Loomis v. Ameristar Casino Kansas City, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Garrett Loomis
Defendant: Ameristar Casino Kansas City, LLC, John Doe 2 and John Doe 1
Case Number: 4:2019cv01009
Filed: December 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Greg Kays
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accomodations
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #17 motion for extension of time to file response/reply re Brief in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Remand. Reply suggestions due by 2/24/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. Signed on 2/12/2020 by District Judge Greg Kays. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Law Clerk)
February 10, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION for extension of time to file response/reply Brief in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Remand filed by Aiman Dvorak on behalf of Garrett Loomis. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 2/24/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Dvorak, Aiman)
February 5, 2020 NOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your post-mediation status report is due within 10 calendar days after the mediation. See MAP FAQs on Court's website for specifics and submit report(s) to: map@mow.uscourts.gov. (ADI, MAP)
February 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 12/15/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 1/15/2021. Pretrial Conference set for 5/25/2021 10:00 AM via telephone conference initiated by Plaintiff's counsel. Jury Trial set for 6/15/2021 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8D, Kansas City (DGK) before District Judge Greg Kays. Signed on 2/4/2020 by District Judge Greg Kays. (Strodtman, Tracy)
February 3, 2020 Filing 15 Joint PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER by Garrett Loomis. (Dvorak, Aiman)
February 3, 2020 Filing 14 DESIGNATION OF MEDIATOR naming Joe Eischens(Dvorak, Aiman)
January 29, 2020 Filing 13 SUGGESTIONS in opposition re #9 MOTION to remand or in the Alternative, to Allow Limited Jurisdictional Discovery to Confirm Citizenship of Defendants John Doe 1 and John Doe 2, in Order to Allow Plaintiff to Amend his Petition to Substitute these Fictitious Defendants filed by Phillip C. Thompson on behalf of Defendant Ameristar Casino Kansas City, LLC. Reply suggestions due by 2/12/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #9 ) (Thompson, Phillip)
January 22, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of appearance by Aiman Dvorak on behalf of Garrett Loomis (Attorney Aiman Dvorak added to party Garrett Loomis(pty:pla))(Dvorak, Aiman)
January 21, 2020 Filing 11 REPLY SUGGESTIONS to motion re #6 MOTION to dismiss case filed by Phillip C. Thompson on behalf of Defendant Ameristar Casino Kansas City, LLC. (Related document(s) #6 ) (Thompson, Phillip)
January 15, 2020 Filing 10 SUGGESTIONS in support re #9 MOTION to remand or in the Alternative, to Allow Limited Jurisdictional Discovery to Confirm Citizenship of Defendants John Doe 1 and John Doe 2, in Order to Allow Plaintiff to Amend his Petition to Substitute these Fictitious Defendants filed by Kirk Daniel Holman on behalf of Plaintiff Garrett Loomis. (Related document(s) #9 ) (Holman, Kirk)
January 15, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to remand or in the Alternative, to Allow Limited Jurisdictional Discovery to Confirm Citizenship of Defendants John Doe 1 and John Doe 2, in Order to Allow Plaintiff to Amend his Petition to Substitute these Fictitious Defendants filed by Kirk Daniel Holman on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 1/29/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Holman, Kirk)
January 6, 2020 Filing 8 SUGGESTIONS in opposition re #6 MOTION to dismiss case filed by Kirk Daniel Holman on behalf of Plaintiff Garrett Loomis. Reply suggestions due by 1/21/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Affidavit of KDH, #2 Exhibit 2 - Investigative File)(Related document(s) #6 ) (Holman, Kirk)
December 23, 2019 Filing 7 SUGGESTIONS in support re #6 MOTION to dismiss case filed by Phillip C. Thompson on behalf of Defendant Ameristar Casino Kansas City, LLC. (Related document(s) #6 ) (Thompson, Phillip)
December 23, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to dismiss case filed by Phillip C. Thompson on behalf of Ameristar Casino Kansas City, LLC. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 1/6/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Thompson, Phillip)
December 23, 2019 Filing 5 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Phillip C. Thompson on behalf of Defendant Ameristar Casino Kansas City, LLC.(Thompson, Phillip)
December 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 RULE 16 NOTICE. Rule 26 conference due by 1/21/2020. Proposed scheduling order due by 2/3/2020. Signed on 12/18/19 by District Judge Greg Kays. (Strodtman, Tracy)
December 17, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Houston, Kiambu)
December 16, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of filing Notice of Removal to Plaintiff by Ameristar Casino Kansas City, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Notice of Removal)(Russell, Kyle)
December 16, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Clay County, case number 19CY-CV05902, filed by Kyle B. Russell on behalf of Ameristar Casino Kansas City, LLC. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMOWDC-6630514. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit B - Documents Filed in State Court Action, #3 Exhibit C - Affidavit of Sarah Bassett)(Russell, Kyle)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Loomis v. Ameristar Casino Kansas City, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Garrett Loomis
Represented By: Aiman Dvorak
Represented By: Kirk Daniel Holman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ameristar Casino Kansas City, LLC
Represented By: Kyle B. Russell
Represented By: Phillip C. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?