Butner v. Coreslab Structures Missouri, Inc.
Plaintiff: Courtney Butner
Defendant: Coreslab Structures Missouri, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2019cv01003
Filed: December 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Roseann Ketchmark
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:451
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 6, 2020 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Coreslab Structures Missouri, Inc. filed by Michael L. Matula on behalf of Defendant Coreslab Structures Missouri, Inc..(Matula, Michael)
February 5, 2020 Filing 12 PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER by Coreslab Structures Missouri, Inc.. (Matula, Michael)
February 3, 2020 Filing 11 Remand letter sent to Saline County Circuit Clerk per Order #10 . Count V only remanded back to Saline County. (Crocker, Susan)
January 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER severing and remanding Count V to state court. The Court directs the Clerk's office to advise the state court of this Order by regular mail. Signed on 1/31/2020 by District Judge Roseann Ketchmark. (Phillips, Caleb)
January 23, 2020 Filing 9 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Anne Hershewe on behalf of Defendant Coreslab Structures Missouri, Inc..(Hershewe, Anne)
January 16, 2020 Filing 8 ***Remark: The main document for the Court's Order to Show Cause #7 has been replaced to correct the show-cause response date. The response date is January 30, 2020, not January 30, 2019. (Phillips, Caleb)
January 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Plaintiff's show cause response is due by 1/30/2020. Signed on 1/16/2020 by District Judge Roseann Ketchmark. (Phillips, Caleb) (Main Document 7 replaced on 1/16/2020) (Phillips, Caleb).
January 8, 2020 NOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your Designation of Mediator is due soon (filed as an ADR event in CM/ECF). See Notice of Inclusion and MAP General Order for specifics. (ADI, MAP)
January 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 RULE 16 NOTICE. Rule 26 conference due by 2/5/2020. Proposed scheduling order due by 2/19/2020. Signed on January 6, 2020 by District Judge Roseann Ketchmark. (Wheeler, LaTandra)
December 20, 2019 Filing 5 Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint to Plaintiff's Complaint for Damages on behalf of Coreslab Structures Missouri, Inc..(Hershewe, Anne)
December 16, 2019 Filing 4 AMENDED NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Houston, Kiambu)
December 13, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of filing Notice of Removal with the Circuit Court of Saline County, Missouri by Coreslab Structures Missouri, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Hershewe, Anne)
December 13, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to Program Director. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Ellis, Lindsey)
December 13, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Saline County County, case number 19-SA-CV00875, Coreslab Structures Missouri, Inc.. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMOWDC-6627797. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hershewe, Anne)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Butner v. Coreslab Structures Missouri, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Courtney Butner
Represented By: Gerald Gray, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coreslab Structures Missouri, Inc.
Represented By: Michael L. Matula
Represented By: Anne Hershewe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?