Legend Brands, Inc. v. Soap Daddy LLC et al
Plaintiff: Legend Brands, Inc.
Defendant: Deontre Winston and Soap Daddy LLC
Case Number: 4:2020cv00196
Filed: March 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Roseann Ketchmark
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 23, 2020 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Soap Daddy LLC, Deontre Winston. (Woods, Gloria)
March 20, 2020 Filing 3 Report on the filing of an action regarding trademark number(s) 1981966. Plaintiff(s): LEGEND BRANDS, INC. Lead Attorney for Plaintiff(s): John A Watt Baker, Sterchi, Cowden & Rice, LLC - KCMO 2400 Pershing Road Suite 500 Kansas City, MO 64108-2504 Defendant(s): Soap Daddy LLC, et al The civil complaint is attached. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (Woods, Gloria)
March 16, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Woods, Gloria)
March 13, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Trademark Infringement and Request for Injunctive Relief against All Defendants filed by John A Watt on behalf of Legend Brands, Inc.. Filing fee $400, receipt number AMOWDC-6776192. Service due by 6/11/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Watt, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Legend Brands, Inc. v. Soap Daddy LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deontre Winston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Soap Daddy LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Legend Brands, Inc.
Represented By: John A Watt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?