Price et al v. Young America Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Michelle Price and Marlon Price
Defendant: Young America Insurance Company and Shirley Thompson
Case Number: 4:2020cv00149
Filed: February 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Howard F Sachs
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 28, 2020 Remand letter and instructions sent to Circuit Court of Jackson County, Missouri via certified mail 7012 3460 0001 7395 8439. This is a text entry only - no document is attached (Kern, Kendra)
August 4, 2020 Filing 25 CLERK'S JUDGMENT (Matthes Mitra, Renea)
August 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER entered by Judge Howard F. Sachs granting motion to remand this case to the Circuit Court of Jackson County, Missouri, Doc. #9 . Signed on 8/4/20 by District Judge Howard F. Sachs. (Matthes Mitra, Renea)
May 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER - GRANTING #17 motion to stay. Discovery in this case is stayed pending resolution of the state court appeal. Signed on 5/19/20 by District Judge Howard F. Sachs. (Anderson, Christy)
May 19, 2020 Filing 22 NOTICE to take deposition of Shirley Thompson filed by Kirk Rowan Presley on behalf of Plaintiffs Marlon Price, Michelle Price.(Presley, Kirk)
May 15, 2020 Filing 21 REPLY SUGGESTIONS to motion re #17 MOTION to stay discovery pending resolution of related state court appeal filed by Michael E Mumford on behalf of Defendant Young America Insurance Company. (Related document(s) #17 ) (Mumford, Michael)
May 11, 2020 Filing 20 SUGGESTIONS in opposition re #17 MOTION to stay discovery pending resolution of related state court appeal filed by Kirk Rowan Presley on behalf of Plaintiffs Marlon Price, Michelle Price. Reply suggestions due by 5/26/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Respondents' Brief)(Related document(s) #17 ) (Presley, Kirk)
May 4, 2020 Filing 19 Joint PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER by Marlon Price, Michelle Price. (Presley, Kirk)
May 4, 2020 Filing 18 SUGGESTIONS in support re #17 MOTION to stay discovery pending resolution of related state court appeal filed by Michael E Mumford on behalf of Defendant Young America Insurance Company. (Related document(s) #17 ) (Mumford, Michael) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/4/2020 at the request of counsel: #1 Exhibit) (Houston, Kiambu).
May 4, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION to stay discovery pending resolution of related state court appeal filed by Michael E Mumford on behalf of Young America Insurance Company. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 5/18/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Mumford, Michael)
April 22, 2020 Filing 16 DESIGNATION OF MEDIATOR naming Hon. Jay Daugherty(Presley, Kirk)
April 3, 2020 Filing 15 REPLY SUGGESTIONS to motion re #9 MOTION to remand filed by Kirk Rowan Presley on behalf of Plaintiffs Marlon Price, Michelle Price. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit E, #2 Exhibit Exhibit F, #3 Exhibit Exhibit G, #4 Exhibit Exhibit H, #5 Exhibit Exhibit I, #6 Exhibit Exhibit J, #7 Exhibit Exhibit K, #8 Exhibit Exhibit L)(Related document(s) #9 ) (Presley, Kirk)
March 25, 2020 NOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your Designation of Mediator is due soon (filed as an ADR event in CM/ECF). See Notice of Inclusion and MAP General Order for specifics. (ADI, MAP)
March 23, 2020 Filing 14 SUGGESTIONS in opposition re #9 MOTION to remand filed by Lynn W. Hursh on behalf of Defendant Young America Insurance Company. Reply suggestions due by 4/6/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Desai v. Garcia Empire Petition, #2 Exhibit 2 - Sorrell v. Garrison Prop. & Cas. Ins. Co. Petition)(Related document(s) #9 ) (Hursh, Lynn)
March 21, 2020 Filing 13 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Marlon Price, Michelle Price. (Presley, Kirk)
March 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 RULE 16 NOTICE. Proposed scheduling order due by 5/8/2020. Signed on 3/20/20 by District Judge Howard F. Sachs. (Anderson, Christy)
March 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #6 & #7 motions to appear pro hac vice entered by Clerk of Court. Attorneys Michael Mumford and Ernest E. Vargo for Young America Insurance Company allowed to appear pro hac vice. This entry will serve as authorization for the pro hac participation by the attorney. Western District of Missouri Local Rule 5.1 requires documents to be filed electronically. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for a WDMO e-filing account for NextGen CM/ECF. This will enable counsel to electronically file documents and receive electronic notification of filings. Register for a WDMO e-filing account at #PACER. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Geiser, Angel)
March 9, 2020 Filing 10 SUGGESTIONS in support re #9 MOTION to remand filed by Kirk Rowan Presley on behalf of Plaintiffs Marlon Price, Michelle Price. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D)(Related document(s) #9 ) (Presley, Kirk)
March 9, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to remand filed by Kirk Rowan Presley on behalf of Marlon Price, Michelle Price. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 3/23/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Presley, Kirk)
March 9, 2020 Filing 8 SUGGESTIONS in opposition to #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL, filed by Andrew S. LeRoy on behalf of Defendant Shirley Thompson. Reply suggestions due by 3/23/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (LeRoy, Andrew) Modified on 3/9/2020 to create relationship to doc. no. #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL. (Moore, Terri).
March 5, 2020 Filing 7 Motion to allow Ernest E. Vargo to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-6761986) filed by Kathryn Cox Bascom on behalf of Young America Insurance Company. (Bascom, Kathryn)
March 5, 2020 Filing 6 Motion to allow Michael Mumford to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-6761970) filed by Kathryn Cox Bascom on behalf of Young America Insurance Company. (Bascom, Kathryn)
March 5, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint DEFENDANT SHIRLEY THOMPSONS CROSS-CLAIMS on behalf of Young America Insurance Company.(Hursh, Lynn)
March 5, 2020 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint on behalf of Young America Insurance Company.(Hursh, Lynn)
February 28, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Kern, Kendra)
February 27, 2020 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Lynn W. Hursh on behalf of Defendant Young America Insurance Company.(Hursh, Lynn)
February 27, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Jackson County, Missouri County, case number 2016-CV02819, filed by Lynn W. Hursh on behalf of Young America Insurance Company. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMOWDC-6749952. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Return of Service, #3 Exhibit B - Garnishment and Cross-Claim, #4 Exhibit C - State Court File)(Hursh, Lynn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Price et al v. Young America Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Young America Insurance Company
Represented By: Lynn W. Hursh
Represented By: Kathryn Cox Bascom
Represented By: William Ray Price, Jr.
Represented By: Ernest E. Vargo
Represented By: Michael E Mumford
Represented By: Megan J. Ochs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shirley Thompson
Represented By: Andrew S. LeRoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Price
Represented By: Matthew Allen McCoy
Represented By: Kirk Rowan Presley
Represented By: Joseph M. Backer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marlon Price
Represented By: Matthew Allen McCoy
Represented By: Kirk Rowan Presley
Represented By: Joseph M. Backer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?