed to Plaintiff's counsel.(Kern, Kendra)
November 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Life Insurance Company of North America filed by Kyle Henry Sciolaro on behalf of Freida Powers. Filing fee $400, receipt number AMOWDC-6577697. Service due by 2/10/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Sciolaro, Kyle)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Powers v. Life Insurance Company of North America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Freida Powers
Represented By: Kyle Henry Sciolaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Life Insurance Company of North America
Represented By: Christopher J. Leopold
Represented By: William E. Hanna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?