Bowers v. Northeast Kansas City Chamber of Commerce
Plaintiff: Eric Bowers
Defendant: Northeast Kansas City Chamber of Commerce
Case Number: 4:2020cv00020
Filed: January 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Brian C Wimes
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:0106A
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order of Dismissal. Signed on 2/25/2020 by District Judge Brian C. Wimes. (Baldwin, Joella)
February 5, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of settlement and Motion to Stay Proceedings Suggestions in Opposition/Response Deadline:2/19/20 this deadline will apply unless otherwise directed by the court by Eric Bowers (Voytas, Richard) Modified on 2/6/2020 to correct filing event and set deadline. NEF regenerated to all parties. (Kern, Kendra)
January 20, 2020 Filing 5 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Eric Bowers. Northeast Kansas City Chamber of Commerce served on 1/15/2020, answer due 2/5/2020. (Voytas, Richard)
January 10, 2020 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Northeast Kansas City Chamber of Commerce. (Woods, Gloria)
January 10, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Woods, Gloria)
January 9, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of filing AO 121 Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or Appeal Regarding a Copyright by Eric Bowers (Voytas, Richard)
January 9, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of appearance by Richard A. Voytas, Jr on behalf of Eric Bowers (Voytas, Richard)
January 9, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Northeast Kansas City Chamber of Commerce filed by Richard A. Voytas, Jr on behalf of Eric Bowers. Filing fee $400, receipt number AMOWDC-6664241. Service due by 4/8/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5)(Voytas, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bowers v. Northeast Kansas City Chamber of Commerce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northeast Kansas City Chamber of Commerce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Bowers
Represented By: Richard A. Voytas, Jr.
Represented By: Nathan Kyle Bruns
Represented By: Nathan Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?