Vazquez-Rivera v. H&R Block, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Brenda Vazquez-Rivera
Defendant: H&R Block Tax Services LLC and H&R Block Inc
Case Number: 4:2019cv00911
Filed: November 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Gary A Fenner
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 13, 2019 Filing 38 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Kern, Kendra)
November 13, 2019 Filing 37 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Illinois Northern; Case Number 1:19-cv-00035.
November 13, 2019 Filing 36 TRANSFERRED to the Western District of Missouri the electronic record. (kp, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 11/13/2019.]
May 31, 2019 Filing 34 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles R. Norgle:Motion to appear pro hac vice #16 is granted. Motion to appear pro hac vice #17 is granted. Motion to appear pro hac vice #18 is granted. Motion to transfer #25 is granted. Civil case terminated. Mailed notice (ewf, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 11/13/2019.]
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER: Defendants' unopposed motions to transfer each of the above-captioned matters to the Western District of Missouri pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404 is granted as to all cases. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by the Honorable Charles R. Norgle, Sr on May 29, 2019. Mailed notice(ph, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 11/13/2019.]
May 14, 2019 Filing 33 RESPONSE by Defendants H&R Block Tax Services L.L.C., H&R Block, Inc. to Plaintiffs' Notice of Supplemental Authority filed in Related Matter (18-cv-7435, Docket Entry No. 53) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Rothstein, Michael) [Transferred from ilnd on 11/13/2019.]
April 26, 2019 Filing 32 REPLY by H&R Block Tax Services L.L.C., H&R Block, Inc. to MOTION by Defendants H&R Block Tax Services L.L.C., H&R Block, Inc. to compel Arbitration on an Individual Basis and/or to Dismiss H&R Block, Inc. for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, or, in the Alternative, to Transfer Venue under 28 U.S.C. Section 1 #25 , response in opposition to motion, #31 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Scott W. Andreasen, #2 Declaration of Michael I Rothstein)(Rothstein, Michael) [Transferred from ilnd on 11/13/2019.]
April 5, 2019 Filing 31 RESPONSE by Brenda Vazquez-Riverain Opposition to MOTION by Defendants H&R Block Tax Services L.L.C., H&R Block, Inc. to compel Arbitration on an Individual Basis and/or to Dismiss H&R Block, Inc. for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, or, in the Alternative, to Transfer Venue under 28 U.S.C. Section 1 #25 (Miller, Mark) [Transferred from ilnd on 11/13/2019.]
March 13, 2019 Filing 30 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 3/8/19 before the Honorable Charles R. Norgle, Sr. Motion hearing. Order Number: 34024. Court Reporter Contact Information: Laura Renke, OfficialTranscript@gmail.com, 312.435.6053. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 4/3/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/15/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/11/2019. (Renke, Laura) [Transferred from ilnd on 11/13/2019.]
March 11, 2019 Filing 29 DECLARATION of Scott W. Andreasen regarding motion to compel, #25 (Corrected Exhibits) (Rothstein, Michael) [Transferred from ilnd on 11/13/2019.]
March 11, 2019 Filing 28 DECLARATION of Michael I Rothstein (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Rothstein, Michael) [Transferred from ilnd on 11/13/2019.]
March 8, 2019 Filing 27 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles R. Norgle:Unopposed Motion to Sequence Defendants' Responsive Pleadings #23 is granted. Motion hearing held on 3/8/2019. Plaintiffs' response to Defendants' Motion to Compel Arbitration on an Individual Basis and/or to Dismiss HR Block, Inc.,or, in the Alternative, to Transfer Venue #25 is due on or before 4/5/2019. Defendants' reply is due on or before 4/26/2019. Leave is granted to file briefs in excess of 15 pages. Counsel may submit an agreed order regarding briefing schedules in related cases. Mailed notice (ewf, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 11/13/2019.]
March 5, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE of Motion by Michael I. Rothstein for presentment of motion to compel, #25 before Honorable Charles R. Norgle Sr. on 3/8/2019 at 09:30 AM. (Rothstein, Michael) [Transferred from ilnd on 11/13/2019.]
March 5, 2019 Filing 25 MOTION by Defendants H&R Block Tax Services L.L.C., H&R Block, Inc. to compel Arbitration on an Individual Basis and/or to Dismiss H&R Block, Inc. for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, or, in the Alternative, to Transfer Venue under 28 U.S.C. Section 1404 (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Scott W. Andreasen, #2 Declaration Declaration of Eric S. Hochstadt)(Rothstein, Michael) [Transferred from ilnd on 11/13/2019.]
March 5, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE of Motion by Michael I. Rothstein for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief #23 before Honorable Charles R. Norgle Sr. on 3/8/2019 at 09:30 AM. (Rothstein, Michael) [Transferred from ilnd on 11/13/2019.]
March 5, 2019 Filing 23 MOTION by Defendants H&R Block Tax Services L.L.C., H&R Block, Inc.Unopposed Motion to Sequence Defendants' Responsive Pleadings (Rothstein, Michael) [Transferred from ilnd on 11/13/2019.]
March 5, 2019 Filing 22 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Defendants H&R Block Tax Services L.L.C., H&R Block, Inc. (Rothstein, Michael) (Docket Text Modified by Clerk's Office on 3/6/2019 (lf, )). [Transferred from ilnd on 11/13/2019.]
March 5, 2019 Filing 21 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants H&R Block Tax Services L.L.C., H&R Block, Inc. by Eric S. Hochstadt (Hochstadt, Eric) [Transferred from ilnd on 11/13/2019.]
March 5, 2019 Filing 20 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants H&R Block Tax Services L.L.C., H&R Block, Inc. by David Jason Lender (Lender, David) [Transferred from ilnd on 11/13/2019.]
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER: Attorney David J. Lender's Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice #12 is granted. Attorney Eric S. Hochstadt's Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice #3 is granted. Signed by the Honorable Charles R. Norgle, Sr on March 5, 2019. Mailed notice (ph, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 11/13/2019.]
March 5, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-15553132. (Fisher, Len) [Transferred from ilnd on 11/13/2019.]
March 5, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-15553080. (Caldes, William) [Transferred from ilnd on 11/13/2019.]
March 5, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-15553028. (Spector, Eugene) [Transferred from ilnd on 11/13/2019.]
March 4, 2019 Filing 15 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants H&R Block Tax Services L.L.C., H&R Block, Inc. by Uriel B. Abt (Abt, Uriel) [Transferred from ilnd on 11/13/2019.]
March 4, 2019 Filing 14 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants H&R Block Tax Services L.L.C., H&R Block, Inc. by Michael I. Rothstein (Rothstein, Michael) [Transferred from ilnd on 11/13/2019.]
March 1, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-15545585. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Hochstadt, Eric) [Transferred from ilnd on 11/13/2019.]
March 1, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-15545565. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Lender, David) [Transferred from ilnd on 11/13/2019.]
February 21, 2019 Filing 11 EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: Case reassigned to the Honorable Charles R. Norgle, Sr for all further proceedings pursuant to Local Rule 40.4. Related case No. 18cv7435. Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 2/21/19.(gcy, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 11/13/2019.]
January 10, 2019 Filing 10 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr:This case is set for an initial status conference on 3/19/19 at 9:00 a.m. The parties are directed to review the procedures for initial status conferences, located at [https://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/judge-info.aspx?79eF+7uiX7ewBj/ITKrjoA==], and to submit the required initial status report no later than 3/12/19. Mailed notice (air, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 11/13/2019.]
January 9, 2019 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Brenda Vazquez-Rivera. H&R Block Tax Services L.L.C. waiver sent on 1/4/2019, answer due 3/5/2019. (Hogan, Brian) [Transferred from ilnd on 11/13/2019.]
January 9, 2019 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Brenda Vazquez-Rivera. H&R Block, Inc. waiver sent on 1/4/2019, answer due 3/5/2019. (Hogan, Brian) [Transferred from ilnd on 11/13/2019.]
January 4, 2019 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants H&R Block Tax Services L.L.C. and H&R Block, Inc. (jjr, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 11/13/2019.]
January 4, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (pk, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 11/13/2019.]
January 3, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable M. David Weisman. Case assignment: Random assignment. (jjr, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 11/13/2019.]
January 3, 2019 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Brenda Vazquez-Rivera by Brian M. Hogan (Hogan, Brian) [Transferred from ilnd on 11/13/2019.]
January 3, 2019 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Brenda Vazquez-Rivera by Robert J. Wozniak (Wozniak, Robert) [Transferred from ilnd on 11/13/2019.]
January 3, 2019 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Brenda Vazquez-Rivera by Douglas A Millen (Millen, Douglas) [Transferred from ilnd on 11/13/2019.]
January 3, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Brenda Vazquez-Rivera by Steven A Kanner (Kanner, Steven) [Transferred from ilnd on 11/13/2019.]
January 3, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Kanner, Steven) [Transferred from ilnd on 11/13/2019.]
January 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Brenda Vazquez-Rivera; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15329310.(Kanner, Steven) [Transferred from ilnd on 11/13/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vazquez-Rivera v. H&R Block, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda Vazquez-Rivera
Represented By: Eugene A. Spector
Represented By: William G. Caldes
Represented By: Douglas A. Millen
Represented By: Robert J. Wozniak
Represented By: Brian M. Hogan
Represented By: Steven A. Kanner
Represented By: Len Allen Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H&R Block Tax Services LLC
Represented By: Uriel B. Abt
Represented By: David J Lender
Represented By: Eric Shaun Hochstadt
Represented By: Michael I. Rothstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H&R Block Inc
Represented By: Uriel B. Abt
Represented By: David J Lender
Represented By: Eric Shaun Hochstadt
Represented By: Michael I. Rothstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?