House v. Medtronic plc
Plaintiff: Christine House
Defendant: Medtronic plc
Case Number: 4:2019cv00918
Filed: November 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Roseann Ketchmark
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 SCHEDULING ORDER:Discovery due by 8/12/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 9/17/2020. Status Conference set for 7/16/2020 01:30 PM; Initial Pretrial Conference set for 1/15/2021 01:30 PM; Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/12/2021 01:30 PM; and Jury Trial set for 2/15/2021 08:30 AM in Courtroom 8E, Kansas City (RK) before District Judge Roseann Ketchmark. Signed on January 8, 2020 by District Judge Roseann Ketchmark. (Wheeler, LaTandra)
January 3, 2020 Filing 15 Joint PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER by Medtronic plc. (Fay, Whitney)
December 18, 2019 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Medtronic plc Certificate of Service of Defendant's First Interrogatories and First Requests for Production filed by Jeannie M. DeVeney on behalf of Defendant Medtronic plc.(DeVeney, Jeannie)
December 4, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint Defendant's Answer to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint on behalf of Medtronic plc.(DeVeney, Jeannie)
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORAL ORDER MAP Mediation Conference set for 3/5/2020 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 6E, Kansas City (LMC) before Magistrate Judge Lajuana M. Counts. The parties are directed to review Judge Counts' Standing Order for MAP Mediations and Settlement Conferences located on the Court's website at https://www.mow.uscourts.gov/judges/counts and comply with its directives. Furthermore, the parties are directed to review the MAP General Order found on the Mediation and Assessment Program section of the Court's website. The parties are directed to contact chambers forthwith if they believe the mediation conference will exceed half-a-day. Signed on December 2, 2019 by Magistrate Judge Lajuana M. Counts. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Clinton, Erica)
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 RULE 16 NOTICE. Rule 26 conference due by 12/20/2019. Proposed scheduling order due by 1/3/2020. Signed on November 20, 2019 by District Judge Roseann Ketchmark. (Wheeler, LaTandra)
November 20, 2019 Filing 10 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs filed by Tristen Jason Woods on behalf of All Plaintiffs.(Woods, Tristen)
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #7 motion for extension of time to file response/reply to Plaintiff's complaint. Defendant shall have until 12/20/19 to file a responsive pleading. Signed on 11/20/19 by District Judge Roseann Ketchmark. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Dollar, Jordan)
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #5 motion to amend/correct the Complaint. Plaintiff shall have until 11/27/19 to file their amended Complaint. Signed on 11/20/19 by District Judge Roseann Ketchmark. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Dollar, Jordan)
November 19, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for extension of time to file response/reply filed by Jeannie M. DeVeney on behalf of Medtronic plc. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 12/3/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (DeVeney, Jeannie)
November 19, 2019 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Christine House filed by Tristen Jason Woods on behalf of All Plaintiffs.(Woods, Tristen)
November 18, 2019 Filing 5 Amended MOTION to amend/correct Petition filed by Tristen Jason Woods on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 12/2/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Woods, Tristen)
November 15, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of appearance by Tristen Jason Woods on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attorney Tristen Jason Woods added to party Christine House(pty:pla))(Woods, Tristen)
November 15, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to United States Magistrate Judge Lajuana M. Counts. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Ellis, Lindsey)
November 14, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of filing of Amended Exhibit A to the Notice of Removal by Medtronic plc re #1 Notice of Removal, (DeVeney, Jeannie)
November 14, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Jackson County, case number 1916-CV27853, Medtronic plc. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMOWDC-6584524. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(DeVeney, Jeannie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: House v. Medtronic plc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medtronic plc
Represented By: Jeannie M. DeVeney
Represented By: Whitney Fay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christine House
Represented By: Tristen Jason Woods
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?