Pierce v. Gaming Partners Int'l, USA, Inc.
Plaintiff: Thomas Pierce
Defendant: Gaming Partners Int'l, USA, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2019cv00993
Filed: December 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Beth Phillips
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 7/22/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 9/25/2020. Teleconference set for 1/29/2021 10:30 AM. Pretrial Conference set for 2/12/2021, 1:30 PM Courtroom 7A, Kansas City (BP) before Chief District Judge Beth Phillips. Jury Trial set for 2/22/2021, 8:30 PM in Courtroom 7A, Kansas City (BP) before Chief District Judge Beth Phillips. Signed on 2/7/20 by Chief District Judge Beth Phillips. (Cordell, Annette)
February 5, 2020 NOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your post-mediation status report is due within 10 calendar days after the mediation. See MAP FAQs on Court's website for specifics and submit report(s) to: map@mow.uscourts.gov. (ADI, MAP)
February 4, 2020 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES filed by Daniel Patrick Johnson on behalf of Defendant Gaming Partners Int'l, USA, Inc..(Johnson, Daniel)
February 4, 2020 Filing 11 DESIGNATION OF MEDIATOR naming Nancy Kenner(Johnson, Daniel)
February 4, 2020 Filing 10 Joint PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER by Gaming Partners Int'l, USA, Inc.. (Johnson, Daniel)
January 24, 2020 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Gaming Partners Int'l, USA, Inc. (D's 1st ROGs & RFPDs to P) filed by Daniel Patrick Johnson on behalf of Defendant Gaming Partners Int'l, USA, Inc..(Johnson, Daniel)
January 22, 2020 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Thomas Pierce of Interrogatories, RFAs, and RFPs filed by Phillip M. Murphy, II on behalf of Plaintiff Thomas Pierce.(Murphy, Phillip)
January 22, 2020 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES filed by Phillip M. Murphy, II on behalf of Plaintiff Thomas Pierce.(Murphy, Phillip)
December 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER. RULE 16 NOTICE. Proposed scheduling order due by 2/4/2020. Rule 26 conference due by 1/21/2020. Signed on 12/18/19 by Chief District Judge Beth Phillips. (Cordell, Annette)
December 11, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Woods, Gloria)
December 11, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of filing Notice of Removal with State Court by Gaming Partners Int'l, USA, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal, (Johnson, Daniel)
December 11, 2019 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Daniel Patrick Johnson on behalf of Defendant Gaming Partners Int'l, USA, Inc..(Johnson, Daniel)
December 11, 2019 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) filed by Daniel Patrick Johnson on behalf of Defendant Gaming Partners Int'l, USA, Inc.. (Johnson, Daniel)
December 11, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Jackson County, MO County, case number 1916-CV27136, filed by Daniel Patrick Johnson on behalf of Gaming Partners Int'l, USA, Inc.. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMOWDC-6624137. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Court File, #2 Exhibit B - Yang Declaration, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Johnson, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pierce v. Gaming Partners Int'l, USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gaming Partners Int'l, USA, Inc.
Represented By: Claudia My Tran
Represented By: Daniel Patrick Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Pierce
Represented By: Phillip M. Murphy, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?