Bartle v. TD Ameritrade Holdings Corp. et al
Plaintiff: Annette Mackey Bartle
Defendant: TD Ameritrade Holdings Corp.
Case Number: 4:2020cv00166
Filed: March 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Stephen R Bough
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 22, 2020 Filing 19 Before the Court is Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply Suggestions in Support of Motion to Dismiss. (Doc. #18). For good cause stated the Motion is granted. Defendant TD Ameritrade Holdings Corp. is granted an extension of time until and including May 12, 2020, to file its reply suggestions in support of its motion to dismiss. Signed on 4/22/20 by District Judge Stephen R. Bough. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Diefenbach, Tracy)
April 22, 2020 Filing 18 Consent MOTION for extension of time to file response/reply as to #14 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Jason M. Hans on behalf of TD Ameritrade Holdings Corp.. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 5/6/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #14 ) (Hans, Jason)
April 22, 2020 NOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your Designation of Mediator is due soon (filed as an ADR event in CM/ECF). See Notice of Inclusion and MAP General Order for specifics. (ADI, MAP)
April 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 RULE 16 NOTICE. Proposed scheduling order due by 6/1/2020. Scheduling Conference set for 6/15/2020 09:00 AM in Courtroom 7B, Kansas City (SRB) before District Judge Stephen R. Bough. Signed on 4/17/20 by District Judge Stephen R. Bough. (Diefenbach, Tracy)
April 14, 2020 Filing 16 SUGGESTIONS in opposition re #14 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by David L Marcus on behalf of Plaintiff Annette Mackey Bartle. Reply suggestions due by 4/28/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) #14 ) (Marcus, David)
April 7, 2020 Filing 15 SUGGESTIONS in support re #14 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Jason M. Hans on behalf of Defendant TD Ameritrade Holdings Corp.. (Related document(s) #14 ) (Hans, Jason)
April 7, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Jason M. Hans on behalf of TD Ameritrade Holdings Corp.. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 4/21/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Hans, Jason)
April 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #11 motion to appear pro hac vice entered by Clerk of Court. Attorney Theodore L. Kornobis for TD Ameritrade Holdings Corp. allowed to appear pro hac vice. This entry will serve as authorization for the pro hac participation by the attorney. Western District of Missouri Local Rule 5.1 requires documents to be filed electronically. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for a WDMO e-filing account for NextGen CM/ECF. This will enable counsel to electronically file documents and receive electronic notification of filings. Register for a WDMO e-filing account at #PACER. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Berner, Crystal)
April 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #10 motion to appear pro hac vice entered by Clerk of Court. Attorney Stephen G. Topetzes for TD Ameritrade Holdings Corp. allowed to appear pro hac vice. This entry will serve as authorization for the pro hac participation by the attorney. Western District of Missouri Local Rule 5.1 requires documents to be filed electronically. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for a WDMO e-filing account for NextGen CM/ECF. This will enable counsel to electronically file documents and receive electronic notification of filings. Register for a WDMO e-filing account at #PACER. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Berner, Crystal)
April 7, 2020 Filing 11 Motion to allow Theodore L. Kornobis to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-6810645) filed by Jason M. Hans on behalf of TD Ameritrade Holdings Corp.. (Hans, Jason)
April 7, 2020 Filing 10 Motion to allow Stephen G. Topetzes to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-6810639) filed by Jason M. Hans on behalf of TD Ameritrade Holdings Corp.. (Hans, Jason)
April 2, 2020 Filing 9 Before the Court is Defendant's Unopposed Motion to Exceed Page Limitation. (Doc. #8). For good cause stated the motion is granted. Defendant is granted leave to file its suggestions in support of its forthcoming Motion to Dismiss in a length up to and including 25 pages. Additionally, Plaintiff is granted leave to file its response in opposition to Defendants forthcoming Motion to Dismiss in a length up to, and including, 25 pages. Signed on 4/2/20 by District Judge Stephen R. Bough. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Diefenbach, Tracy)
April 2, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for leave to file excess pages filed by Jason M. Hans on behalf of TD Ameritrade Holdings Corp.. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 4/16/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Hans, Jason)
March 10, 2020 Filing 7 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Annette Mackey Bartle. TD Ameritrade Holdings Corp. served on 2/3/2020, answer due 2/24/2020. (Marcus, David)
March 5, 2020 Filing 6 Before the Court is Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. (Doc. #5). For good cause stated the motion is granted. Defendant's deadline to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is extended until and including April 7, 2020. Signed on 3/5/20 by District Judge Stephen R. Bough. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Diefenbach, Tracy)
March 5, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for extension of time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Jason M. Hans on behalf of TD Ameritrade Holdings Corp.. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 3/19/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Hans, Jason)
March 5, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Woods, Gloria)
March 4, 2020 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by TD Ameritrade Holdings Corp. re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Jason M. Hans on behalf of Defendant TD Ameritrade Holdings Corp.. Related document: #1 Notice of Removal, filed by TD Ameritrade Holdings Corp..(Hans, Jason)
March 4, 2020 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Jason M. Hans on behalf of Defendant TD Ameritrade Holdings Corp..(Hans, Jason)
March 4, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Jackson County, Missouri County, case number No. 2016-CV02520, TD Ameritrade Holdings Corp. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMOWDC-6760445. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Hans, Jason)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bartle v. TD Ameritrade Holdings Corp. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TD Ameritrade Holdings Corp.
Represented By: Jason M. Hans
Represented By: Theodore L. Kornobis
Represented By: Stephen G. Topetzes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Annette Mackey Bartle
Represented By: David L Marcus
Represented By: Jared Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?