Robinson v. H&R Block, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Deborah Robinson
Defendant: H&R Block Tax Services LLC and H&R Block Inc
Case Number: 4:2019cv00912
Filed: November 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Howard F Sachs
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 13, 2019 Filing 29 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to Program Director. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Kern, Kendra)
November 13, 2019 Filing 28 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Illinois Northern; Case Number 1:19-cv-00134.
November 13, 2019 Filing 27 TRANSFERRED to the Western District of Missouri the electronic record. (kp, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 11/13/2019.]
May 31, 2019 Filing 25 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles R. Norgle: Motion to transfer #21 is granted. Civil case terminated. Mailed notice (ewf, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 11/13/2019.]
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER: Defendants' unopposed motions to transfer each of the above-captioned matters to the Western District of Missouri pursuant to 28 U.S.C. $ 1404 is granted as to all cases. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by the Honorable Charles R. Norgle, Sr on 5/29/2019. Mailed notice (nsf, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 11/13/2019.]
May 28, 2019 Filing 24 REPLY by Defendants H&R Block Tax Services, LLC, H&R Block, Inc. to memorandum in opposition to motion #23 (Rothstein, Michael) [Transferred from ilnd on 11/13/2019.]
May 6, 2019 Filing 23 MEMORANDUM by Deborah Robinson in Opposition to motion to compel, #21 (Albert, Lee) [Transferred from ilnd on 11/13/2019.]
April 8, 2019 Filing 22 DECLARATION of Eric S. Hochstadt regarding motion to compel, #21 Arbitration on an Individual Basis and/or to Dismiss H&R Block, Inc. for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, or, in the Alternative, to Transfer Venue under 28 U.S.C. Section 1404 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Rothstein, Michael) [Transferred from ilnd on 11/13/2019.]
April 8, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION by Defendants H&R Block Tax Services, LLC, H&R Block, Inc. to compel Arbitration on an Individual Basis and/or to Dismiss H&R Block, Inc. for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, or, in the Alternative, to Transfer Venue under 28 U.S.C. Section 1404 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Scott W. Andreasen)(Rothstein, Michael) [Transferred from ilnd on 11/13/2019.]
April 8, 2019 Filing 20 Corporate Disclosure STATEMENT by H&R Block Tax Services, LLC, H&R Block, Inc. (Rothstein, Michael) [Transferred from ilnd on 11/13/2019.]
April 8, 2019 Filing 19 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants H&R Block Tax Services, LLC, H&R Block, Inc. by Eric S. Hochstadt (Hochstadt, Eric) [Transferred from ilnd on 11/13/2019.]
April 8, 2019 Filing 18 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants H&R Block Tax Services, LLC, H&R Block, Inc. by David Jason Lender (Lender, David) [Transferred from ilnd on 11/13/2019.]
April 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER: Attorney David J. Lender's Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice #11 is granted. Attorney Eric S. Hochstadt's Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice #13 is granted. Signed by the Honorable Charles R. Norgle, Sr on 4/1/2019. Mailed notice (lf, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 11/13/2019.]
March 21, 2019 Filing 16 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles R. Norgle: Unopposed Motion to Sequence Defendants' Responsive Pleadings and Set Agreed Upon Briefing Schedule #14 is granted. The parties are not required to appear before the court on Friday, May 22, 2019. Mailed notice (ewf, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 11/13/2019.]
March 19, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Motion by Michael I. Rothstein for presentment of motion by filer to set a briefing schedule #14 before Honorable Charles R. Norgle Sr. on 3/22/2019 at 09:30 AM. (Rothstein, Michael) [Transferred from ilnd on 11/13/2019.]
March 19, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION by Defendants H&R Block Tax Services, LLC, H&R Block, Inc. to set a briefing schedule Unopposed Motion to Sequence Defendants' Responsive Pleadings and Set Agreed Upon Briefing Schedule (Rothstein, Michael) [Transferred from ilnd on 11/13/2019.]
March 15, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-15599932. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Hochstadt, Eric) [Transferred from ilnd on 11/13/2019.]
March 15, 2019 Filing 12 Exhibit A to #11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by H&R Block Tax Services, LLC, H&R Block, Inc. (Lender, David) [Transferred from ilnd on 11/13/2019.]
March 15, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-15599578. (Lender, David) [Transferred from ilnd on 11/13/2019.]
March 4, 2019 Filing 10 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants H&R Block Tax Services, LLC, H&R Block, Inc. by Uriel B. Abt (Abt, Uriel) [Transferred from ilnd on 11/13/2019.]
March 4, 2019 Filing 9 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants H&R Block Tax Services, LLC, H&R Block, Inc. by Michael I. Rothstein (Rothstein, Michael) [Transferred from ilnd on 11/13/2019.]
February 21, 2019 MIDP NOTICE: This case has been reassigned to a judge that is not participating in the MIDP Program therefore, this case is no longer part of MIDP Program #8 (bg, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 11/13/2019.]
February 21, 2019 Filing 8 EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: Case reassigned to the Honorable Charles R. Norgle, Sr for all further proceedings. Honorable Virginia M. Kendall no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 2/21/2019. (bg, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 11/13/2019.]
February 7, 2019 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Deborah Robinson. H&R Block Tax Services, LLC waiver sent on 2/5/2019, answer due 4/8/2019. (Albert, Lee) [Transferred from ilnd on 11/13/2019.]
February 7, 2019 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Deborah Robinson. H&R Block, Inc. waiver sent on 2/5/2019, answer due 4/8/2019. (Albert, Lee) [Transferred from ilnd on 11/13/2019.]
February 5, 2019 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants H&R Block Tax Services, LLC, H&R Block, Inc. (kb, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 11/13/2019.]
January 9, 2019 Filing 5 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Attorney Lee Albert's Motion to appear pro hac vice #3 is granted. Mailed notice (lk, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 11/13/2019.]
January 9, 2019 Filing 4 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Initial status hearing set for 3/18/2019 at 9:00 a.m. Joint Status Report due by 3/13/2019. The parties are directed to Judge Kendall's web page found at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov for information about the Initial Status Report and for information regarding all standing orders for cases on Judge Kendall's docket. The parties shall follow all of the standing orders for Judge Kendall and all Local Rules which can be found at the same web page. For the Initial Status Report, the parties are to report on the following: (1) Possibility of settlement in the case; (2) if no possibility of settlement exists, the nature and length of discovery necessary (with specific dates) to get the case ready for trial; 3) whether the parties jointly consent to proceed before the Magistrate Judge. At the Initial Status Hearing, the Parties shall be prepared to inform the Court about the extent of monetary damages in order for the Court to address the proportionality of discovery as required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 26. Lead counsel is directed to appear at this status hearing. (lk, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 11/13/2019.]
January 8, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-15343575. (Albert, Lee) [Transferred from ilnd on 11/13/2019.]
January 8, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (lf, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 11/13/2019.]
January 8, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Mary M. Rowland. Case assignment: Random assignment. (jjr, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 11/13/2019.]
January 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (Class Action) filed by Deborah Robinson; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15341362. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Khowaja, Kasif) [Transferred from ilnd on 11/13/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Robinson v. H&R Block, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H&R Block Tax Services LLC
Represented By: Michael I. Rothstein
Represented By: Eric Shaun Hochstadt
Represented By: David J Lender
Represented By: Uriel B. Abt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H&R Block Inc
Represented By: Michael I. Rothstein
Represented By: Eric Shaun Hochstadt
Represented By: David J Lender
Represented By: Uriel B. Abt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah Robinson
Represented By: Lee Albert
Represented By: Kasif Khowaja
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?