Bates v. Amazon Logistics, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Vernon Bates
Defendant: Abdurazaq A Jama, Amazon Logistics, Inc. and Banana Logistics, LLC
Case Number: 4:2020cv00114
Filed: February 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Fernando J Gaitan
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 2, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of appearance by Joan Sheridan on behalf of Banana Logistics, LLC, Abdurazaq A Jama (Attorney Joan Sheridan added to party Banana Logistics, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Joan Sheridan added to party Abdurazaq A Jama(pty:dft))(Sheridan, Joan)
April 1, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of appearance by John G. Schultz on behalf of Banana Logistics, LLC, Abdurazaq A Jama (Schultz, John)
April 1, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of filing of Intention to File Motion for Leave to File Answer Out of Time by Banana Logistics, LLC, Abdurazaq A Jama re #11 Answer to Complaint, (Schultz, John)
April 1, 2020 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand on behalf of Banana Logistics, LLC, Abdurazaq A Jama.(Attorney John G. Schultz added to party Banana Logistics, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney John G. Schultz added to party Abdurazaq A Jama(pty:dft))(Schultz, John)
April 1, 2020 NOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your Designation of Mediator is due soon (filed as an ADR event in CM/ECF). See Notice of Inclusion and MAP General Order for specifics. (ADI, MAP)
March 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 RULE 16 NOTICE. Please see text of order. Signed on 3/30/20 by District Judge Fernando J. Gaitan, Jr. (Shawver, Marylynn)
March 30, 2020 Filing 9 Amazon Logistics, Inc.'s ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand , CROSSCLAIM against Banana Logistics, LLC, Abdurazaq A Jama on behalf of Amazon Logistics, Inc..(Tranen, Daniel)
March 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Amazon Logistics, Inc. answer due 3/31/2020. Signed on 03/16/2020 by District Judge Fernando J. Gaitan, Jr. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Powers, Jo)
March 16, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for extension of time to file answer filed by Daniel E. Tranen on behalf of Amazon Logistics, Inc.. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 3/30/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Tranen, Daniel)
March 10, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of appearance by Daniel E. Tranen on behalf of Amazon Logistics, Inc. (Attorney Daniel E. Tranen added to party Amazon Logistics, Inc.(pty:dft))(Tranen, Daniel)
March 10, 2020 Filing 5 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Vernon Bates. Banana Logistics, LLC served on 3/5/2020, answer due 3/26/2020. (O'Grady, Matthew)
March 3, 2020 Filing 4 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Vernon Bates. Amazon Logistics, Inc. served on 2/25/2020, answer due 3/17/2020. (O'Grady, Matthew)
March 2, 2020 Filing 3 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Vernon Bates. Abdurazaq A Jama served on 2/27/2020, answer due 3/19/2020. (O'Grady, Matthew)
February 19, 2020 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Amazon Logistics, Inc. d/b/a Amazon Prime, Banana Logistics, LLC, Abdurazaq A Jama. (Kern, Kendra)
February 19, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Kern, Kendra)
February 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Matthew P O'Grady on behalf of Vernon Bates. Filing fee $400, receipt number AMOWDC-6733570. Service due by 5/19/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(O'Grady, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bates v. Amazon Logistics, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abdurazaq A Jama
Represented By: John G. Schultz
Represented By: Joan Sheridan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon Logistics, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel E. Tranen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Banana Logistics, LLC
Represented By: John G. Schultz
Represented By: Joan Sheridan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vernon Bates
Represented By: Matthew P O'Grady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?