Barnhart v. Thatcher, Sr. et al
Plaintiff: David Brian Barnhart
Defendant: Jason Ellis, Bankers Security Safe and Vault and Mark Thatcher, Sr.
Case Number: 4:2020cv00033
Filed: January 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Lajuana M Counts
Referring Judge: Fernando J Gaitan
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 704
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 9, 2020 Filing 16 Pro Se NOTICE of filing of Case Management Report and Proposed Discovery Schedule, by David Brian Barnhart. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(Woods, Gloria)
March 9, 2020 Filing 15 REPLY SUGGESTIONS to motion re #10 MOTION to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Timothy A Hilton on behalf of Defendants Bankers Security Safe and Vault, Jason Ellis, Mark Thatcher, Sr.. (Related document(s) #10 ) (Hilton, Timothy)
February 25, 2020 Filing 14 PRO SE SUGGESTIONS in opposition re #10 MOTION to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM on behalf of Plaintiff David Brian Barnhart. Reply suggestions due by 3/10/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(Related document(s) #10 ) (Melvin, Greg)
February 19, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT from Magistrate Judge Lajuana M. Counts to District Judge Fernando J. Gaitan, Jr. New case number: 20-33-CV-W-FJG (Willis, Kathy)
February 19, 2020 NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE ASSIGNMENT emailed to Defendants' counsel. This is a docket entry only. No document is attached. Magistrate Return due by 3/11/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Willis, Kathy)
February 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 RULE 16 NOTICE. Proposed scheduling order due on or before 4/6/2020. Rule 26 conference due by 3/23/2020. The parties are directed to review and comply with the Notice of Pretrial Procedures. Signed on February 12, 2020 by Magistrate Judge Lajuana M. Counts. (Clinton, Erica) Modified on 2/12/2020- a copy of this Notice was sent via-first class US Mail to David Brian Barnhart, 1615 Grand Ave. #501, Perryville, MO 63775 . (Chorny, Traci).
February 11, 2020 Filing 11 SUGGESTIONS in support re #10 MOTION to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Timothy A Hilton on behalf of Defendants Bankers Security Safe and Vault, Jason Ellis, Mark Thatcher, Sr.. (Related document(s) #10 ) (Hilton, Timothy)
February 11, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction , MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Timothy A Hilton on behalf of All Defendants. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 2/25/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Hilton, Timothy)
February 11, 2020 Filing 9 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Timothy A Hilton on behalf of Defendants Bankers Security Safe and Vault, Jason Ellis, Mark Thatcher, Sr..(Hilton, Timothy)
February 11, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of appearance by Jessica Lynn Barranco on behalf of All Defendants (Attorney Jessica Lynn Barranco added to party Bankers Security Safe and Vault(pty:dft), Attorney Jessica Lynn Barranco added to party Jason Ellis(pty:dft), Attorney Jessica Lynn Barranco added to party Mark Thatcher, Sr.(pty:dft))(Barranco, Jessica)
February 11, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of appearance by Timothy A Hilton on behalf of All Defendants (Attorney Timothy A Hilton added to party Bankers Security Safe and Vault(pty:dft), Attorney Timothy A Hilton added to party Jason Ellis(pty:dft), Attorney Timothy A Hilton added to party Mark Thatcher, Sr.(pty:dft))(Hilton, Timothy)
January 31, 2020 ***Remark: All service of process forms along with copies of the complaint and certified copies of the NEF for Doc. 3 (oral order) were hand-delivered to the US Marshal's Office on 1/31/2020 for service. (Melvin, Greg)
January 23, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to Program Director. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order) (A copy of the MAP notice and general order were mailed to David Brian Barnhart, 1615 Grand Ave. #501, Perryville, MO 63775 on 1/23/2020.)(Melvin, Greg)
January 23, 2020 Filing 4 ***Remark *** Per order dated 1/22/2020, a copy of the order along with summonses and USM-285 forms were mailed to Plaintiff with instructions to complete and return to the Clerk's Office for delivery to the U.S. Marshals. The forms were mailed via USPS to the address on file. (Woods, Gloria)
January 22, 2020 Filing 5 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed on behalf of David Brian Barnhart. Service due by 4/21/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Woods, Gloria)
January 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORAL ORDER granting #1 Application for Leave to File Action Without Payment of Fees with Affidavit of Financial Status in Support. The Clerk's office is directed to electronically file Plaintiff's Complaint as of the date of this order and shall forward appropriate process forms to Plaintiff. Within twenty days, Plaintiff shall return the completed summons and service forms to the Clerk's office showing the address where Defendants may be served. The Clerk of the Court is directed to issue summons and process and deliver the same to the United States Marshal for service upon the Defendants. Signed on January 22, 2020 by Magistrate Judge Lajuana M. Counts. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Clinton, Erica)
January 16, 2020 Filing 2 FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT by David Brian Barnhart. (Woods, Gloria)
January 16, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by David Brian Barnhart. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 1/30/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Woods, Gloria) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/16/2020: #3 Envelope) (Woods, Gloria).
January 16, 2020 NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE ASSIGNMENT mailed via USPS to Plaintiff. This is a docket entry only. No document is attached. Magistrate Return due by 2/6/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Woods, Gloria)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barnhart v. Thatcher, Sr. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Brian Barnhart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Ellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bankers Security Safe and Vault
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Thatcher, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?