Harrington v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Francine Harrington
Defendant: C R Bard Incorporated and Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated
Case Number: 4:2020cv00246
Filed: March 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Brian C Wimes
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Order of Dismissal. Signed on 5/4/2020 by District Judge Brian C. Wimes. (Baldwin, Joella)
April 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 RULE 16 NOTICE. Proposed scheduling order due by 5/29/2020. Rule 26 conference due by 5/15/2020. Scheduling Conference set for 6/16/2020 10:30 AM in Courtroom 7D, Kansas City (BCW) before District Judge Brian C. Wimes. Signed on 4/30/2020 by District Judge Brian C. Wimes. (Baldwin, Joella)
April 13, 2020 Filing 14 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Kara T Stubbs on behalf of Defendants Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated.(Stubbs, Kara)
April 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 motion to appear pro hac vice entered by Clerk of Court. Attorney John A. Wharton for Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated and C R Bard Incorporated allowed to appear pro hac vice. This entry will serve as authorization for the pro hac participation by the attorney. Western District of Missouri Local Rule 5.1 requires documents to be filed electronically. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for a WDMO e-filing account for NextGen CM/ECF. This will enable counsel to electronically file documents and receive electronic notification of filings. Register for a WDMO e-filing account at #PACER. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Berner, Crystal)
April 10, 2020 Filing 12 Motion to allow John A. Wharton to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-6816175) filed by Kara T Stubbs on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Stubbs, Kara)
April 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 motion to appear pro hac vice entered by Clerk of Court. Attorney Pamela J. Marple for Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated and C R Bard Incorporated allowed to appear pro hac vice. This entry will serve as authorization for the pro hac participation by the attorney. Western District of Missouri Local Rule 5.1 requires documents to be filed electronically. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for a WDMO e-filing account for NextGen CM/ECF. This will enable counsel to electronically file documents and receive electronic notification of filings. Register for a WDMO e-filing account at #PACER. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Berner, Crystal)
April 3, 2020 Filing 10 Motion to allow Pamela J. Marple to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-6807972) filed by Kara T Stubbs on behalf of All Defendants. (Stubbs, Kara)
April 2, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of filing withdrawal of attorney by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated (Stubbs, Kara)
March 31, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of appearance by Kara T Stubbs on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated (Attorney Kara T Stubbs added to party Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated(pty:dft), Attorney Kara T Stubbs added to party C R Bard Incorporated(pty:dft))(Stubbs, Kara)
March 30, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to United States Magistrate Judge Lajuana M. Counts. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Melvin, Greg)
March 27, 2020 Filing 6 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Arizona; Case Number 2:18-cv-04840.
March 27, 2020 Remark - Case transferred to the Western District of Missouri via electronic transfer. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SLQ) [Transferred from azd on 3/30/2020.]
March 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SECOND AMENDED SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER (THIRD). See Order for Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 3/20/20. [Amending to Remove Case: Lisa Riley v. C. R. Bard, Inc., 2:18-cv-00896-NV from page 25 of Schedule B] (MAP) [Transferred from azd on 3/30/2020.]
March 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 AMENDED SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER (THIRD). See Order for Details.Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 3/6/20. (MAP) [Transferred from azd on 3/30/2020.]
March 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER. (Third) See Order for Complete Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 3/4/20. (MAP) [Transferred from azd on 3/30/2020.]
December 20, 2018 Filing 2 This case has been assigned to the Honorable David G Campbell, with member case number: CV-18-04840-PHX-DGC. This case is included in MDL-2641. All future pleadings or documents should be filed in the Lead Case: 2:15-md-2641-DGC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SLQ) [Transferred from azd on 3/30/2020.]
December 20, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-16335872 filed by Francine Harrington. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(SLQ) [Transferred from azd on 3/30/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harrington v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C R Bard Incorporated
Represented By: Richard B. North, Jr.
Represented By: Kara T Stubbs
Represented By: John A. Wharton
Represented By: Pamela J. Marple
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated
Represented By: Richard B. North, Jr.
Represented By: Kara T Stubbs
Represented By: John A. Wharton
Represented By: Pamela J. Marple
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Francine Harrington
Represented By: Alexander G Dwyer
Represented By: Andrew F Kirkendall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?