Burris v. Apple Inc.
Plaintiff: Wade C Burris
Defendant: Apple Inc.
Case Number: 4:2019cv00925
Filed: November 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Roseann Ketchmark
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 19, 2019 Filing 7 SUGGESTIONS in support re #6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Holly P. Smith on behalf of Defendant Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A)(Related document(s) #6 ) (Smith, Holly)
December 19, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Holly P. Smith on behalf of Apple Inc.. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 1/2/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Smith, Holly)
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 unopposed motion for extension of time. Defendant's answer is due 12/19/2019; Plaintiff's suggestions in opposition to Defendant's anticipated motion to dismiss shall be due 1/21/2020; and Defendant's reply in support of its motion to dismiss shall be due 2/7/2020. Signed on 11/26/2019 by District Judge Roseann Ketchmark. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Phillips, Caleb)
November 25, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for extension of time (Unopposed) filed by Holly P. Smith on behalf of Apple Inc.. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 12/9/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Smith, Holly)
November 19, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Woods, Gloria)
November 19, 2019 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Holly P. Smith on behalf of Defendant Apple Inc..(Smith, Holly)
November 19, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL of Civil Action from Circuit Court of Jackson County, Missouri at Kansas City County, case number 1916-CV27826, Apple Inc.. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMOWDC-6590554. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(Smith, Holly)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Burris v. Apple Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple Inc.
Represented By: Molly S Carella
Represented By: Jennifer Jean Artman
Represented By: Holly P. Smith
Represented By: John F Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wade C Burris
Represented By: Phyllis A Norman
Represented By: Mitchell L. Burgess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?