Octapharma Plasma, Inc. v. Alden Plumbing & Mechanical, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Octapharma Plasma, Inc.
Defendant: Bourdeau Contracting, LLC and Alden Plumbing & Mechanical, LLC
Case Number: 4:2020cv00210
Filed: March 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Howard F Sachs
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 12, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of appearance by John Michael Graham, Jr on behalf of Alden Plumbing & Mechanical, LLC (Attorney John Michael Graham, Jr added to party Alden Plumbing & Mechanical, LLC(pty:dft))(Graham, John)
April 16, 2020 Filing 7 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Octapharma Plasma, Inc.. Alden Plumbing & Mechanical, LLC served on 4/14/2020, answer due 5/5/2020. (Morris, James)
April 16, 2020 Filing 6 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Octapharma Plasma, Inc.. Bourdeau Contracting, LLC served on 4/9/2020, answer due 4/30/2020. (Morris, James)
March 18, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Melvin, Greg)
March 18, 2020 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Alden Plumbing & Mechanical, LLC, Bourdeau Contracting, LLC. (Melvin, Greg)
March 18, 2020 Filing 4 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by James C. Morris on behalf of Plaintiff Octapharma Plasma, Inc..(Morris, James) (Main Document 4 replaced on 3/18/2020) (Crocker, Susan).
March 18, 2020 Filing 3 Return of Service unexecuted by Octapharma Plasma, Inc. as to Bourdeau Contracting, LLC. (Morris, James) Modified on 3/18/2020: Document deleted as it was filed in error. Counsel was emailed about the proper submission of summonses to be served. NEF regenerated. (Melvin, Greg)
March 18, 2020 Filing 2 Return of Service unexecuted by Octapharma Plasma, Inc. as to Alden Plumbing & Mechanical, LLC. (Morris, James) Modified on 3/18/2020: Document deleted as it was filed in error. Counsel was emailed about the proper submission of summonses to be served. NEF regenerated. (Melvin, Greg)
March 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by James C. Morris on behalf of Octapharma Plasma, Inc.. Filing fee $400, receipt number AMOWDC-6783475. Service due by 6/16/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Morris, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Octapharma Plasma, Inc. v. Alden Plumbing & Mechanical, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Octapharma Plasma, Inc.
Represented By: James C. Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bourdeau Contracting, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alden Plumbing & Mechanical, LLC
Represented By: John Michael Graham, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?